Tebo v. City of Debary, Florida et al
Florida Middle District Court | |
Judge: | Gregory A Presnell |
Referred: | Daniel C Irick |
Case #: | 6:16-cv-01599 |
Nature of Suit | 442 Civil Rights - Employment |
Cause | 42:2000e Job Discrimination (Employment) |
Case Filed: | Sep 13, 2016 |
Re-opened: | Oct 02, 2019 |
Terminated: | Aug 10, 2018 |
Last checked: Sunday Mar 12, 2017 5:29 AM EDT |
Defendant
City of Debary, Florida
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Leo Daniel Parrott
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Stacy Tebo
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 1 hours ago |
Monday, November 18, 2019 | ||
64 | 64
1
pgs
order
Order dismissing case
Mon 11/18 1:15 PM
ORDER dismissing case re 62 Notice of settlement, 63 Mediation report. The Clerk is directed to close the case. Signed by Judge Gregory A. Presnell on 11/18/2019. (LAM) |
|
Friday, November 15, 2019 | ||
63 | 63
adr
Mediation report
Fri 11/15 12:18 PM
MEDIATION report Hearing held on November 14, 2019. Hearing outcome: Settled.. (Sands, Kimberly) |
|
62 | 62
notice
Notice of settlement
Fri 11/15 10:14 AM
NOTICE of settlement contingent upon City Council approval by Stacy Tebo (Chapman, Martha) |