New Jersey District Court
Judge:Jose L Linares
Referred: Joseph A Dickson
Case #: 2:16-cv-05397
Nature of Suit190 Contract - Other Contract
Cause28:1441 Notice of Removal- Breach of Contract
Case Filed:Sep 02, 2016
Terminated:Jan 27, 2017
Last checked: Wednesday Mar 01, 2017 4:31 AM EST
Counter Claimant
Bear Franchising, LLC, d/b/a Worldwide Express New Jersey or Worldwide Express
Represented By
FRANCIS M. TAYLOR
O'Brien & Taylor
contact info
Counter Defendant
VOIGT LIGHTING COMPANY, LLC
Represented By
ERIC GREGORY SIEGEL
Mcelroy Deutsch Mulvaney & Carpenter
contact info
Cross Claimant
YRC WORLDWIDE, INC.
Represented By
WILLIAM D. BIERMAN
Price Meese Shulman & D'Arminio
contact info
THOMAS C. MARTIN
Price Meese Shulman & D'Arminio, P.C.
contact info
Cross Defendant
YRC WORLDWIDE, INC.
Represented By
WILLIAM D. BIERMAN
Price Meese Shulman & D'Arminio
contact info
THOMAS C. MARTIN
Price Meese Shulman & D'Arminio, P.C.
contact info
Defendant
ABC CORP. 1-10
Defendant
JOHN DOE 1-10
Defendant
WORLDWIDE EXPRESS OPERATIONS, LLC
Defendant
YRC WORLDWIDE, INC.
Represented By
WILLIAM D. BIERMAN
Price Meese Shulman & D'Arminio
contact info
THOMAS C. MARTIN
Price Meese Shulman & D'Arminio, P.C.
contact info
Defendant
Bear Franchising, LLC, d/b/a Worldwide Express New Jersey or Worldwide Express
Represented By
FRANCIS M. TAYLOR
O'Brien & Taylor
contact info
Plaintiff
VOIGT LIGHTING COMPANY, LLC
Represented By
ERIC GREGORY SIEGEL
Mcelroy Deutsch Mulvaney & Carpenter
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/12/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Monday, March 06, 2017
20 20 order Stipulation and Order 1 - Terminate Deadlines Mon 03/06 9:14 AM
STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL. Signed by Judge Jose L. Linares on 03/04/2017. (ek)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 03, 2017
19 19 misc Stipulation of Dismissal Fri 03/03 4:50 PM
STIPULATION of Dismissal by Bear Franchising, LLC, d/b/a Worldwide Express New Jersey or Worldwide Express. (TAYLOR, FRANCIS)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 27, 2017
18 18 order Order 60-Day Administrative Termination Fri 01/27 11:26 AM
Order Administratively Terminating Action - 60 Day, Pending Consummation of Settlement. Administrative Termination deadline set for 3/28/2017. Signed by Judge Jose L. Linares on 1/26/2017. (seb)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 26, 2017
minutes Settlement Conference Thu 01/26 1:29 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Joseph A. Dickson: Settlement Conference held on 1/26/2017. Case settled. 60 day order to be entered. (nm, )
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 29, 2016
17 17 order Order Thu 12/29 10:32 AM
TEXT ORDER: The parties are advised that the TIME of the in person settlement conference scheduled for 1/26/17 has been changed to 10:30 a.m.. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Joseph A. Dickson on 12/29/16. (nm, )
Related: [-]
Monday, December 05, 2016
16 16 answer Answer to Counterclaim Mon 12/05 2:27 PM
ANSWER to Counterclaim by VOIGT LIGHTING COMPANY, LLC.(SIEGEL, ERIC)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 22, 2016
15 15 order Scheduling Order Wed 11/23 10:12 AM
PRETRIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: In Person Settlement Conference set for 1/26/2017 02:30 PM before Magistrate Judge Joseph A. Dickson. Fact Discovery due by 3/22/2017, etc. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph A. Dickson on 11/22/2016. (ek)
Related: [-]
minutes Pretrial Conference - Initial Tue 11/22 11:47 AM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Joseph A. Dickson: Initial Pretrial Conference held on 11/22/2016. (nm, )
Related: [-]
Monday, November 14, 2016
14 14 discov Joint Discovery Plan Mon 11/14 5:00 PM
Joint Discovery Plan by VOIGT LIGHTING COMPANY, LLC.(SIEGEL, ERIC)
Related: [-]
Thursday, November 10, 2016
13 13 answer Answer to Amended Complaint Counterclaim Thu 11/10 12:53 PM
ANSWER to Amended Complaint , COUNTERCLAIM against VOIGT LIGHTING COMPANY, LLC by Bear Franchising, LLC, d/b/a Worldwide Express New Jersey or Worldwide Express.(TAYLOR, FRANCIS)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 13, 2016
12 12 service Summons Returned Executed Affidavit of Service Thu 10/13 1:19 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by VOIGT LIGHTING COMPANY, LLC. Bear Franchising, LLC, d/b/a Worldwide Express New Jersey or Worldwide Express served on 10/13/2016, answer due 11/3/2016., AFFIDAVIT of Service served on Francis M. Taylor, Esq. on 10/13/16, filed by VOIGT LIGHTING COMPANY, LLC. (SIEGEL, ERIC)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 06, 2016
11 11 order Order ~Util - Set Hearings ~Util - Set/Clear Flags Thu 10/06 8:50 AM
ORDER: Initial Conference set for 11/22/2016 11:30 AM in Newark - Courtroom 2D before Magistrate Judge Joseph A. Dickson. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph A. Dickson on 10/6/16. (nm, )
Related: [-]
Friday, September 30, 2016
10 10 answer Answer to Amended Complaint Crossclaim Fri 09/30 10:44 AM
ANSWER to Amended Complaint , CROSSCLAIM against YRC WORLDWIDE, INC. by YRC WORLDWIDE, INC..(MARTIN, THOMAS)
Related: [-]
9 9 misc Letter Fri 09/30 10:40 AM
Letter from Thomas C. Martin, Esq.. (MARTIN, THOMAS)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 29, 2016
8 8 service Summons Issued Thu 09/29 3:40 PM
SUMMONS ISSUED as to WORLDWIDE EXPRESS OPERATIONS, LLC Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. Issued By *STEPHEN BOND* (seb)
Related: [-]
7 7 misc Corporate Disclosure Statement Thu 09/29 2:16 PM
Corporate Disclosure Statement by VOIGT LIGHTING COMPANY, LLC. (SIEGEL, ERIC)
Related: [-]
6 6 service Summons - Request for Issue Thu 09/29 2:15 PM
Request for Summons to be Issued by VOIGT LIGHTING COMPANY, LLC as to WORLDWIDE EXPRESS OPERATIONS, LLC. (SIEGEL, ERIC)
Related: [-]
5 5 cmp Amended Complaint Thu 09/29 2:12 PM
AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants All Defendants., filed by VOIGT LIGHTING COMPANY, LLC.(SIEGEL, ERIC)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 13, 2016
utility Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings Tue 09/13 3:12 PM
Set Deadlines as to4 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint for Failure to Assert a Cause of Action . Motion set for 10/17/2016 before Judge Jose L. Linares. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (seb)
Related: [-]
Monday, September 12, 2016
4 4 motion Dismiss Mon 09/12 3:42 PM
MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint for Failure to Assert a Cause of Action by YRC WORLDWIDE, INC.. Responses due by 10/3/2016(MARTIN, THOMAS)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Brief,
Att: 2 Text of Proposed Order
Tuesday, September 06, 2016
3 3 notice Notice of Appearance Tue 09/06 3:21 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by WILLIAM D. BIERMAN on behalf of YRC WORLDWIDE, INC. (BIERMAN, WILLIAM)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 02, 2016
2 2 misc Corporate Disclosure Statement Tue 09/06 11:30 AM
Corporate Disclosure Statement by YRC WORLDWIDE, INC. identifying YRC WORLDWIDE, INC. as Corporate Parent.. (seb)
Related: [-]
1 1 notice Notice of Removal Tue 09/06 11:28 AM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL by YRC WORLDWIDE, INC. from SUPERIOR COURT OF NEW JERSEY ESSEX COUNTY, case number ESX-L-05295-16. ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-7328248), filed by YRC WORLDWIDE, INC..(seb)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A,
Att: 2 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 3 Notice of Filing,
Att: 4 Notice of Appearance