Ohio & Vicinity Carpenters' Fringe Benefit Funds, Inc. v. Quintana & Son, Inc.
Ohio Northern District Court | |
Judge: | Christopher A Boyko |
Case #: | 1:16-cv-02290 |
Nature of Suit | 791 Labor - Employee Retirement Income Security Act |
Cause | 28:1132 E.R.I.S.A. |
Case Filed: | Sep 14, 2016 |
Terminated: | Jan 11, 2017 |
Last checked: Monday Mar 13, 2017 5:14 AM EDT |
Defendant
Quintana & Son, Inc.
4084 Bluestone Rd
S Euclid, OH 44121 |
|
Plaintiff
Ohio & Vicinity Carpenters' Fringe Benefit Funds, Inc.
Park Center Plaza 1 6100 Oak Tree Boulevard, Suite 190
Independence, OH 44131 |
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 4 hours ago |
Wednesday, November 08, 2017 | ||
14 | 14
1
pgs
order
Order
Wed 11/08 10:44 AM
Order re13 Proposed Voluntary Order for Dismissal filed by Ohio & Vicinity Carpenters' Fringe Benefit Funds, Inc.. Judge Christopher A. Boyko on 11/8/2017. (R,D) |
|
13 | 13
oth_doc
Proposed Order
Wed 11/08 8:09 AM
Proposed Order Voluntary Dismissal filed by Ohio & Vicinity Carpenters' Fringe Benefit Funds, Inc.. (Henzi, Matthew) |
|
Friday, May 12, 2017 | ||
12 | 12
minutes
~Util - Terminate Motions Order
Fri 05/12 2:48 PM
Amended Order for Default Judgment against Defendant Quintana & Son, Inc. as outlined herein. Judge Christopher A. Boyko. (H,CM) |
|
Wednesday, March 15, 2017 | ||
11 | 11
motion
Default Judgment (Motion for)
Wed 03/15 1:10 PM
Amended Motion for default judgment filed by Plaintiff Ohio & Vicinity Carpenters' Fringe Benefit Funds, Inc.. Related document(s)8 .(Asher, Michael) |
|
Att: 1 Affidavit, | ||
Att: 2 Proposed Order, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit A: Audit, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit B: Agreement | ||
Wednesday, February 15, 2017 | ||
order
Order on Motion to withdraw as attorney
Wed 02/15 3:38 PM
Order [non-document] granting attorney Matthew I. Henzi's Motion to withdraw as counsel for Plaintiff . Judge Christopher A. Boyko on 2/15/2017.(H,CM) |
||
Tuesday, February 14, 2017 | ||
10 | 10
motion
Withdraw as Attorney
Tue 02/14 3:39 PM
Motion to withdraw as attorney filed by Plaintiff Ohio & Vicinity Carpenters' Fringe Benefit Funds, Inc..(Henzi, Matthew) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order Withdraw | ||
Friday, February 10, 2017 | ||
9 | 9
notice
Attorney Appearance
Fri 02/10 1:13 PM
Attorney Appearance by Matthew I. Henzi filed by on behalf of Ohio & Vicinity Carpenters' Fringe Benefit Funds, Inc.. (Henzi, Matthew) |
|
Wednesday, January 11, 2017 | ||
8 | 8
order
Default Judgment
Wed 01/11 4:07 PM
Default Judgment in favor of Ohio & Vicinity Carpenters' Fringe Benefit Funds, Inc. against Quintana & Son, Inc. as outlined herein. Judge Christopher A. Boyko on 1/11/2017. (H,CM) |
|
Wednesday, December 14, 2016 | ||
order
Order
Wed 12/14 2:00 PM
Order (non-document). Judge Christopher A. Boyko on 12/14/2016. Case Management Conference scheduled for 12/19/2016 is cancelled.(R,D) |
||
Wednesday, December 07, 2016 | ||
7 | 7
motion
Default Judgment (Motion for)
Wed 12/07 10:28 AM
Motion for default judgment filed by Plaintiff Ohio & Vicinity Carpenters' Fringe Benefit Funds, Inc..(Asher, Michael) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A: Collective Bargaining Agmt Excerpts, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit B: Carpenters Agreement, | ||
Att: 3 Proposed Order | ||
Thursday, December 01, 2016 | ||
oth_evt
Default Entered
Thu 12/01 11:45 AM
Default (non-document) Entered on 12/1/2016 against Defendant Quintana & Son, Inc.. Geri M. Smith, Clerk by Christine M. Huth, Deputy Clerk. Related document(s)6 . (H,CM) |
||
oth_evt
Remark re Pro Se Service
Thu 12/01 11:50 AM
Copy of (non-document) Default Entered mailed to Quintana & Son, Inc. at 4094 Bluestone Road, South Euclid, OH 44121 on 12/1/2016. (H,CM) |
||
Wednesday, November 30, 2016 | ||
6 | 6
notice
Application to Enter Default
Wed 11/30 3:05 PM
Application to Clerk for entry of default against Quintana & Son, Inc. filed by Ohio & Vicinity Carpenters' Fringe Benefit Funds, Inc.. (Asher, Michael) |
|
Friday, October 21, 2016 | ||
5 | 5
order
Case Management Conference Scheduling Order
Fri 10/21 11:35 AM
Case Management Conference Scheduling Order with case management conference to be held on 12/19/2016 at 02:00 PM at Chambers 15B before Judge Christopher A. Boyko. Judge Christopher A. Boyko on 10/21/2016.(R,D) |
|
Att: 1 Report of Parties Planning Meeting, | ||
Att: 2 Consent Package | ||
Thursday, October 06, 2016 | ||
4 | 4
service
Return of Service Executed
Thu 10/06 2:39 PM
Return of Service by certified mail executed upon Quintana & Son, Inc. on 10/3/2016, filed on behalf of Ohio & Vicinity Carpenters' Fringe Benefit Funds, Inc. Related document(s)1 . (Asher, Michael) |
|
Wednesday, September 14, 2016 | ||
3 | 3
oth_evt
Summons Issued
Wed 09/14 3:09 PM
Original Summons and Magistrate Consent Form issued to counsel for service upon Quintana & Son, Inc. (S,SR) |
|
Att: 1 Magistrate Consent Form | ||
2 | 2
notice
Corporate Disclosure Statement
Wed 09/14 2:36 PM
Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Ohio & Vicinity Carpenters' Fringe Benefit Funds, Inc.. (Asher, Michael) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Wed 09/14 2:34 PM
Complaint against Quintana & Son, Inc.. Filing fee paid $ 400, Receipt number 0647-7803842. Filed by Ohio & Vicinity Carpenters' Fringe Benefit Funds, Inc.. (Asher, Michael) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 2 Summons | ||
utility
Add and Terminate Judge
Wed 09/14 2:56 PM
Judge Christopher A. Boyko assigned to case. (S,SR) |
||
oth_evt
Random Assignment of Magistrate Judge
Wed 09/14 2:57 PM
Random Assignment of Magistrate Judge pursuant to Local Rule 3.1. In the event of a referral, case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge William H. Baughman, Jr. (S,SR) |