Eliason v. All My Sons Moving and Storage of Phoenix Incorporated
Arizona District Court | |
Judge: | John J Tuchi |
Case #: | 2:16-cv-02975 |
Nature of Suit | 710 Labor - Fair Labor Standards Act |
Cause | 29:201 Denial of Overtime Compensation |
Case Filed: | Sep 05, 2016 |
Terminated: | Nov 04, 2016 |
Last checked: Saturday Mar 04, 2017 2:45 AM MST |
Defendant
All My Sons Moving and Storage of Phoenix Incorporated
|
|
Plaintiff
Treni Eliason
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/17/2024 11:59 PM MST |
Friday, November 04, 2016 | ||
8 | 8
minute_ord
~Util - Terminate Civil Case
Fri 11/04 9:33 AM
MINUTE ORDER: Pursuant to Notice of Voluntary Dismissal7 , Civil Case Terminated. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (JAMA) |
|
Thursday, November 03, 2016 | ||
7 | 7
notice
Notice of Voluntary Dismissal
Thu 11/03 10:25 PM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Treni Eliason. (Faulkner, Elizabeth) |
|
Wednesday, September 07, 2016 | ||
6 | 6
order
Order
Wed 09/07 10:28 AM
ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED directing the Clerk of Court to terminate any or all Defendants in this matter, without further notice, that have not been served within the time required by Fed. R. Civ. P. 4(m) on December 5, 2016. (See attached Order for complete details). Signed by Judge John J Tuchi on 9/7/16. (JAMA) |
|
5 | 5
order
Order
Wed 09/07 10:21 AM
ORDER: IT IS ORDERED that a motion pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b) is discouraged if the defect that would be the subject of the motion can be cured by filing an amended pleading. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that plaintiff shall serve a copy of this order on defendants. (See attached Order for complete details). Signed by Judge John J Tuchi on 9/7/16. (JAMA) |
|
Tuesday, September 06, 2016 | ||
4 | 4
service
Summons Issued
Tue 09/06 3:23 PM
Summons Issued as to All My Sons Moving and Storage of Phoenix Incorporated. (REK) |
|
Monday, September 05, 2016 | ||
3 | 3
misc
New Case Opened
Tue 09/06 3:22 PM
Filing fee paid, receipt number 0970-13357508. This case has been assigned to the Honorable John J. Tuchi. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: CV 16-02975 PHX-JJT. Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge to Exercise Jurisdiction form attached. (REK) |
|
2 | 2
service
Summons Submitted
Tue 09/06 3:20 PM
SUMMONS Submitted by Treni Eliason. (submitted by Elizabeth Faulkner) (REK) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Tue 09/06 3:18 PM
COMPLAINT. Filing fee received: $400.00, receipt number 0970-13357508 filed by Treni Eliason. (submitted by Elizabeth Faulkner)(REK) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet |