Insta Flap USA Inc., a Colorado corporation v. Boss Laser, LLC, a Florida limited liability company
Colorado District Court | |
Judge: | Craig B Shaffer |
Case #: | 1:16-cv-02284 |
Nature of Suit | 190 Contract - Other Contract |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Breach of Contract |
Case Filed: | Sep 09, 2016 |
Terminated: | Jul 20, 2017 |
Last checked: Wednesday Mar 08, 2017 2:14 AM MST |
Defendant
Boss Laser, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Insta Flap USA, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/23/2024 11:59 PM MDT |
Thursday, July 20, 2017 | ||
25 | 25
utility
Terminate Civil Case - PUBLIC
Fri 07/21 9:29 AM
Civil Case Terminated pursuant to the notice of dismissal or stipulation to dismiss filed in this case on 7/19/17. Text Only Entry (nmarb, ) |
|
24 | 24
order
Minute Order
Thu 07/20 8:30 AM
MINUTE ORDER: The parties have submitted a23 Stipulation of Dismissal of Case pursuant to F.R.C.P. 41(a)(1)(A)(ii), which requires no further action on the part of the court. The Clerk of Court shall close this case. By Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer on 7/20/2017. Text Only Entry (cbslc2) |
|
Wednesday, July 19, 2017 | ||
23 | 23
misc
Stipulation of Dismissal of Case
Wed 07/19 3:52 PM
STIPULATION of Dismissal of Case by Plaintiff Insta Flap USA, Inc.. (Driscoll, Jeffrey) |
|
Thursday, June 29, 2017 | ||
22 | 22
misc
Status Report
Thu 06/29 4:04 PM
Joint STATUS REPORT by Plaintiff Insta Flap USA, Inc.. (Driscoll, Jeffrey) |
|
Monday, June 19, 2017 | ||
21 | 21
minutes
Status Conference Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File
Mon 06/19 3:10 PM
COURTROOM MINUTES/MINUTE ORDER for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer: Telephone Status Conference held on 6/19/2017. Granting15 Motion for Extension of Time to File. Rebuttal experts shall be designated on or before 6/30/2017. FTR: Courtroom A-402. (amont, ) |
|
20 | 20
service
Affidavit/Return of Service - Other than Complaint
Mon 06/19 12:54 PM
AFFIDAVIT/RETURN of Service Certificate of Service Pursuant to D.C.COLO.LCivR 6.1(c) of Motion for Extension of Time to Designate Rebuttal Experts upon Defendant on June 6, 2017, filed by Defendant Boss Laser, LLC (DeFord, William) |
|
19 | 19
respm
Response to Motion
Mon 06/19 9:25 AM
RESPONSE to15 First MOTION for Extension of Time to Designate Rebuttal Experts filed by Plaintiff Insta Flap USA, Inc..(Driscoll, Jeffrey) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit 1, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit 2, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit 3 | ||
Friday, June 16, 2017 | ||
18 | 18
notice
Notice of Change of Address/Contact Information
Fri 06/16 3:40 PM
NOTICE of Change of Address/Contact Information by Jeffrey L. Driscoll (Driscoll, Jeffrey) |
|
Wednesday, June 07, 2017 | ||
17 | 17
order
Minute Order
Wed 06/07 10:18 AM
MINUTE ORDER. Due to Plaintiff's calendar conflict, the telephone status conference set for 6/15/2017 is reset to 6/19/2017 at 02:30 PM in Courtroom A 402 before Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer. The parties shall initiate a conference call amongst themselves prior to calling the court (303.844.2117) at the scheduled time. By Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer on 6/7/2017. Text Only Entry (cbslc1) |
|
16 | 16
order
Minute Order
Wed 06/07 9:44 AM
MINUTE ORDER re:15 First MOTION for Extension of Time to Designate Rebuttal Experts filed by Boss Laser, LLC. A Telephone Status Conference is set for 6/15/2017 at 02:30 PM in Courtroom A 402 before Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer. The parties shall initiate a conference call amongst themselves prior to calling the court (303.844.2117) at the scheduled time. By Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer on 6/7/2017. Text Only Entry (cbslc2) |
|
Friday, June 02, 2017 | ||
15 | 15
motion
Extension of Time
Fri 06/02 3:28 PM
First MOTION for Extension of Time to Designate Rebuttal Experts by Defendant Boss Laser, LLC.(DeFord, William) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order (PDF Only) Order Granting Motion for Extension of Time to Designate Rebuttal Experts | ||
Thursday, April 13, 2017 | ||
14 | 14
minutes
Status Conference ~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines
Thu 04/13 10:08 AM
COURTROOM MINUTES/MINUTE ORDER for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer: Telephone Status Conference held on 4/13/2017. Joint Status Report due by 6/30/2017. FTR: Courtroom A-402. (amont, ) |
|
Thursday, January 05, 2017 | ||
13 | 13
order
Scheduling Order
Thu 01/05 9:49 AM
SCHEDULING ORDER: by Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer on 1/5/17. (amont, ) |
|
12 | 12
minutes
Scheduling Conference ~Util - Set Scheduling Order Deadlines
Thu 01/05 9:48 AM
COURTROOM MINUTES/MINUTE ORDER for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer: Telephone Scheduling Conference held on 1/5/2017. Discovery due by 7/7/2017. Dispositive Motions due by 8/11/2017. A five day Jury Trial is set to commence on 10/16/2017 at 08:30 AM in Grand Junction before Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer. Telephone Status Conference set for 4/13/2017 10:00 AM in Courtroom A 402 before Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer. Telephone Final Pretrial Conference set for 9/19/2017 09:00 AM in Courtroom A 402 before Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer. Parties may participate in telephone hearings by initiating a conference call among themselves and calling the court (303.844.2117) at the scheduled time. Motions in limine shall be filed no later than 9/11/2017. FTR: Courtroom A-402. (amont, ) |
|
Tuesday, January 03, 2017 | ||
11 | 11
order
Order on Consent to Jurisdiction of Magistrate Judge
Tue 01/03 3:04 PM
ORDER OF REFERENCE Upon Consent to Jurisdiction of Magistrate Judge: Upon consent of the parties evidenced by Docket Entry #9, this case is referred to Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer for all purposes pursuant to D.C.COLO.LCivR 72.2(d) and 28 U.S.C. § 636(c). by Chief Judge Marcia S. Krieger on 1/3/17. Text Only Entry (msksec, ) |
|
Thursday, December 29, 2016 | ||
10 | 10
misc
Proposed Scheduling Order
Thu 12/29 4:16 PM
Proposed Scheduling Order by Plaintiff Insta Flap USA, Inc.. (Driscoll, Jeffrey) |
|
9 | 9
misc
Consent to Jurisdiction of Magistrate Judge
Thu 12/29 4:15 PM
CONSENT to Jurisdiction of Magistrate Judge by Plaintiff Insta Flap USA, Inc. All parties consent.. (Driscoll, Jeffrey) |
|
8 | 8
order
Order on Motion for Leave to Appear
Thu 12/29 7:59 AM
ORDER granting7 Motion for Leave to Appear Telephonically. The parties shall initiate a conference call amongst themselves prior to calling the court (303.844.2117) at the scheduled time. By Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer on 12/29/2016. Text Only Entry (cbslc2) |
|
Wednesday, December 28, 2016 | ||
7 | 7
motion
Appear
Wed 12/28 5:07 PM
Joint MOTION for Leave to Appear Telephonically at the January 5, 2017 Scheduling Conference by Plaintiff Insta Flap USA, Inc..(Driscoll, Jeffrey) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order (PDF Only) | ||
Thursday, December 22, 2016 | ||
6 | 6
answer
Answer to Complaint
Thu 12/22 4:37 PM
ANSWER to1 Complaint, Attorney William Stratford DeFord added to party Boss Laser, LLC(pty:dft) by Boss Laser, LLC.(DeFord, William) |
|
Wednesday, November 02, 2016 | ||
5 | 5
order
Minute Order
Wed 11/02 1:25 PM
MINUTE ORDER setting a Scheduling Conference for 1/5/2017 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom A 402 before Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer. ORDERED that parties shall adhere to the deadlines and instructions as set forth in[LINK:Preparation for Rule 16(b) Scheduling Conference] , located on the court's website under "Judicial Officers." FURTHER ORDERED that the above-captioned case has been directly assigned to Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 636(c) and the D.C.COLO.LCivR 40.1(c). Not later than seven (7) days prior to the Scheduling Conference the parties shall complete and file the[LINK:Consent/Non-Consent Form] indicating either unanimous consent of the parties or that consent has been declined. Text Only Entry by Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer on 11/2/16. (amont, ) |
|
Monday, October 31, 2016 | ||
4 | 4
service
Waiver of Return of Service - Executed - Complaint
Mon 10/31 3:51 PM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Insta Flap USA, Inc.. Boss Laser, LLC waiver sent on 10/25/2016, answer due 12/27/2016. (Driscoll, Jeffrey) |
|
Friday, September 09, 2016 | ||
3 | 3
misc
Summons Issued
Mon 09/12 8:41 AM
SUMMONS issued by Clerk. (amenz, ) |
|
Att: 1 Magistrate Judge Consent Form | ||
2 | 2
misc
Case Assigned to Judge
Mon 09/12 8:22 AM
Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer. Text Only Entry. (amenz, ) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Fri 09/09 5:21 PM
COMPLAINT and Jury Demand against Insta Flap USA Inc., a Colorado corporation (Filing fee $ 400,Receipt Number 1082-5148640)Attorney Jeffrey L. Driscoll added to party Insta Flap USA Inc., a Colorado corporation(pty:pla), filed by Insta Flap USA Inc., a Colorado corporation.(Driscoll, Jeffrey) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit B, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit C, | ||
Att: 4 Summons Summons Requested, | ||
Att: 5 Civil Cover Sheet |