ZAMOS v. MCNEIL-PPC, INC. et al
Pennsylvania Eastern District Court | |
Judge: | Robert F Kelly |
Case #: | 2:16-cv-05038 |
Nature of Suit | 190 Contract - Other Contract |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Contract Dispute |
Case Filed: | Sep 20, 2016 |
Terminated: | Jan 05, 2017 |
Last checked: Sunday Mar 19, 2017 4:43 AM EDT |
Defendant
JOHNSON & JOHNSON CONSUMER INC.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
MCNEIL-PPC, INC.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
DAVID ZAMOS
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 4 hours ago |
Monday, November 13, 2017 | ||
16 | 16
appeal
USCA Order
Mon 11/13 4:25 PM
USCA ORDER AS TO15 NOTICE OF APPEAL FILED BY DAVID ZAMOS THAT THE DISTRICT COURT'S ORDER ENTERED ON 1/6/2017 IS AFFIRMED. EACH PARTY TO BEAR ITS OWN COSTS. (amas) |
|
Monday, January 30, 2017 | ||
appeal
USCA Appeal Fees
Tue 01/31 10:06 AM
USCA Appeal Fees received $ 505 receipt number 153988 re15 Notice of Appeal filed by DAVID ZAMOS (amas) |
||
Thursday, January 26, 2017 | ||
15 | 15
appeal
Notice of Appeal
Thu 01/26 10:53 AM
NOTICE OF APPEAL by DAVID ZAMOS. Copies to Judge, Clerk USCA, Appeals Clerk. No fee paid. (MCGINLEY, JOSEPH) Modified on 1/26/2017 (lvj, ). Modified on 1/26/2017 (td, ) |
|
appeal
USCA Notice of Docketing ROA
Thu 01/26 4:38 PM
NOTICE of Docketing Record on Appeal from USCA re15 Notice of Appeal filed by DAVID ZAMOS. USCA Case Number 17-1217 (dmc, ) |
||
Thursday, January 05, 2017 | ||
14 | 14
order
Memorandum and/or Opinion Order
Fri 01/06 9:10 AM
MEMORANDUM ORDER THAT DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO DISMISS IS GRANTED. PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT IS DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. SIGNED BY HONORABLE ROBERT F. KELLY ON 1/5/2017. 1/6/2017 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(amas) |
|
13 | 13
order
Memorandum and/or Opinion
Fri 01/06 9:07 AM
MEMORANDUM. SIGNED BY HONORABLE ROBERT F. KELLY ON 1/5/2017. 1/6/2017 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(amas) |
|
Thursday, October 27, 2016 | ||
12 | 12
order
Order on Motion to Remand Order on Motion to Remand to State Court
Thu 10/27 3:34 PM
ORDER THAT PLAINTIFF'S MOTIONS TO REMAND (DOC. NOS.6 AND8 ), ARE DENIED. SIGNED BY HONORABLE ROBERT F. KELLY ON 10/27/2016.10/27/2016 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(amas) |
|
Monday, October 24, 2016 | ||
11 | 11
respm
Reply to Response to Motion
Mon 10/24 3:35 PM
REPLY to Response to Motion re4 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by JOHNSON & JOHNSON CONSUMER INC., MCNEIL-PPC, INC..(MULGREW, DENNIS) |
|
Att: 1 Certificate of Service | ||
10 | 10
respm
Response in Opposition to Motion
Mon 10/24 3:33 PM
RESPONSE in Opposition re6 MOTION to Remand filed by JOHNSON & JOHNSON CONSUMER INC., MCNEIL-PPC, INC..(MULGREW, DENNIS) |
|
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order, | ||
Att: 2 Certificate of Service, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit A | ||
Monday, October 17, 2016 | ||
9 | 9
motion
Remand to State Court
Mon 10/17 10:23 AM
MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by DAVID ZAMOS.exhibit.(MCGINLEY, JOSEPH) |
|
8 | 8
motion
Remand to State Court
Mon 10/17 9:57 AM
MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by DAVID ZAMOS.exhibit.(MCGINLEY, JOSEPH) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit | ||
7 | 7
respm
Response in Opposition to Motion
Mon 10/17 9:38 AM
RESPONSE in Opposition re4 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by DAVID ZAMOS.(MCGINLEY, JOSEPH) |
|
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order, | ||
Att: 2 Brief, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit | ||
Sunday, October 09, 2016 | ||
6 | 6
motion
Remand
Sun 10/09 8:51 AM
MOTION to Remand filed by DAVID ZAMOS..(MCGINLEY, JOSEPH) |
|
Att: 1 Memorandum, | ||
Att: 2 Text of Proposed Order, | ||
Att: 3 Certificate of Service | ||
Monday, October 03, 2016 | ||
5 | 5
misc
State Court Record
Tue 10/04 8:49 AM
Original Record together with certified copy of docket entries received from Court of Common Pleas of BUCKS County. (amas) |
|
Tuesday, September 27, 2016 | ||
4 | 4
motion
Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim
Tue 09/27 1:55 PM
MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by JOHNSON & JOHNSON CONSUMER INC., MCNEIL-PPC, INC..Brief, Certificate of Service.(MULGREW, DENNIS) |
|
Att: 1 Brief, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit 1, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit 2, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit 3, | ||
Att: 5 Certificate of Service, | ||
Att: 6 Text of Proposed Order | ||
Tuesday, September 20, 2016 | ||
3 | 3
discov
Disclosure Statement Form 7.1 (COURT ONLY)
Wed 09/21 11:00 AM
Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 Identifying Corporate Parent JOHNSON & JOHNSON for JOHNSON & JOHNSON CONSUMER INC., MCNEIL-PPC, INC.. by JOHNSON & JOHNSON CONSUMER INC., MCNEIL-PPC, INC.; Cert of Serv.(jmv, ) |
|
2 | 2
notice
Notice of Appearance
Wed 09/21 10:59 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by JOHNSON & JOHNSON CONSUMER INC., MCNEIL-PPC, INC. with Cert of Serv.(jmv, ) |
|
1 | 1
notice
Notice of Removal
Wed 09/21 10:56 AM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL by JOHNSON & JOHNSON CONSUMER INC., MCNEIL-PPC, INC. from Court of Common Pleas Bucks County, case number 2016-05163. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number PPE147203); Cert of Serv.(jmv, ) |
|
Att: 1 1, | ||
Att: 2 2, | ||
Att: 3 3, | ||
Att: 4 4, | ||
Att: 5 5, | ||
Att: 6 Appearance of Mulgrew, | ||
Att: 7 Case Management Track Form, | ||
Att: 8 Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 9 Designation Form |