NORTHEAST REGIONAL COUNCIL OF CARPENTERS et al v. LANE CONSTRUCTION CO. INC.
New Jersey District Court | |
Judge: | Kevin Mcnulty |
Referred: | James B Clark |
Case #: | 2:16-cv-05815 |
Nature of Suit | 896 Other Statutes - Arbitration |
Cause | 9:9 Motion to Confirm Arbitration Loan |
Case Filed: | Sep 22, 2016 |
Terminated: | Feb 15, 2017 |
Last checked: Tuesday Mar 21, 2017 5:27 AM EDT |
Petitioner
NORTHEAST CARPENTERS FUNDS AND THE TRUSTEES THEREOF
|
Represented By
|
Petitioner
NORTHEAST REGIONAL COUNCIL OF CARPENTERS
|
Represented By
|
Respondent
LANE CONSTRUCTION CO. INC.
|
Docket last updated: 6 hours ago |
Wednesday, February 15, 2017 | ||
5 | 5
order
Judgment
Thu 02/16 3:28 PM
JUDGMENT in the sum of $194,482.07, inclusive of the $400.00 filing fee, in favor of Petitioners NORTHEAST CARPENTERS FUNDS AND THE TRUSTEES THEREOF, NORTHEAST REGIONAL COUNCIL OF CARPENTERS against Respondent LANE CONSTRUCTION CO. INC. ***CIVIL CASE TERMINATED. Signed by Judge Kevin McNulty on 2/15/2017. (ld, ) |
|
4 | 4
order
Order on Motion to Confirm or Vacate Arbitration
Thu 02/16 3:23 PM
ORDER granting2 Motion to Confirm or Vacate Arbitration. Signed by Judge Kevin McNulty on 2/15/2017. (ld, ) |
|
Friday, September 23, 2016 | ||
3 | 3
misc
Corporate Disclosure Statement
Fri 09/23 12:55 PM
Corporate Disclosure Statement by NORTHEAST REGIONAL COUNCIL OF CARPENTERS, NORTHEAST CARPENTERS FUNDS AND THE TRUSTEES THEREOF, identifying NONE as Corporate Parent. (ek) |
|
utility
Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings
Fri 09/23 12:52 PM
Set Deadlines as to2 MOTION to Confirm Arbitration award. Motion set for 10/17/2016 before Judge Kevin McNulty. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (ek) |
||
Thursday, September 22, 2016 | ||
2 | 2
motion
Confirm or Vacate Arbitration
Fri 09/23 12:49 PM
MOTION to Confirm Arbitration award by NORTHEAST CARPENTERS FUNDS AND THE TRUSTEES THEREOF, NORTHEAST REGIONAL COUNCIL OF CARPENTERS.(ek) |
|
Att: 1 Statement, | ||
Att: 2 Text of Proposed Order, | ||
Att: 3 Judgement, | ||
Att: 4 Certificate of Service | ||
1 | 1
cmp
Petition to Confirm or Vacate Arbitration Award
Fri 09/23 12:17 PM
PETITION to Confirm Arbitration Award ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-7365943.), filed by NORTHEAST REGIONAL COUNCIL OF CARPENTERS, NORTHEAST CARPENTERS FUNDS AND THE TRUSTEES THEREOF.(ek) |
|
Att: 1 Cover Letter, | ||
Att: 2 Civil Cover Sheet |