Martinez v. Colvin
Florida Southern District Court | |
Judge: | Cecilia M Altonaga |
Referred: | John J O'Sullivan |
Case #: | 1:16-cv-24081 |
Nature of Suit | 863 Social Security - DIWC/DIWW (405(g)) |
Cause | 42:0205 Denial Social Security Benefits |
Case Filed: | Sep 23, 2016 |
Terminated: | Aug 28, 2017 |
Create an account to get the full party report for this case.
Docket last updated: 65 minutes ago |
Tuesday, August 29, 2017 | ||
25 | 25
order
Judgment
Tue 08/29 10:36 AM
FINAL JUDGMENT in favor of Commissioner of Social Security against Elizabeth Martinez. Signed by Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga on 8/29/2017. (ps1) |
|
Monday, August 28, 2017 | ||
24 | 24
4
pgs
order
Order Adopting Report and Recommendations Order on Motion for Summary Judgment
Mon 08/28 3:19 PM
ORDER ADOPTING20 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS With Supporting Memorandum of Law filed by Commissioner of Social Security; denying19 Motion for Summary Judgment; granting20 Motion for Summary Judgment. Closing Case. Signed by Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga on 8/28/2017. (ps1) |
|
Tuesday, August 22, 2017 | ||
23 | 23
respoth
Objections to Report and Recommendations
Tue 08/22 11:15 PM
OBJECTIONS to22 Report and Recommendations by Elizabeth Martinez. (Palacios-Paredes, Katherine) |
|
Tuesday, August 08, 2017 | ||
22 | 22
motion
Report and Recommendations
Tue 08/08 2:21 PM
REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS recommending granting20 Defendant's MOTION for Summary Judgment With Supporting Memorandum of Law filed by Commissioner of Social Security, recommending denying19 Plaintiff's MOTION for Summary Judgment with Supporting Memorandum of Law filed by Elizabeth Martinez. Objections to R&R due by 8/22/2017. Signed by Magistrate Judge John J. O'Sullivan on 8/8/2017. (tro) |
|
Wednesday, April 26, 2017 | ||
21 | 21
respm
Response in Opposition to Motion
Wed 04/26 3:59 PM
RESPONSE in Opposition re19 Plaintiff's MOTION for Summary Judgment with Supporting Memorandum of Law filed by Commissioner of Social Security. Replies due by 5/3/2017. (Welch, Alicia) |
|
20 | 20
motion
Summary Judgment
Wed 04/26 3:58 PM
Defendant's MOTION for Summary Judgment With Supporting Memorandum of Law by Commissioner of Social Security. Responses due by 5/10/2017 (Welch, Alicia) |
|
Monday, March 27, 2017 | ||
19 | 19
motion
Summary Judgment
Mon 03/27 11:44 PM
Plaintiff's MOTION for Summary Judgment with Supporting Memorandum of Law by Elizabeth Martinez. Responses due by 4/10/2017 (Palacios-Paredes, Katherine) |
|
Tuesday, March 07, 2017 | ||
18 | 18
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time
Tue 03/07 9:51 AM
ORDER granting17 Motion for Extension of Time. Plaintiff has until March 26, 2017 to file her motion for summary judgment and supporting memorandum of law. Signed by Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga on 3/7/2017. (ps1) |
|
Monday, March 06, 2017 | ||
17 | 17
motion
Extension of Time
Mon 03/06 2:33 PM
Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment re16 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief by Elizabeth Martinez. Responses due by 3/20/2017(Palacios-Paredes, Katherine) |
|
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order Granting Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment | ||
Tuesday, January 03, 2017 | ||
16 | 16
order
Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
Tue 01/03 10:19 AM
ORDER granting15 Motion for entry of scheduling order and entering scheduling order. Signed by Magistrate Judge John J. O'Sullivan on 1/3/2017. (tro) |
|
Friday, December 23, 2016 | ||
15 | 15
motion
Miscellaneous Relief
Fri 12/23 2:07 PM
Joint MOTION for Entry of Proposed Scheduling Order by Commissioner of Social Security.(Welch, Alicia) |
|
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order | ||
14 | 14
misc
Consent to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge
Fri 12/23 2:04 PM
Notice and NON-CONSENT to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge . Filed by Commissioner of Social Security (Welch, Alicia) |
|
13 | 13
misc
Transcript - Social Security
Fri 12/23 1:55 PM
Social Security Transcripts filed. Transcripts date: 11/23/16. Pages: 1-1444 Welch, Alicia) |
|
Att: 1 Transcripts Pages 300-599, | ||
Att: 2 Transcripts Pages 600-899, | ||
Att: 3 Transcripts Pages 900-1199, | ||
Att: 4 Transcripts Pages 1200-1444 | ||
12 | 12
answer
Answer to Complaint
Fri 12/23 1:44 PM
Defendant's ANSWER to Complaint by Commissioner of Social Security. (Welch, Alicia) |
|
Monday, November 28, 2016 | ||
11 | 11
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time
Mon 11/28 3:53 PM
ORDER granting9 Motion for Extension of Time. Defendant's response to the Complaint due by 12/28/16. Signed by Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga on 11/28/2016. (ps1) |
|
10 | 10
order
Clerks Notice of Magistrate Judge Assignment
Mon 11/28 3:45 PM
Clerks Notice of Magistrate Judge Assignment to Magistrate Judge John J. O'Sullivan. Motions referred to John J. O'Sullivan. (lrz1) |
|
9 | 9
motion
Extension of Time
Mon 11/28 3:04 PM
Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Carolyn W. Colvin. Responses due by 12/15/2016(Welch, Alicia) |
|
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order | ||
8 | 8
notice
Notice of Attorney Appearance
Mon 11/28 3:02 PM
NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Alicia Hayley Welch on behalf of Carolyn W. Colvin. Attorney Alicia Hayley Welch added to party Carolyn W. Colvin(pty:dft). (Welch, Alicia) |
|
utility
~Util - Set/Reset Answer Due Deadline
Mon 11/28 3:53 PM
Set/Reset Answer Due Deadline: Carolyn W. Colvin response due 12/28/2016. (ps1) |
||
Wednesday, October 12, 2016 | ||
7 | 7
service
Summons (Affidavit) Returned Executed as to USA
Wed 10/12 3:40 PM
SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed by Elizabeth Martinez. Carolyn W. Colvin served on 9/29/2016, answer due 11/28/2016.(Palacios-Paredes, Katherine) |
|
Att: 1 Proof of Service as to US Attorney, | ||
Att: 2 Proof of Service as to US Attorney General | ||
6 | 6
order
Order ~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines
Wed 10/12 3:14 PM
ORDER requiring service to be perfected by 12/22/2016. Signed by Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga on 10/12/2016. (ps1) |
|
Friday, September 23, 2016 | ||
5 | 5
notice
Notice of Attorney Appearance
Fri 09/23 8:02 PM
NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Katherine Olivia Palacios-Paredes on behalf of Elizabeth Martinez. Attorney Katherine Olivia Palacios-Paredes added to party Elizabeth Martinez(pty:pla). (Palacios-Paredes, Katherine) |
|
4 | 4
service
Summons Issued as to USA
Fri 09/23 2:31 PM
Summons Issued as to Carolyn W. Colvin, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (lrz1) |
|
4 | 4
service
Summons Issued
Fri 09/23 4:23 PM
Summons Issued as to 2K Clevelander, LLC. (fbn) |
|
4 | 4
order
Clerks Notice of Docket Correction - ELECTRONIC CASE
Fri 09/23 3:54 PM
Clerks Notice to Filer re: Electronic Case. State Court Records not included. Filer is instructed to file a Notice (Other) with the State Court Records attached within 24 hours. (fbn) |
|
3 | 3
notice
Clerk's Notice of Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge - FORM
Fri 09/23 2:25 PM
Clerks Notice pursuant to 28 USC 636(c). Parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge John J. O'Sullivan is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the attached form. (lrz1) |
|
3 | 3
notice
Clerk's Notice of Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge - FORM
Fri 09/23 4:21 PM
Clerks Notice pursuant to 28 USC 636(c). Parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Alicia M. Otazo-Reyes is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the attached form. (fbn) |
|
3 | 3
notice
Clerk's Notice of Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge - FORM
Fri 09/23 3:50 PM
Clerks Notice pursuant to 28 USC 636(c). Parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge John J. O'Sullivan is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the attached form. (fbn) |
|
2 | 2
order
Judge Assignment
Fri 09/23 2:23 PM
Judge Assignment to Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga and Magistrate Judge John J. O'Sullivan (lrz1) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Fri 09/23 12:54 PM
COMPLAINT Elizabeth Martinez against Carolyn W. Colvin. Filing fees $ 400.00 receipt number 113C-9113884, filed by Elizabeth Martinez.(Oliver, Rogelio) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 2 Summon(s) |