Heritage Land, LLC and Good Luck Condominiums, LLC
Maryland Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 7 | |
Judge: | Lori S Simpson |
Case #: | 0:10-bk-36934 |
Case Filed: | Nov 29, 2010 |
Creditor Meeting: | Mar 22, 2011 |
Converted: | Feb 10, 2011 |
Terminated: | Dec 18, 2017 |
Debtor
Heritage Land, LLC
PO Box 310
Ashton, MD 20861-0310 |
Represented By
|
Debtor
Good Luck Condominiums, LLC
P.O. Box 310
Ashton, MD 20861 |
Represented By
|
Last checked: never |
Other Party
Elizabeth Norris
c/o Jan I. Berlage 201 N. Charles Street Suite 2101
Baltimore, MD 21201 |
Represented By
|
Other Party
Thomas Norris
Jan I. Berlage 201 N. Charles Street Suite 2101
Baltimore, MD 21201 |
Represented By
|
Trustee
Janet M. Nesse
McNamee, Hosea, et.al. 6411 Ivy Lane Suite 200
Greenbelt, MD 20770 |
Represented By
|
Trustee
Merrill Cohen
Cohen, Baldinger & Greenfeld, LLC 2600 Tower Oaks Blvd. Suite 103
Rockville, MD 20852 |
Represented By
|
U.S. Trustee
US Trustee - Greenbelt, 11
6305 Ivy Lane, Suite 600
Greenbelt, MD 20770 |
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 10/26/2017 7:17 PM EDT |