Patricia Sue Williams v. Beverly Ranch Mercado, Inc. et al
California Central District Court | |
Judge: | Stephen V Wilson |
Referred: | John E Mcdermott |
Case #: | 2:16-cv-07009 |
Nature of Suit | 446 Civil Rights - Amer w/Disabilities - Other |
Cause | 42:12101 Americans With Disabilities Act |
Case Filed: | Sep 18, 2016 |
Terminated: | Oct 17, 2016 |
Last checked: Friday Mar 17, 2017 2:10 AM PDT |
Defendant
Beverly Ranch Mercado, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Michelle Ha
|
|
Defendant
Sangjin Ha
|
|
Defendant
Does
|
|
Plaintiff
Patricia Sue Williams
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/18/2024 11:59 PM PDT |
Tuesday, November 01, 2016 | ||
16 | 16
notice
Voluntary Dismissal of a Case (Pursuant to FRCP 41a (1))
Tue 11/01 7:32 PM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal filed by plaintiff Patricia Sue Williams. Dismissal is with prejudice. (Kim, Jong) |
|
Monday, October 17, 2016 | ||
15 | 15
order
Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held ~Util - Terminate Civil Case
Mon 10/17 12:01 PM
MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS MOVING CASE TO INACTIVE CALENDAR PENDING SETTLEMENT by Judge Stephen V. Wilson re: Notice of Settlement14 . (Made JS-6. Case Terminated.) (mrgo) |
|
Friday, October 14, 2016 | ||
14 | 14
notice
Settlement
Fri 10/14 4:31 PM
NOTICE of Settlement filed by plaintiff Patricia Sue Williams. (Kim, Jong) |
|
13 | 13
order
Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held ~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines
Fri 10/14 12:01 PM
MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS - ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE WHY THIS CASE SHOULD NOT BE DISMISSED FOR LACK OF PROSECUTION by Judge Stephen V. Wilson. (Show Cause Response due by 10/28/2016.) (mrgo) |
|
Friday, September 30, 2016 | ||
12 | 12
service
Proof of Service (subsequent documents)
Fri 09/30 12:24 PM
PROOF OF SERVICE filed by plaintiff Patricia Sue Williams, re Initial Order upon Filing of Complaint - form only11 served on 09/30/2016. (Kim, Jong) |
|
11 | 11
order
Initial Order upon Filing of Complaint - form only
Fri 09/30 11:41 AM
NEW CASE ORDER upon filing of the complaint by Judge Stephen V. Wilson. (pc) |
|
Thursday, September 29, 2016 | ||
10 | 10
service
Service of Summons and Complaint Returned Executed (21 days)
Thu 09/29 6:00 PM
PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Patricia Sue Williams, upon Defendant Michelle Ha served on 9/20/2016, answer due 10/11/2016. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Michelle Ha, an individual in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons NOT returned. (Kim, Jong) |
|
9 | 9
service
Service of Summons and Complaint Returned Executed (21 days)
Thu 09/29 5:59 PM
PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Patricia Sue Williams, upon Defendant Sangjin Ha served on 9/22/2016, answer due 10/13/2016. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Sangjin Ha, an individual in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons NOT returned. (Kim, Jong) |
|
8 | 8
service
Service of Summons and Complaint Returned Executed (21 days)
Thu 09/29 5:57 PM
PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Patricia Sue Williams, upon Defendant Beverly Ranch Mercado, Inc. served on 9/20/2016, answer due 10/11/2016. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Michelle Ha, Owner/Authorized to accept in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by service on a domestic corporation, unincorporated association, or public entity.Original Summons NOT returned. (Kim, Jong) |
|
Monday, September 19, 2016 | ||
7 | 7
service
Summons Issued (Attorney Civil Case Opening)
Mon 09/19 5:23 PM
21 DAY Summons issued re Complaint1 as to defendants Beverly Ranch Mercado, Inc., Michelle Ha, Sangjin Ha. (esa) |
|
6 | 6
adr
Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program (ADR-8) - optional html form
Mon 09/19 5:13 PM
NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (esa) |
|
5 | 5
notice
Notice of Assignment to United States Judges (CV-18) - optional html form
Mon 09/19 5:13 PM
NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Stephen V. Wilson and Magistrate Judge John E. McDermott. (esa) |
|
Sunday, September 18, 2016 | ||
4 | 4
notice
Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties
Sun 09/18 8:45 PM
CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Patricia Sue Williams, (Kim, Jong) |
|
3 | 3
misc
Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71)
Sun 09/18 8:45 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Patricia Sue Williams. (Kim, Jong) |
|
2 | 2
notice
Summons Request
Sun 09/18 8:44 PM
Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 filed by plaintiff Patricia Sue Williams. (Kim, Jong) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)
Sun 09/18 8:44 PM
COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-18570508 - Fee: $400, filed by plaintiff Patricia Sue Williams. (Attorney Jong Yun Kim added to party Patricia Sue Williams(pty:pla))(Kim, Jong) |