United States of America v. Brian David Corvers
California Central District Court | |
Judge: | Dale S Fischer |
Referred: | Paul L Abrams |
Case #: | 2:16-cv-06720 |
Nature of Suit | 890 Other Statutes - Other Statutory Actions |
Cause | 18:3184 Extradition |
Case Filed: | Sep 07, 2016 |
Terminated: | Sep 14, 2016 |
Last checked: Monday Mar 06, 2017 12:24 AM PST |
Defendant
Brian David Corvers
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
United States of America
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 3 hours ago |
Friday, September 16, 2016 | ||
24 | 24
textonly
Notice of Filing Transcript
Mon 09/19 8:20 AM
NOTICE OF FILING TRANSCRIPT filed for proceedings 9/14/2016; 10:09 a.m. re Transcript23 THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (at) TEXT ONLY ENTRY |
|
23 | 23
transcript
-Transcript
Mon 09/19 8:02 AM
TRANSCRIPT for proceedings held on 9/14/2016; 10:09 a.m. Court Reporter/Electronic Court Recorder: BABYKIN COURTHOUSE SERVICES, phone number (626) 963-0566. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Electronic Court Recorder before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Notice of Intent to Redact due within 7 days of this date. Redaction Request due 10/7/2016. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 10/17/2016. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 12/15/2016. (at) |
|
Wednesday, September 14, 2016 | ||
22 | 22
1
pgs
minutes
Status Conference
Thu 09/15 10:57 AM
MINUTES OF Status Conference held before Magistrate Judge Paul L. Abrams: In Court, the parties submit a Stipulation Regarding Consent to Extradition. The Court questions Brian Corvers and his counsel of record as to the voluntary and knowing nature of the consent. The Court signs the Orderregarding consent to extradition. Court Recorder: CS9/14/2016. (sbu) |
|
21 | 21
3
pgs
order
Order
Thu 09/15 10:54 AM
ORDER by Magistrate Judge Paul L. Abrams, re Stipulation Consent to Extradition20 . IT IS HEREBY FOUND as follow 1. Brian Corvers' stipulation to extradition was executed knowingly and voluntarily. ( See Order for further details) (sbu) |
|
20 | 20
4
pgs
stip
Order
Thu 09/15 10:50 AM
STIPULATION regarding Consent to extradition filed by plaintiff United States of America.(sbu) |
|
Monday, September 12, 2016 | ||
19 | 19
testxtonly
Text Only Scheduling Notice
Mon 09/12 7:45 AM
TEXT ONLY ENTRY (In Chambers) by Magistrate Judge Paul L. Abrams. There will be a Status Conference on Wednesday, September 14, 2016, at 10:00 a.m. in Courtroom G, 9th Floor of the United States Courthouse, located at 312 N. Spring Street, Los Angeles, California. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (ch) |
|
Wednesday, September 07, 2016 | ||
18 | 18
1
pgs
notice
Notice of Reference to US Magistrate Judge (CV-105) - optional html form
Fri 09/09 8:03 AM
NOTICE OF REFERENCE to a U.S. Magistrate Judge. The within action has been assigned to the calendar of the Honorable District Judge Dale S. Fischer and referred to U.S. Magistrate Judge Paul L. Abrams for decision pursuant to 18 U.S.C. 3184 and General Order 05-07. (et) |
|
17 | 17
2
pgs
notice
Notice (Other)
Fri 09/09 8:03 AM
NOTICE TO CONSOLIDATE to 2:16-mj-01313-M filed by Plaintiff United States of America. (et) |
|
16 | 16
169
pgs
cmp
Request for Extradition
Fri 09/09 8:02 AM
GOVERNMENT'S FILING OF REQUEST FOR EXTRADITION AND FORMAL EXTRADITION PAPERS of Defendant Brian David Corvers to Federal Republic of Germany, assigned to Judge Dale S. Fischer. Case referred to Magistrate Judge Paul L. Abrams., filed by Plaintiff United States of America. (et) |
|
misc
Remark - Extradition Consolidation
Fri 09/09 7:57 AM
CRIMINAL MAGISTRATE CASE No. 2:16-mj-01313-M consolidated with Civil Case No. 2:16-cv-06720-DSF (PLA). All documents filed in the criminal magistrate case are consolidated with this civil action. Please refer to the criminal magistrate case docket sheet to review docket entries made prior to the start of this civil action. (et) |