OSTERTAG v. ORGANON USA, INC. et al
New Jersey District Court | |
Judge: | Susan D Wigenton |
Referred: | Leda D Wettre |
Case #: | 2:16-cv-05599 |
Nature of Suit | 367 Torts - Personal Injury - Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury/Product Liability |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Product Liability |
Case Filed: | Sep 14, 2016 |
Terminated: | Oct 06, 2016 |
Last checked: Monday Mar 13, 2017 5:09 AM EDT |
Defendant
MERCK & CO., INC
|
|
Defendant
MERCK SHARP & DOHME
|
|
Defendant
N.V. ORGANON
|
|
Defendant
ORGANON USA, INC.
|
|
Defendant
SCHERING CORPORATION
|
|
Plaintiff
LAURA OSTERTAG
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/22/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Thursday, October 06, 2016 | ||
3 | 3
mdl
MDL Transfer Order (out)
Thu 10/06 10:34 AM
Order of MDL Panel transferring case to the Eastern District of Missouri. (ek) |
|
transfer
Case Transferred Out - District Court Transfer
Thu 10/06 11:00 AM
Case extracted via ECF to the Eastern District of Missouri. (ek) |
||
misc
Docket Annotation (public)
Thu 10/06 2:09 PM
Case transferred from New Jersey has been opened in Eastern District of Missouri as case 4:16-cv-01580, filed 10/06/2016. (mfr) |
||
Tuesday, September 20, 2016 | ||
2 | 2
service
Summons Issued
Tue 09/20 8:58 AM
SUMMONS ISSUED as to MERCK & CO., INC, MERCK SHARP & DOHME, N.V. ORGANON, ORGANON USA, INC., SCHERING CORPORATION Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. Issued By *John Lacey* (jpl, ) |
|
Wednesday, September 14, 2016 | ||
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Tue 09/20 8:57 AM
COMPLAINT against MERCK & CO., INC, MERCK SHARP & DOHME, N.V. ORGANON, ORGANON USA, INC., SCHERING CORPORATION ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-7349709) with JURY DEMAND, filed by LAURA OSTERTAG.(jpl, ) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet |