|
GPO
Apr 04 2016
ORDER as to Xiulu Ruan re: 258 Motion for Entry of Order Directing AltaPointe & Dr. Hayes to Comply with Trial Subpoena. Dr. Hayes & AltaPointe are to produce the records sought by the the subpoena, & Dr. Hayes is to testify at the time & place set forth in said subpoena as set out. In order to protect the confidential nature of & to protect the unauthorized disclosure of the covered documents, terms & conditions are set out & shall apply to production of any documents as set out. Signed by Senior Judge Callie V. S. Granade on 4/4/2016. (tot)
|
|
GPO
Dec 23 2016
ORDER as to John Patrick Couch, Xiulu Ruan DENYING Dft Ruan's 374 Motion to Dismiss Second Superseding Indictment, In Part, as set out, DENYING Dft Couch's 378 Motion to Dismiss Second Superseding Indictment, In Part, as set out, DENYING Dft's Couch's 379 Motion to Dismiss Certain Counts Within the Indictment or, Alternatively, Motion for Bill of Particulars as set out. Signed by Senior Judge Callie V. S. Granade on 12/23/2016. (tot)ORDER as to John Patrick Couch, Xiulu Ruan DENYING Dft Ruan's 374 Motion to Dismiss Second Superseding Indictment, In Part, as set out, DENYING Dft Couch's 378 Motion to Dismiss Second Superseding Indictment, In Part, as set out, DENYING Dft's Couch's 379 Motion to Dismiss Certain Counts Within the Indictment or, Alternatively, Motion for Bill of Particulars as set out. Signed by Senior Judge Callie V. S. Granade on 12/23/2016. (tot)
|
|
GPO
Mar 02 2017
PRELIMINARY ORDER OF FORFEITURE as to Xiulu Ruan, it is hereby ORDERED, ADJUDGED, and DECREED the the property as set forth in Order is declared forfeited to the United States. Signed by Senior Judge Callie V. S. Granade on 3/2/2017. (15 certified copies forwarded to USA) (mab)
|
|
GPO
Mar 15 2017
JUDGMENT as to Bridgette Williams Parker, Count 2, Imprisonment 20 months. Recommendation to BOP - substance abuse treatment. SRT 3 years. Special conditions (1) substance abuse testing, (2) substance abuse treatment, (3) mental health treatment, (4) model search condition. SA $100.00. Signed by Senior Judge Callie V. S. Granade on 3/15/2017. (mab)
|
|
GPO
Apr 10 2017
ORDER as to John Patrick Couch, Xiulu Ruan DENYING Dft Ruan's 527 Motion for Leave to Contact Jurors as set out. Signed by Senior Judge Callie V. S. Granade on 4/10/2017. (tot)ORDER as to John Patrick Couch, Xiulu Ruan DENYING Dft Ruan's 527 Motion for Leave to Contact Jurors as set out. Signed by Senior Judge Callie V. S. Granade on 4/10/2017. (tot)
|
|
GPO
Apr 25 2017
JUDGMENT as to Thomas Justin Palmer, Count 2 - Imprisonment: 30 months w/recommendation to BOP that dft be imprisoned at an institution where a residential, comprehensive, substance abuse treatment program is available; SRT: 3 years w/special conditions: (1) substance abuse testing as set out, (2) substance abuse treatment as set out, (3) mental health evaluation and treatment as set out, & (4) submit to searches as set out; SA: $100.00. Signed by Senior Judge Callie V. S. Granade on 4/25/2017. (tot)
|
|
GPO
May 04 2017
ORDER FOR INTERLOCUTORY SALE as to Xiulu Ruan, the United States, through the USM, is ordered to sell the property listed as set out. Upon the sale of the property, the USM is ordered to deduct its expenses & to deposit the remaining sale proceeds into an interest-bearing account pending further order(s) of this Court. Signed by Senior Judge Callie V. S. Granade on 5/4/2017. (tot)
|
|
GPO
May 05 2017
AMENDED ORDER FOR INTERLOCUTORY SALE as to John Patrick Couch, the United States, through the USM, is ordered to sell the property listed as set out. Upon the sale & closing of the real property & the sale of the personal property, the USM is ordered to deduct its expenses & to deposit the remaining sale proceeds into an interest-bearing account pending further order(s) of this Court. Signed by Senior Judge Callie V. S. Granade on 5/5/2017. (tot)
|
|
GPO
May 31 2017
JUDGMENT as to John Patrick Couch, Counts 1ss-7ss, 13ss-17ss, 19ss - Imprisonment: 240 months, said term consists of 240 months as to each of Counts 1,2,4,5,6,7,13,14,19, 60 months as to each of Counts 16,17, & 120 months as to each of Counts 3,15, all said terms to run concurrently, w/recommendation to BOP that dft be imprisoned at an institution where a residential, comprehensive, substance abuse treatment program is available, where a mental health treatment program is available, & as close to his family in Mobile, Alabama as possible that meets the criteria of the first two recommendations; SRT 4 years, said term consists of 3 years as to each of Counts 1,2,4-7,13-17,19, & 4 years as to Count 3, all said terms to run concurrently w/special conditions (1) submit to substance abuse testing as set out, (2) participate in substance abuse treatment as set out, (3) participate in mental health evaluation & treatment as set out, (4) submit to searches as set out, (5) prohibited from making financial transactions without approval of the Probation Officer as set out, (6) provide Probation Office access to financial information, & (7) make restitution as set out; Restitution: $16,844,569.03 to be paid as set out; SA: $1,300.00. Count 18ss - Dismissed on Govt's motion. Signed by Senior Judge Callie V. S. Granade on 5/31/2017. (tot) Modified on 6/1/2017 (tot).
|
|
GPO
May 31 2017
JUDGMENT as to Xiulu Ruan, Counts 1ss-4ss, 8ss, 9ss, 11ss, 12ss, 15ss, 16ss, 17ss, 19ss-22ss - Imprisonment: 252 months, consisting of 240 months as to Counts 1,2,3,4,8,9,11,12,19, 60 months as to Counts 16 & 17, 120 months as to Counts 15,20,21,22, all said terms to be served concurrently, except 12 months of the 120 month concurrent terms imposed as to Counts 15,20,21, 22, are to be served consecutively to the other concurrent terms, w/recommendation to BOP that dft be imprisoned as close to Atlanta, GA, as possible; placement as close to Atlanta, GA, as possible. SRT: 4 years, consisting of 3 years on Counts 1,2,4,8,9,11,12,15,16,17,19-22, & 4 years as to Count 3, all such terms are to run concurrently, w/special conditions: (1) submit to substance abuse testing as set out, (2) participate in substance abuse treatment as set out, (3) participate in mental health evaluation & treatment as set out, (4) submit to searches as set out, (5) prohibited from making financial transactions without approval of the Probation Officer as set out, (6) provide Probation Office access to financial information, & (7) make restitution as set out; Restitution: $15,239,369.93 to be paid as set out; SA: $1,500.00. Count 10ss - Acquitted by Jury. Count 18ss - Dismissed on motion of the Government. Signed by Senior Judge Callie V. S. Granade on 5/31/2017. (tot)
|
|
GPO
Jul 14 2017
ORDER as to John Patrick Couch, Xiulu Ruan DENYING Lori Carver's 525 Motion to Intervene, or Alternatively, Verified Petition to Assert Interest in Property Forfeited as set out. Signed by Senior Judge Callie V. S. Granade on 7/13/2017. (tot)ORDER as to John Patrick Couch, Xiulu Ruan DENYING Lori Carver's 525 Motion to Intervene, or Alternatively, Verified Petition to Assert Interest in Property Forfeited as set out. Signed by Senior Judge Callie V. S. Granade on 7/13/2017. (tot)
|
|
GPO
Aug 03 2017
ORDER as to John Patrick Couch, as to Xiulu Ruan DENYING Dfts' 528 Motion for Judgment of Acquittal or, in the Alternative, Motion for New Trial as to Xiulu Ruan, 530 Motion for New Trial or, in the Alternative, Motion for New Trial as to John Patrick Couch as set out. Signed by Senior Judge Callie V. S. Granade on 8/3/2017. (tot)ORDER as to John Patrick Couch, as to Xiulu Ruan DENYING Dfts' 528 Motion for Judgment of Acquittal or, in the Alternative, Motion for New Trial as to Xiulu Ruan, 530 Motion for New Trial or, in the Alternative, Motion for New Trial as to John Patrick Couch as set out. Signed by Senior Judge Callie V. S. Granade on 8/3/2017. (tot)
|
|
GPO
Sep 15 2017
ORDER as to Xiulu Ruan, John Patrick Couch GRANTING United States' 600 Motion to Dismiss Petition of Ling Cui & DISMISSING Ling Cui's 577 Petition & 643 Amended Petition as set out. Signed by Senior Judge Callie V. S. Granade on 9/15/17. (tot)ORDER as to Xiulu Ruan, John Patrick Couch GRANTING United States' 600 Motion to Dismiss Petition of Ling Cui & DISMISSING Ling Cui's 577 Petition & 643 Amended Petition as set out. Signed by Senior Judge Callie V. S. Granade on 9/15/17. (tot)
|
|
GPO
Nov 19 2018
ORDER as to Xiulu Ruan re: writ of execution, the division of property set forth in the divorce decree and the resulting quit claim deeds are declared VOID and are SET ASIDE pursuant to 28:3306(a). It is further ORDERED, that the United States is granted a LIFT OF STAY to proceed with the execution. Signed by Senior Judge Callie V. S. Granade on 11/19/2018. (mab)
|
|
GPO
Apr 04 2019
ORDER as to Xiulu Ruan GRANTING United States' 810 Motion for an Order Confirming Mortgage is VOID to Clear Title, & the 800 Motion to Void Mortgage as a Fraudulent Transfer & 808 Motion to Compel are MOOT as set out. Signed by Senior Judge Callie V. S. Granade on 4/4/19. (tot)
|
|
GPO
Jul 14 2021
AMENDED JUDGMENT as to Xiulu Ruan, Imprisonment: 252 months, consisting of 240 months as to Counts 1,2,3,4,8,9,11,12,19; 60 months as to Count 17; 120 months as to Counts 15,20,21,22; all said terms to be served concurrently, except 12 months of the 120 month concurrent terms imposed as to Counts 15,20,21, 22, are to be served consecutively to the other concurrent terms, w/recommendation to BOP that dft be imprisoned as close to Atlanta, GA, as possible; placement as close to Atlanta, GA, as possible. SRT: 4 years, consisting of 3 years on Counts 1,2,4,8,9,11,12,15,17,19-22, & 4 years as to Count 3, all such terms are to run concurrently, w/special conditions: (1) submit to substance abuse testing as set out, (2) participate in substance abuse treatment as set out, (3) participate in mental health evaluation & treatment as set out, (4) submit to searches as set out, (5) prohibited from making financial transactions without approval of the Probation Officer as set out, (6) provide Probation Office access to financial information, & (7) make restitution as set out; Restitution: $15,239,369.93 to be paid as set out; SA: $1,400.00. Count 10 - Acquitted by Jury. Count 18 dismissed on motion of the Government. Count 16 vacated by the Eleventh Circuit Court of Appeals.. Signed by Senior Judge Callie V. S. Granade on 7/14/2021. (mab)
|
|
GPO
Aug 03 2022
ORDER as to Xiulu Ruan GRANTING Pet Ling Cui's 945 Motion for Order Correcting a Misstatement in Order of June 27, 2019 as set out. The 838 Order of 6/27/19 is AMENDED as set out. Signed by Senior Judge Callie V. S. Granade on 8/3/22. (tot)
|