Walton v. Peters et al
New York Southern District Court | |
Judge: | Colleen Mcmahon |
Case #: | 1:16-cv-07110 |
Nature of Suit | 555 Prisoner Petitions - Habeas Corpus - Prison Condition |
Cause | 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights |
Case Filed: | Sep 09, 2016 |
Create an account to get the full party report for this case.
Docket last updated: 03/26/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Tuesday, November 22, 2016 | ||
6 | 6
order
Order Granting IFP Application in Prisoner Case
Tue 11/22 12:29 PM
ORDER GRANTING IFP APPLICATION IN PRISONER CASE: Plaintiff's application for leave to proceed without prepayment of fees is granted. A prisoner bringing a civil action is required to pay the full $350 filing fee even when proceeding in forma pauperis (IFP), that is, without prepayment of fees.... The Court must collect, when funds exist in a prisoner's account, an initial partial filing fee plus monthly payments.... Accordingly, the Clerk of the Court is directed to send a copy of this order and the prisoner authorization to the agency having custody of the Plaintiff.... The Clerk of the Court is also directed to send a copy of this order to Plaintiff and note service on the docket.... (Signed by Judge Colleen McMahon on 11/22/2016) (vj) |
|
misc
Mail Order by Certified Mail
Tue 11/22 12:29 PM
Mailed a copy of6 Order Granting IFP Application in Prisoner Case, to Taqiy Walton. (vj) |
||
misc
Mail Order by Certified Mail
Tue 11/22 12:30 PM
Mailed a copy of4 Prisoner Authorization,6 Order Granting IFP Application in Prisoner Case, to the Superintendent Westchester County Jail. (vj) |
||
Monday, October 31, 2016 | ||
5 | 5
misc
Request to Proceed In Forma Pauperis
Tue 11/01 10:48 AM
REQUEST TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS. Document filed by Taqiy Walton.(sc) |
|
4 | 4
misc
Prisoner Authorization
Tue 11/01 10:47 AM
PRISONER AUTHORIZATION. Document filed by Taqiy Walton.(sc) |
|
Wednesday, October 12, 2016 | ||
3 | 3
order
Order Directing Prisoner Authorization
Wed 10/12 9:49 AM
ORDER DIRECTING PRISONER AUTHORIZATION: Plaintiff is directed to submit a completed and signed Prisoner Authorization Form to this Court's Pro Se Office within thirty (30) days of the date of this Order. The Clerk of Court is directed to assign this matter to my docket. The Court certifies, pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 1915(a)(3), that any appeal from this Order would not be taken in good faith, and therefore in forma pauperis status is denied for the purpose of an appeal. See Coppedge v. United States , 369 U.S. 438, 444-45 (1962). Prisoner Authorization Form due by 11/14/2016. (Signed by Judge Colleen McMahon on October 12, 2016)(jjg) |
|
Att: 1 Prisoner Authorization | ||
misc
Transmission to Docket Assistant Clerk
Wed 10/12 9:49 AM
Transmission to Docket Assistant Clerk. Transmitted re:3 Order Directing Prisoner Authorization,,, to the Docket Assistant Clerk for case processing. (jjg) |
||
misc
Mail Order by Certified Mail
Wed 10/12 9:54 AM
Mailed a copy of3 Order Directing Prisoner Authorization, to Taqiy Walton #187204 Westchester County Jail P.O. Box 10, Woods Rd. Valhalla, NY 10595. (ca) |
||
notice
Notice of Case Assignment/Reassignment - Sua Sponte
Wed 10/12 10:15 AM
NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT - SUA SPONTE to Judge Colleen McMahon. Judge Unassigned is no longer assigned to the case. (wb) |
||
Friday, September 09, 2016 | ||
2 | 2
cmp
Complaint
Tue 09/13 11:13 AM
COMPLAINT against Nicholas C. Maselli, John V. Peters, Carmine Zullo. Document filed by Taqiy Walton.(sac) |
|
1 | 1
misc
Request to Proceed In Forma Pauperis
Tue 09/13 11:05 AM
REQUEST TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS. Document filed by Taqiy Walton.(sac) |
|
utility
Case Designated ECF
Tue 09/13 11:42 AM
Case Designated ECF. (sac) |