In the Matter of Abe's Boat Rentals, Inc.
Louisiana Eastern District Court | |
Judge: | Mary Ann Vial Lemmon |
Referred: | Karen Wells Roby |
Case #: | 2:16-cv-14895 |
Nature of Suit | 340 Torts - Personal Injury - Marine |
Cause | 46:30504 Exoneration from or Limitation of Liability |
Case Filed: | Sep 22, 2016 |
Terminated: | Jan 09, 2018 |
Last checked: Tuesday Mar 21, 2017 4:18 AM CDT |
Claimant
Walter A. Stokes
|
Represented By
|
Claimant
Trinity Liftboat Services, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Claimant
WAS Marine Service, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Petitioner
Abe's Boat Rentals, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Third Party Defendant
Mr. Tony Galindo
|
Represented By
|
Third Party Plaintiff
Abe's Boat Rentals, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/23/2024 11:59 PM CDT |
Tuesday, January 09, 2018 | ||
16 | 16
1
pgs
order
Order Dismissing Case
Tue 01/09 1:34 PM
ORDER DISMISSING CASE without prejudice. Signed by Judge Mary Ann Vial Lemmon on 1/9/2018. (cms) |
|
Thursday, December 29, 2016 | ||
15 | 15
order
Order ~Util - Create Case Association ~Util - Set/Clear Flags
Thu 12/29 11:22 AM
ORDER of Consolidation: Create association to 2:16-cv-14570-MVL-KWR. Signed by Judge Mary Ann Vial Lemmon on 12/28/2016. (mmm) |
|
Friday, December 09, 2016 | ||
14 | 14
order
Order on Motion for Default Judgment
Fri 12/09 11:57 AM
DEFAULT JUDGMENT as to all non-appearing claimants. Signed by Judge Mary Ann Vial Lemmon. (cbn) |
|
13 | 13
order
Order ~Util - Set/Reset Hearings
Fri 12/09 10:37 AM
NOTICE: Telephone Scheduling Conference reset for 1/27/2017 10:30 AM before case manager. (cbn) |
|
Wednesday, December 07, 2016 | ||
12 | 12
motion
Default Judgment
Wed 12/07 10:02 AM
EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Default Judgment as to All Non-Appearing Claimants by Abe's Boat Rentals, Inc..(Larzelere, Stephen) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Affidavit Re: Newspaper Publication of Notice, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit B - Entry of Judgment, | ||
Att: 3 Proposed Order Judgment by Default | ||
Tuesday, December 06, 2016 | ||
11 | 11
order
Order Set Hearings
Tue 12/06 10:40 AM
NOTICE: Scheduling Conference set for 12/15/2016 10:00 AM before case manager by telephone. (cbn) |
|
Wednesday, November 30, 2016 | ||
10 | 10
order
Order on Motion for Entry of Default
Wed 11/30 8:27 AM
ORDER granting9 Motion for Entry of Default as to all non appearing claimants. Signed by clerk. (cbn) |
|
Wednesday, November 23, 2016 | ||
9 | 9
motion
Entry of Default
Wed 11/23 3:46 PM
EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Entry of Default as to All non-appearing claimants by Abe's Boat Rentals, Inc.(Larzelere, Stephen) Modified text/event on 11/23/2016 (mmm) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit Affidavit Re: Newspaper Publication of Notice, | ||
Att: 2 Proposed Order | ||
Monday, November 21, 2016 | ||
8 | 8
misc
Statement of Corporate Disclosure
Mon 11/21 5:04 PM
Statement of Corporate Disclosure by Walter A. Stokes, WAS Marine Service, Inc. (Clements, Miles) |
|
7 | 7
answer
Answer to Complaint
Mon 11/21 5:02 PM
ANSWER and CLAIM to1 Complaint,,, by Walter A. Stokes, WAS Marine Service, Inc..Attorney Miles Paul Clements added to party Walter A. Stokes(pty:clm), Attorney Miles Paul Clements added to party WAS Marine Service, Inc.(pty:clm).(Clements, Miles) |
|
6 | 6
answer
Answer to Complaint
Mon 11/21 4:45 PM
ANSWER and CLAIM to1 Complaint,,, for Exoneration From, or Limiation of Liability by Trinity Liftboat Services, LLC.Attorney David Louis Carrigee added to party Trinity Liftboat Services, LLC(pty:selreq).(Carrigee, David) |
|
Wednesday, October 12, 2016 | ||
5 | 5
misc
Statement of Corporate Disclosure
Wed 10/12 2:46 PM
Statement of Corporate Disclosure by Abe's Boat Rentals, Inc. (Larzelere, Stephen) |
|
Wednesday, September 28, 2016 | ||
4 | 4
order
Order
Wed 09/28 4:48 PM
ORDER APPROVING AFFIDAVIT OF VALUE, DIRECTING ISSUANCE OF NOTICE AND RESTRAINING PROSECUTION OF CLAIMS. Signed by Judge Mary Ann Vial Lemmon on 9/27/2016.(cms) |
|
Att: 1 Notice | ||
Monday, September 26, 2016 | ||
3 | 3
order
Order Transferring Case
Mon 09/26 10:47 AM
ORDER TRANSFERRING CASE. Case transferred to Judge Mary Ann Vial Lemmon and Magistrate Judge Karen Wells Roby for all further proceedings. Judge Sarah S. Vance, Magistrate Judge Michael North no longer assigned to case. Signed by Judge Sarah S. Vance on 9/26/16. (NEF: Mag 4, Mag 5, CM Section S)(jjs) |
|
Thursday, September 22, 2016 | ||
2 | 2
misc
Initial Case Assignment
Thu 09/22 4:18 PM
Initial Case Assignment to Judge Sarah S. Vance and Magistrate Judge Michael North. (jeg) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Thu 09/22 4:09 PM
COMPLAINT against Abe's Boat Rentals, Inc. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 053L-5720081) filed by Abe's Boat Rentals, Inc..Attorney Stephen Marcus Larzelere added to party Abe's Boat Rentals, Inc.(pty:selreq).(Larzelere, Stephen) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A-WAS Counterclaim, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit B-Galindo Petition, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit C-Declaration of Value of M/V MISS WYNTER, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit D-Declaration of Hank Ton, | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit E-Frilot letter July 8 2016, | ||
Att: 6 Exhibit Verification of Stephen M. Larzelere, | ||
Att: 7 Exhibit Ad Interim Stipulation, | ||
Att: 8 Exhibit Stipulation for Costs, | ||
Att: 9 Exhibit Notice of Complaint, | ||
Att: 10 Proposed Order Order Approving Complainant's Affidavit of Value, | ||
Att: 11 Exhibit Civil Cover Sheet |