BMG Rights Management (U.S.) LLC et al v. Atlantic Recording Corporation et al
New York Southern District Court | |
Judge: | Kimba M Wood |
Case #: | 1:16-cv-07443 |
Nature of Suit | 820 Property Rights - Copyrights |
Cause | 17:101 Copyright Infringement |
Case Filed: | Sep 23, 2016 |
Terminated: | Jan 31, 2018 |
Last checked: Wednesday Mar 22, 2017 4:57 AM EDT |
Defendant
Atlantic Recording Corporation
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Omari Grandberry
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Dijon McFarlane
|
|
Defendant
Songs Music Publishing, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Universal Music-MGB NA, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
WEA, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
BMG Rights Management (U.S.) LLC
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Nicholas Matthew Balding
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Robert Clifton Brackins III
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Notting Dale Songs Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Primary Wave Music Publishing.LLC,
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Jon Redwine
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/21/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Wednesday, June 06, 2018 | ||
86 | 86
notice
Notice (Other)
Wed 06/06 3:39 PM
NOTICE of Conclusion of Action. Document filed by Atlantic Recording Corporation, Omari Grandberry, Universal Music-MGB NA, LLC, WEA, Inc..(Davis, Jonathan) |
|
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order Stipulation And Order | ||
85 | 85
appeal
USCA Mandate
Wed 06/06 3:35 PM
MANDATE of USCA (Certified Copy) as to76 Notice of Appeal, filed by Jon Redwine, BMG Rights Management (U.S.) LLC, Primary Wave Music Publishing.LLC,, Robert Clifton Brackins III, Nicholas Matthew Balding, Notting Dale Songs Inc. USCA Case Number 18-0726 The parties in the above-referenced case have filed a stipulation withdrawing this appeal pursuant to FRAP 42. The stipulation is hereby "So Ordered".. Catherine O'Hagan Wolfe, Clerk USCA for the Second Circuit. Issued As Mandate: 06/06/2018. (nd) |