Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 1:14-bk-12092

Delaware Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Kevin J Carey
Case #: 1:16-ap-51287
Nature of Suit12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference
13 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §548 fraudulent transfer
14 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - other
Case Filed:Sep 07, 2016
Terminated:Oct 14, 2016
Last checked: never
Defendant
Olympic Ice Cream Co.
Represented By
Olympic Ice Cream Co.
contact info
Plaintiff
AW Liquidation, Inc. (f/k/a Associated Wholesalers, Inc.)
Represented By
Monique Bair DiSabatino
Saul Ewing LLP
contact info
Jeffrey C. Hampton
Saul Ewing LLP
contact info
Lucian B. Murley
Saul Ewing LLP
contact info
Aaron S. Applebaum
Saul Ewing LLP
contact info
Adam H. Isenberg
C/o Saul Ewing LLP
contact info
Mark Minuti
Saul Ewing LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
WR Liquidation, Inc. (f/k/a White Rose Inc.)
Represented By
Mark Minuti
Saul Ewing LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 10 hours ago
Friday, October 14, 2016
3 3 notice Dismissal - Notice Fri 10/14 10:30 AM
Notice of Dismissal of Adversary Proceeding Filed by AW Liquidation, Inc. (f/k/a Associated Wholesalers, Inc.), WR Liquidation, Inc. (f/k/a White Rose Inc.) (Applebaum, Aaron)
Related: [-]
court Close Adversary Case Fri 10/14 12:27 PM
Adversary Case 1:16-ap-51287 Closed (LMD)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 08, 2016
2 2 crditcrd none Thu 09/08 12:05 PM
Receipt of filing fee for Complaint 16-51287 KJC) [cmp,cmp] ( 350.00). Receipt Number 8154679, amount $ 350.00. (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 07, 2016
1 1 cmp RETIRED - Complaint Wed 09/07 11:54 PM
Adversary case 16-51287 Complaint by AW Liquidation, Inc. (f/k/a Associated Wholesalers, Inc.), WR Liquidation, Inc. (f/k/a White Rose Inc.) against Olympic Ice Cream Co.. Fee Amount $350 (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)),(13 (Recovery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfer)),(14 (Recovery of money/property - other)). AP Summons Served due date: 12/6/2016. (Minuti, Mark)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A
Att: 2 Notice of Dispute Resolution Alternatives