Villas of Positano Condominium Association, Inc. v. Niantic, Inc. et al
California Northern District Court | |
Judge: | James Donato |
Case #: | 3:16-cv-05091 |
Nature of Suit | 240 Real Property - Torts to Land |
Cause | 28:1331 Fed. Question: Tort Action |
Case Filed: | Sep 02, 2016 |
Terminated: | Sep 28, 2016 |
Last checked: Wednesday Mar 01, 2017 1:41 AM PST |
Defendant
Niantic, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Nintendo Co. LTD.
|
|
Defendant
The Pokemon Company
|
|
Plaintiff
Villas of Positano Condominium Association, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 16 minutes ago |
Wednesday, September 28, 2016 | ||
22 | 22
order
Order
Wed 09/28 9:07 AM
ORDER ADMINISTRATIVELY CLOSING CASES. The Court has consolidated these related actions for all pre-trial proceedings and designated the lowest-numbered case, Case No. 16-cv-04300, as the lead case. Dkt. No. 34. The clerk is directed to close each of the related cases in this action apart from the lead case. The closings are for administrative purposes only; nothing in this order will be considered a dismissal or disposition of any action. Signed by Judge James Donato on 9/28/2016. (jdlc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/28/2016) |
|
Friday, September 23, 2016 | ||
21 | 21
order
Case Management Scheduling Order
Fri 09/23 3:13 PM
CONSOLIDATION AND CASE MANAGEMENT SCHEDULING ORDER:. Signed by Judge James Donato on 9/23/16. (lrcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/23/2016) |
|
Tuesday, September 20, 2016 | ||
20 | 20
order
Case Management Scheduling Order
Tue 09/20 9:57 AM
CASE MANAGEMENT SCHEDULING ORDER: Initial Case Management Conference set for 11/10/2016 01:30 PM in Courtroom 11, 19th Floor, San Francisco. Case Management Statement due by 11/3/2016.. Signed by Judge James Donato on 9/20/16. (lrcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/20/2016) |
|
Monday, September 19, 2016 | ||
19 | 19
service
Certificate/Proof of Service
Mon 09/19 3:05 PM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Niantic, Inc. (Lobo, Bethany) (Filed on 9/19/2016) |
|
18 | 18
notice
Certificate of Interested Entities
Mon 09/19 2:02 PM
Certificate of Interested Entities by Niantic, Inc. (Gutkin, Jeffrey) (Filed on 9/19/2016) |
|
17 | 17
notice
Notice of Appearance
Mon 09/19 1:53 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Kristine Anne Forderer (Forderer, Kristine) (Filed on 9/19/2016) |
|
16 | 16
notice
Notice of Appearance
Mon 09/19 1:51 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Bethany Christa Lobo (Lobo, Bethany) (Filed on 9/19/2016) |
|
15 | 15
notice
Notice of Appearance
Mon 09/19 1:49 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Benjamin Hansel Kleine (Kleine, Benjamin) (Filed on 9/19/2016) |
|
14 | 14
notice
Notice of Appearance
Mon 09/19 1:48 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Jeffrey Gutkin (Gutkin, Jeffrey) (Filed on 9/19/2016) |
|
13 | 13
notice
Notice of Appearance
Mon 09/19 1:46 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Michael Graham Rhodes (Rhodes, Michael) (Filed on 9/19/2016) |
|
12 | 12
utility
Case Assigned/Reassigned
Mon 09/19 7:43 AM
Case reassigned to Judge Hon. James Donato. Judge Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero no longer assigned to the case. This case is assigned to a judge who participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras (sv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/19/2016) |
|
Friday, September 16, 2016 | ||
11 | 11
misc
Consent/Declination to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge
Fri 09/16 1:39 PM
CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Villas of Positano Condominium Association, Inc... (Hood, J) (Filed on 9/16/2016) |
|
10 | 10
order
Order Relating Case
Fri 09/16 6:34 AM
ORDER RELATING CASE.. Signed by Judge James Donato on 9/15/16. (lrcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/16/2016) |
|
Monday, September 12, 2016 | ||
9 | 9
order
Order on Motion for Pro Hac Vice
Mon 09/12 10:37 AM
ORDER, signed 9/12/16, by Chief Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero granting 5 Motion for Pro Hac Vice for Jeremy Lieberman. (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/12/2016) |
|
8 | 8
order
Order on Motion for Pro Hac Vice
Mon 09/12 10:36 AM
Order, signed 9/12/16, by Chief Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero granting 4 Motion for Pro Hac Vice for J. Alexander Hood.(klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/12/2016) |
|
Wednesday, September 07, 2016 | ||
7 | 7
service
Summons Issued
Wed 09/07 7:40 PM
Summons Issued as to Niantic, Inc., Nintendo Co. LTD., The Pokemon Company. (gbaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/7/2016) |
|
6 | 6
order
Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines
Wed 09/07 7:34 PM
Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 11/25/2016. Case Management Conference set for 12/2/2016 02:00 PM in Courtroom G, 15th Floor, San Francisco. (gbaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/7/2016) |
|
Tuesday, September 06, 2016 | ||
5 | 5
motion
Pro Hac Vice
Tue 09/06 10:42 AM
MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 305, receipt number 0971-10744562.) filed by THE VILLAS OF POSITANO CONDOMINIUM ASSOCIATION, INC.,.(Lieberman, Jeremy) (Filed on 9/6/2016) |
|
Att: 1 Certificate of Good Standing, | ||
Att: 2 Certificate of Good Standing | ||
4 | 4
motion
Pro Hac Vice
Tue 09/06 10:37 AM
MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 305, receipt number 0971-10744536.) filed by THE VILLAS OF POSITANO CONDOMINIUM ASSOCIATION, INC.,.(Hood, J) (Filed on 9/6/2016) |
|
Att: 1 Certificate of Good Standing, | ||
Att: 2 Certificate of Good Standing | ||
Friday, September 02, 2016 | ||
3 | 3
utility
~Util - Case Assigned by Intake
Fri 09/02 1:31 PM
Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening. Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 9/16/2016. (jlm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/2/2016) |
|
2 | 2
misc
Proposed Summons
Fri 09/02 12:08 PM
Proposed Summons. (Pafiti, Jennifer) (Filed on 9/2/2016) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Fri 09/02 12:07 PM
COMPLAINT against Niantic, Inc., Nintendo Co. LTD., The Pokemon Company ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0971-10741427.). Filed byTHE VILLAS OF POSITANO CONDOMINIUM ASSOCIATION, INC.,.(Pafiti, Jennifer) (Filed on 9/2/2016) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet |