HomeAway.com, Inc. v. City of Santa Monica
California Central District Court | |
Judge: | Otis D Wright, II |
Referred: | Alexander F Mackinnon |
Case #: | 2:16-cv-06641 |
Nature of Suit | 440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights |
Cause | 42:1983 Civil Rights Act |
Case Filed: | Sep 02, 2016 |
Terminated: | Jun 14, 2018 |
Last checked: Wednesday Mar 01, 2017 1:21 AM PST |
Defendant
City of Santa Monica
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
HomeAway.com, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 87 minutes ago |
Monday, August 26, 2019 | ||
102 | 102
appeal
USCA Mandate
Tue 08/27 3:49 PM
MANDATE of Ninth Circuit Court of Appeals filed re: Notice of Appeal to 9th Circuit Court of Appeals93 , Notice of Appeal to 9th Circuit Court of Appeals,84 , CCA # 18-55367 and 18-55805 The judgment of this Court, entered March 13, 2019, takes effect this date. This constitutes the formal mandate of this Court issued pursuant to Rule 41(a) of the Federal Rules of Appellate Procedure. [See USCA Opinion96 , AFFIRMED in part and DISMISSED in part.](mat) |