Joint Admin
|
1:16-bk-07208 - ESI Service Corp.
|
09/16/2016
|
Joint Admin
|
1:16-bk-07209 - Daniel Webster College, Inc.
|
09/16/2016
|
Adversary
|
1:16-ap-50296 - Federman et al v. ITT Educational Services, Inc.
|
09/16/2016
|
Adversary
|
1:16-ap-50298 - Artis et al v. ITT Educational Services, Inc.
|
09/20/2016
|
Adversary
|
1:16-ap-50318 - Caruso v. Securities and Exchange Commission et al
|
10/10/2016
|
Adversary
|
1:17-ap-50003 - Villalba v. ITT Educational Services, Inc. et al
|
01/03/2017
|
Adversary
|
1:17-ap-50014 - Lehman Roofing, Inc v. ITT Educational Services, Inc.
|
01/05/2017
|
Adversary
|
1:17-ap-50045 - Caruso v. Duong
|
01/25/2017
|
Adversary
|
1:17-ap-50068 - Caruso v. Inland Moving and Storage Co.
|
02/23/2017
|
Adversary
|
1:17-ap-50070 - Caruso v. Hansen Storage Company
|
02/23/2017
|
Adversary
|
1:17-ap-50080 - Texas Higher Education Coordinating Board v. Caruso
|
03/02/2017
|
Adversary
|
1:17-ap-50101 - Caruso v. Student CU Connect CUSO, LLC et al
|
03/30/2017
|
Adversary
|
1:17-ap-50139 - Caruso v. Microsoft Corporation et al
|
05/22/2017
|
Adversary
|
1:18-ap-50100 - Caruso v. Modany et al
|
05/31/2018
|
Adversary
|
1:18-ap-50107 - Caruso v. Amazon Web Services, Inc.
|
06/14/2018
|
Adversary
|
1:18-ap-50116 - Caruso v. LLC d/b/a Altarama Information Services
|
06/29/2018
|
Adversary
|
1:18-ap-50117 - Caruso v. Careerco, LLC
|
06/29/2018
|
Adversary
|
1:18-ap-50118 - Caruso v. LLC d/b/a Circle Up Media
|
06/29/2018
|
Adversary
|
1:18-ap-50119 - Caruso v. Coverall of North America, Inc.
|
06/29/2018
|
Adversary
|
1:18-ap-50120 - Caruso v. Carolinas, LLC f/k/a Duke Power Company
|
06/29/2018
|
Adversary
|
1:18-ap-50121 - Caruso v. FX Networks, LLC
|
06/29/2018
|
Adversary
|
1:18-ap-50122 - Caruso v. Nextwave Media Group LLC
|
06/29/2018
|
Adversary
|
1:18-ap-50123 - Caruso v. Ovid Technologies, Inc.
|
06/29/2018
|
Adversary
|
1:18-ap-50124 - Caruso v. Rock Solid Technologies, Inc.
|
06/29/2018
|
Adversary
|
1:18-ap-50125 - Caruso v. SEI, Inc. d/b/a Service Express, Inc.
|
06/29/2018
|
Adversary
|
1:18-ap-50126 - Caruso v. Sociedad Advertising, LLC
|
06/29/2018
|
Adversary
|
1:18-ap-50127 - Caruso v. Sprint Corporation
|
06/29/2018
|
Adversary
|
1:18-ap-50128 - Caruso v. Vocational Rehabilitation Services, Inc.
|
06/29/2018
|
Adversary
|
1:18-ap-50129 - Caruso v. Yahoo! Inc.
|
06/29/2018
|
Adversary
|
1:18-ap-50130 - Caruso v. American Health Information Management Association
|
06/29/2018
|
Adversary
|
1:18-ap-50131 - Caruso v. Shred-It USA LLC
|
06/29/2018
|
Adversary
|
1:18-ap-50132 - Caruso v. CareerBuilder, LLC d/b/a Careerbuilder.com
|
06/29/2018
|
Adversary
|
1:18-ap-50133 - Caruso v. Chartpak, Inc.
|
06/29/2018
|
Adversary
|
1:18-ap-50134 - Caruso v. Consumers Energy Company
|
06/29/2018
|
Adversary
|
1:18-ap-50135 - Caruso v. Convergeone, Inc.
|
06/29/2018
|
Adversary
|
1:18-ap-50136 - Caruso v. Hudson Energy Services, LLC
|
06/29/2018
|
Adversary
|
1:18-ap-50137 - Caruso v. Integra Construction, Inc.
|
06/29/2018
|
Adversary
|
1:18-ap-50138 - Caruso v. Kpmg, LLP
|
06/29/2018
|
Adversary
|
1:18-ap-50139 - Caruso v. PAETEC Communications, LLC
|
06/29/2018
|
Adversary
|
1:18-ap-50140 - Caruso v. Property Solutions, Inc.
|
06/29/2018
|
Adversary
|
1:18-ap-50141 - Caruso v. Ricoh USA, Inc.
|
06/29/2018
|
Adversary
|
1:18-ap-50142 - Caruso v. SOAH Films, LLC
|
06/29/2018
|
Adversary
|
1:18-ap-50143 - Caruso v. R.S.R. Electronics, Inc.
|
06/29/2018
|
Adversary
|
1:18-ap-50144 - Caruso v. Southern California Edison Company
|
06/29/2018
|
Adversary
|
1:18-ap-50145 - Caruso v. Study.Com, LLC
|
06/29/2018
|
Adversary
|
1:18-ap-50148 - Caruso v. AV Solutions LLC
|
07/05/2018
|
Adversary
|
1:18-ap-50149 - Caruso v. Earshot Audio Post, LLC
|
07/05/2018
|
Adversary
|
1:18-ap-50150 - Caruso v. Kansas City Power & Light Company
|
07/05/2018
|
Adversary
|
1:18-ap-50151 - Caruso v. Openbox Solutions, Inc.
|
07/05/2018
|
Adversary
|
1:18-ap-50152 - Caruso v. Priority Press, Inc.
|
07/05/2018
|
Adversary
|
1:18-ap-50153 - Caruso v. Quest Building Services Ltd.
|
07/05/2018
|
Adversary
|
1:18-ap-50154 - Caruso v. Tucson Electric Power Company
|
07/05/2018
|
Adversary
|
1:18-ap-50155 - Caruso v. Sensory Technologies, LLC
|
07/05/2018
|
Adversary
|
1:18-ap-50156 - Caruso v. American Arbitration Association, Inc.
|
07/05/2018
|
Adversary
|
1:18-ap-50157 - Caruso v. Ameridial, Inc. d/b/a TTC-Ameridial
|
07/05/2018
|
Adversary
|
1:18-ap-50158 - Caruso v. Miami Television Station WBFS Inc. d/b/a WBFS-TV
|
07/05/2018
|
Adversary
|
1:18-ap-50159 - Caruso v. WLFL Licensee, LLC d/b/a WLFL-TV
|
07/05/2018
|
Adversary
|
1:18-ap-50160 - Caruso v. Total Building Maintenance, Inc.
|
07/05/2018
|
Adversary
|
1:18-ap-50161 - Caruso v. DTE Energy Company
|
07/05/2018
|
Adversary
|
1:18-ap-50162 - Caruso v. General Building Services, Inc. d/b/a GBS GP
|
07/06/2018
|
Adversary
|
1:18-ap-50163 - Caruso v. American Electric Power Service Corporation
|
07/06/2018
|
Adversary
|
1:18-ap-50164 - Caruso v. C3 Security and Investigations, Inc.
|
07/06/2018
|
Adversary
|
1:18-ap-50165 - Caruso v. Town and Country Resort Hotel Holdings, Inc.
|
07/06/2018
|
Adversary
|
1:18-ap-50166 - Caruso v. Lead Intelligence, Inc.
|
07/06/2018
|
Adversary
|
1:18-ap-50167 - Caruso v. Hearst Stations, Inc., d/b/a KCWE and KQCA
|
07/06/2018
|
Adversary
|
1:18-ap-50168 - Caruso v. Agera Energy, LLC
|
07/06/2018
|
Adversary
|
1:18-ap-50169 - Caruso v. Alpha Landscape Contractors, LLC
|
07/06/2018
|
Adversary
|
1:18-ap-50170 - Caruso v. Arvato Digital Services, LLC
|
07/06/2018
|
Adversary
|
1:18-ap-50171 - Caruso v. Central Maintenance & Service Co.
|
07/06/2018
|
Adversary
|
1:18-ap-50172 - Caruso v. City Wide Maintenance of Cincinnati
|
07/06/2018
|
Adversary
|
1:18-ap-50173 - Caruso v. CleanCorp
|
07/06/2018
|
Adversary
|
1:18-ap-50174 - Caruso v. Comcast Cable Communications of Pennsylvania, Inc.
|
07/06/2018
|
Adversary
|
1:18-ap-50175 - Caruso v. Integrity Network Solutions, Inc.
|
07/06/2018
|
Adversary
|
1:18-ap-50176 - Caruso v. Base Hill, Inc. d/b/a Jan Point
|
07/06/2018
|
Adversary
|
1:18-ap-50177 - Caruso v. Janitronics, Inc.
|
07/06/2018
|
Adversary
|
1:18-ap-50178 - Caruso v. Scripps Media, Inc. d/b/a KMCI-TV
|
07/06/2018
|
Adversary
|
1:18-ap-50179 - Caruso v. Pittore Bros. Paving, LLC
|
07/06/2018
|
Adversary
|
1:18-ap-50180 - Caruso v. Solar Cleaning
|
07/06/2018
|
Adversary
|
1:18-ap-50181 - Caruso v. Allied Universal Security Services, LLC
|
07/06/2018
|
Adversary
|
1:18-ap-50182 - Caruso v. Volleyball Associates
|
07/06/2018
|
Adversary
|
1:18-ap-50185 - Caruso v. Lowe & Partners Worldwide, Inc. d/b/a SociedAd
|
07/11/2018
|
Adversary
|
1:18-ap-50188 - Caruso v. Rock Solid Technical Services, LLC
|
07/13/2018
|
Adversary
|
1:18-ap-50193 - Caruso v. Facebook, Inc.
|
07/20/2018
|
Adversary
|
1:18-ap-50194 - Caruso v. Iron Mountain Incorporated
|
07/20/2018
|
Adversary
|
1:18-ap-50197 - Caruso v. Comcast Cable Communications, Inc.
|
07/24/2018
|
Adversary
|
1:18-ap-50198 - Caruso v. AT&T Corp.
|
07/24/2018
|
Adversary
|
1:18-ap-50199 - Caruso v. Global Crossing Telecommunications, Inc.
|
07/24/2018
|
Adversary
|
1:18-ap-50202 - Caruso v. Jones & Bartlett Publishers, LLC
|
07/27/2018
|
Adversary
|
1:18-ap-50203 - Caruso v. That's Good HR, Inc.
|
07/27/2018
|
Adversary
|
1:18-ap-50204 - Caruso v. ABC Holding Company, Inc. d/b/a KABC-TV
|
07/30/2018
|
Adversary
|
1:18-ap-50205 - Caruso v. Midwest Collaborative for Library Services, Inc.
|
07/30/2018
|
Adversary
|
1:18-ap-50206 - Caruso v. Office Depot, Inc.
|
07/30/2018
|
Adversary
|
1:18-ap-50207 - Caruso v. IHeartCommunications, Inc.
|
07/30/2018
|
Adversary
|
1:18-ap-50208 - Caruso v. Deaf Interpreter Services, Inc.
|
07/30/2018
|
Adversary
|
1:18-ap-50210 - Caruso v. Ad Astra Information Systems, L.L.C.
|
08/03/2018
|
Adversary
|
1:18-ap-50211 - Caruso v. Allegient, LLC
|
08/03/2018
|
Adversary
|
1:18-ap-50212 - Caruso v. Katten Muchin Rosenman LLP
|
08/03/2018
|
Adversary
|
1:18-ap-50213 - Caruso v. Miller, Canfield, Paddock and Stone, P.L.C.
|
08/03/2018
|
Adversary
|
1:18-ap-50214 - Caruso v. Skydome Consulting, LLC
|
08/03/2018
|
Adversary
|
1:18-ap-50215 - Caruso v. Incorporated d/b/a Luna Language Services
|
08/03/2018
|
Adversary
|
1:18-ap-50216 - Caruso v. Nevada Power Company d/b/a NV Energy
|
08/03/2018
|
Adversary
|
1:18-ap-50218 - Caruso v. Onbrand24, LLC
|
08/03/2018
|
Adversary
|
1:18-ap-50219 - Caruso v. Laff Media, LLC
|
08/03/2018
|
Adversary
|
1:18-ap-50220 - Caruso v. WEC Energy Group, Inc. d/b/a WE Energies
|
08/03/2018
|
Adversary
|
1:18-ap-50225 - Caruso v. Griffin & Griffin Cleaning Company
|
08/07/2018
|
Adversary
|
1:18-ap-50229 - Caruso v. Google LLC f/d/b/a Google Inc.
|
08/13/2018
|
Adversary
|
1:18-ap-50230 - Caruso v. John Wiley & Sons, Inc.
|
08/13/2018
|
Adversary
|
1:18-ap-50231 - Caruso v. Oak Hall Industries, LP
|
08/13/2018
|
Adversary
|
1:18-ap-50232 - Caruso v. Presidio Infrastructure Solutions LLC
|
08/13/2018
|
Adversary
|
1:18-ap-50233 - Caruso v. Truescreen, Inc.
|
08/13/2018
|
Adversary
|
1:18-ap-50234 - Caruso v. Off Duty Officers Inc.
|
08/13/2018
|
Adversary
|
1:18-ap-50235 - Caruso v. National Instruments Corporation
|
08/13/2018
|
Adversary
|
1:18-ap-50239 - Caruso v. Services Company, Inc.
|
08/14/2018
|
Adversary
|
1:18-ap-50241 - Caruso v. EBSCO Industries, Inc.
|
08/15/2018
|
Adversary
|
1:18-ap-50242 - Caruso v. Next Step Learning Solutions LLC
|
08/15/2018
|
Adversary
|
1:18-ap-50248 - Caruso v. National Economic Research Associates, Inc.
|
08/23/2018
|
Adversary
|
1:18-ap-50249 - Caruso v. Best Facility Services
|
08/23/2018
|
Adversary
|
1:18-ap-50250 - Caruso v. ARAMARK Refresment Services, LLC
|
08/23/2018
|
Adversary
|
1:18-ap-50251 - Caruso v. Atlanta's Favorite Transportation, Inc.
|
08/23/2018
|
Adversary
|
1:18-ap-50252 - Caruso v. The Brickman Group, Ltd.
|
08/23/2018
|
Adversary
|
1:18-ap-50253 - Caruso v. Citrix Systems, Inc.
|
08/23/2018
|
Adversary
|
1:18-ap-50254 - Caruso v. City Wide Maintenance of Indy
|
08/23/2018
|
Adversary
|
1:18-ap-50255 - Caruso v. Direct Agents Inc.
|
08/23/2018
|
Adversary
|
1:18-ap-50256 - Caruso v. Fresh Start Service Solutions
|
08/23/2018
|
Adversary
|
1:18-ap-50257 - Caruso v. Geometry Global LLC
|
08/23/2018
|
Adversary
|
1:18-ap-50258 - Caruso v. Jak Solutions LLC
|
08/23/2018
|
Adversary
|
1:18-ap-50259 - Caruso v. The National Technical Honor Society (NTHS)
|
08/23/2018
|
Adversary
|
1:18-ap-50260 - Caruso v. Silverback Network, Inc.
|
08/23/2018
|
Adversary
|
1:18-ap-50261 - Caruso v. University Bound, Inc.
|
08/23/2018
|
Adversary
|
1:18-ap-50263 - Caruso v. Dove Data Products, Inc.
|
08/29/2018
|
Adversary
|
1:18-ap-50266 - Caruso v. ServiceNow, Inc.
|
09/04/2018
|
Adversary
|
1:18-ap-50267 - Caruso v. Skillsoft Corporation
|
09/06/2018
|
Adversary
|
1:18-ap-50268 - Caruso v. the Deaf and Hard of Hearing Persons
|
09/06/2018
|
Adversary
|
1:18-ap-50269 - Caruso v. Canteen Refreshment Services
|
09/06/2018
|
Adversary
|
1:18-ap-50270 - Caruso v. Quattlebaum, Grooms & Tull PLLC
|
09/07/2018
|
Adversary
|
1:18-ap-50271 - Caruso v. United States Department of Education
|
09/07/2018
|
Adversary
|
1:18-ap-50272 - Caruso v. Peaks Trust 2009-1 et al
|
09/07/2018
|
Adversary
|
1:18-ap-50273 - Caruso v. Baltimore Gas and Electric Company
|
09/07/2018
|
Adversary
|
1:18-ap-50274 - Caruso v. Indianapolis Power & Light Company
|
09/07/2018
|
Adversary
|
1:18-ap-50275 - Caruso v. DirecTV, LLC
|
09/10/2018
|
Adversary
|
1:18-ap-50276 - Caruso v. Deloitte & Touche, LLP
|
09/10/2018
|
Adversary
|
1:18-ap-50278 - Caruso v. Tribune Broadcasting Company, LLC et al
|
09/10/2018
|
Adversary
|
1:18-ap-50279 - Caruso v. Campus Explorer, Inc.
|
09/10/2018
|
Adversary
|
1:18-ap-50280 - Caruso v. Cintas Corporation et al
|
09/11/2018
|
Adversary
|
1:18-ap-50283 - Caruso v. Fedex Corporation et al
|
09/11/2018
|
Adversary
|
1:18-ap-50284 - Caruso v. Waste Management, Inc.
|
09/11/2018
|
Adversary
|
1:18-ap-50285 - Caruso v. Cox Media L.L.C et al
|
09/11/2018
|
Adversary
|
1:18-ap-50287 - Caruso v. Milwaukee Television, LLC et al
|
09/11/2018
|
Adversary
|
1:18-ap-50288 - Caruso v. Marathon Ventures, LLC et al
|
09/12/2018
|
Adversary
|
1:18-ap-50289 - Caruso v. Entergy Louisiana, LLC et al
|
09/12/2018
|
Adversary
|
1:18-ap-50290 - Caruso v. Pacificorp
|
09/12/2018
|
Adversary
|
1:18-ap-50291 - Caruso v. Xcel Energy Inc. et al
|
09/12/2018
|
Adversary
|
1:18-ap-50292 - Caruso v. National Grid USA et al
|
09/12/2018
|
Adversary
|
1:18-ap-50293 - Caruso v. Weigel Broadcasting Co. et al
|
09/12/2018
|
Adversary
|
1:18-ap-50294 - Caruso v. Cobb Electric Membership Corporation
|
09/12/2018
|
Adversary
|
1:18-ap-50295 - Caruso v. NextEra Energy, Inc. et al
|
09/12/2018
|
Adversary
|
1:18-ap-50296 - Caruso v. FirstEnergy Corp. et al
|
09/12/2018
|
Adversary
|
1:18-ap-50297 - Caruso v. Dominion Energy, Inc. et al
|
09/12/2018
|
Adversary
|
1:18-ap-50298 - Caruso v. Bessemer Utilities
|
09/12/2018
|
Adversary
|
1:18-ap-50299 - Caruso v. Nashville Electric Service
|
09/12/2018
|
Adversary
|
1:18-ap-50300 - Caruso v. Cengage Learning, Inc.
|
09/12/2018
|
Adversary
|
1:18-ap-50301 - Caruso v. American Electric Power Company Inc. et al
|
09/12/2018
|
Adversary
|
1:18-ap-50302 - Caruso v. Last Second Media Inc.
|
09/12/2018
|
Adversary
|
1:18-ap-50303 - Caruso v. Pitney Bowes Inc. et al
|
09/12/2018
|
Adversary
|
1:18-ap-50304 - Caruso v. Nexstar Media Group, Inc. et al
|
09/12/2018
|
Adversary
|
1:18-ap-50305 - Caruso v. Boston Portfolio Advisors, Inc. et al
|
09/12/2018
|
Adversary
|
1:18-ap-50307 - Caruso v. Fox Broadcasting Company et al
|
09/12/2018
|
Adversary
|
1:18-ap-50308 - Caruso v. NBCUniversal Media, LLC et al
|
09/12/2018
|
Adversary
|
1:18-ap-50309 - Caruso v. Sinclair Broadcast Group, Inc. et al
|
09/13/2018
|
Adversary
|
1:18-ap-50311 - Caruso v. Viacom, Inc. et al
|
09/13/2018
|
Adversary
|
1:18-ap-50312 - Caruso v. Charter Communications, Inc. et al
|
09/13/2018
|
Adversary
|
1:18-ap-50313 - Caruso v. Turner Broadcasting System, Inc. et al
|
09/13/2018
|
Adversary
|
1:19-ap-50105 - Miner v. ITT Educational Services, Inc. et al
|
05/29/2019
|