|
GPO
Jun 07 2006
REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS as to Mark Avery Raines Objections to R&R due by 6/27/2006.. Signed by Judge G. Mallon Faircloth on 6/7/06. (Faircloth, G.)
|
|
GPO
Jun 22 2006
REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS as to Kenneth John Pachinger Objections to R&R due by 7/12/2006.. Signed by Judge G. Mallon Faircloth on 6/22/06. (Faircloth, G.)
|
|
GPO
Nov 17 2006
ORDER denying 123 Motion to Vacate (2255) as to Kenneth John Pachinger (1); denying 135 Order on Amended Motion re 143 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS as to Kenneth John Pachinger as to Kenneth John Pachinger (1); adopting Report and Recommendations re 143 Report and Recommendations as to Kenneth John Pachinger (1). Ordered by Judge C. Ashley Royal on 11/17/06. (ans, )
|
|
GPO
Nov 27 2006
ORDER denying 120 Motion to Vacate (2255) as to Mark Avery Raines (2); adopting Report and Recommendations re 139 Report and Recommendations as to Mark Avery Raines (2). Ordered by Judge C. Ashley Royal on 10/31/06. (ans, )
|
|
GPO
Aug 17 2012
ORDER denying 191 Rule 60(b) MOTION for Relief from Judgment or Order as to Kenneth John Pachinger (1). Ordered by Judge Hugh Lawson on 8/17/2012. (nbp)
|
|
GPO
Feb 11 2013
ORDER denying 188 Motion to Modify Conditions of Release as to Kenneth John Pachinger (1); denying 194 Motion to Appoint Counsel as to Kenneth John Pachinger (1); denying 197 Motion for Writ of Audita Querela as to Kenneth John Pachinger (1); denying 205 Motion for Clarification of Terms of Supervised Release as to Kenneth John Pachinger (1). Ordered by Judge Hugh Lawson on 2/11/2013. (nbp)
|
|
GPO
Mar 19 2013
REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS as to Kenneth John Pachinger re 211 MOTION to Vacate under 28 U.S.C. 2255. Ordered by US Mag Judge Thomas Q Langstaff on 3/19/2013. (llf)
|
|
GPO
Apr 18 2013
ORDER finding that Certificate of Appealability is not warranted as to Kenneth John Pachinger. Ordered by Judge Hugh Lawson on 4/18/2013. (nbp)
|
|
GPO
Apr 25 2013
ORDER denying 211 Motion to Vacate (2255) as to Kenneth John Pachinger (1); adopting 215 Report and Recommendations as to Kenneth John Pachinger (1). Ordered by Judge Hugh Lawson on 4/25/2013. (nbp) Civil Case 7:13-cv-90162-HL-TQL closed.
|