Turchetta v. Colvin
Arizona District Court | |
Judge: | Deborah M Fine |
Case #: | 2:16-cv-03244 |
Nature of Suit | 863 Social Security - DIWC/DIWW (405(g)) |
Cause | 42:405 Review of HHS Decision (DIWC) |
Case Filed: | Sep 23, 2016 |
Terminated: | Oct 30, 2017 |
Defendant
Carolyn Colvin
|
|
Defendant
Commissioner of Social Security Administration
|
|
Interested Party
SSA Office of General Counsel
|
|
Plaintiff
Pauline R Turchetta
|
Docket last updated: 04/23/2024 11:59 PM MST |
Wednesday, July 11, 2018 | ||
34 | 34
3
pgs
order
Order on Motion for Attorney Fees
Wed 07/11 9:08 AM
ORDER: IT IS THEREFORE ORDERED granting Turchetta's Motion for Attorney's Fees (Doc.31 ). IT IS FURTHER ORDERED granting Turchetta's counsel's request for $17,521.25. Further, Turchetta's counsel shall, after the receipt of this award, refund to Plaintiff Pauline R. Turchetta the lesser of any fee awarded under 42 U.S.C. § 406(b) and any fees awarded under the Equal Access to Justice Act [see attached Order for details]. Signed by Magistrate Judge Deborah M Fine on 7/10/18. (MAW) |
|
Tuesday, June 26, 2018 | ||
33 | 33
minute_ord
~Util - Add and Terminate Judges ~Util - Set/Clear Flags
Tue 06/26 1:03 PM
MINUTE ORDER: This case is directly reassigned to Magistrate Judge Deborah M Fine. All future filings shall reflect the following case number: CV 16-3244 PHX-DMF. Pending: Motion for Attorneys' Fees, Doc.31 . This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (SJF) |
|
Monday, June 25, 2018 | ||
32 | 32
respm
Response to Motion
Mon 06/25 10:13 AM
RESPONSE to Motion re:31 MOTION for Attorney Fees Under 42 U.S.C. § 406(b) filed by Commissioner of Social Security Administration. (Moum, Sarah) |
|
Tuesday, June 12, 2018 | ||
31 | 31
motion
Attorney Fees
Tue 06/12 2:13 PM
MOTION for Attorney Fees Under 42 U.S.C. § 406(b) by Pauline R Turchetta.(Slepian, Eric) |
|
Att: 1 Appendix | ||
Tuesday, January 23, 2018 | ||
30 | 30
2
pgs
order
Order on Stipulation
Tue 01/23 10:03 AM
ORDER granting29 Stipulation to an Award of Attorney Fees Under the Equal Access to Justice Act (EAJA). The Court hereby awards Plaintiff $6,610.32 in attorney fees pursuant to the EAJA [see attached Order for details]. Signed by Magistrate Judge David K Duncan on 1/23/18. (MAW) |
|
Wednesday, January 17, 2018 | ||
29 | 29
misc
Stipulation
Wed 01/17 1:15 PM
STIPULATION to an Award of Attorney Fees Under the Equal Access to Justice Act by Pauline R Turchetta.(Slepian, Eric) |
|
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order | ||
Monday, October 30, 2017 | ||
28 | 28
order
Clerks Judgment
Mon 10/30 2:33 PM
CLERK'S JUDGMENT - IT IS ORDERED AND ADJUDGED that pursuant to the Court's Order filed October 30, 2017, the decision of the Commissioner of Social Security is vacated, and this case is remanded to the Social Security Administration for further proceedings consistent with the Order. (SLQ) |
|
27 | 27
10
pgs
order
Order
Mon 10/30 2:30 PM
ORDER - IT IS THEREFORE ORDERED that Pauline R. Turchetta's claim for disability is remanded to the Commissioner of the Social Security Administration for an award of benefits. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk of the Court shall enter judgment accordingly. The judgment will serve as the mandate of this Court. (See document for further details). Signed by Magistrate Judge David K Duncan on 10/30/17. (SLQ) |
|
Wednesday, July 12, 2017 | ||
26 | 26
misc
Brief - Reply
Wed 07/12 7:55 PM
REPLY BRIEF by Pauline R Turchetta . (Slepian, Eric) |
|
Monday, July 03, 2017 | ||
25 | 25
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time
Mon 07/03 9:01 AM
ORDER: IT IS ORDERED granting Plaintiff's Second Motion to Enlarge Time to File a Reply Brief (Doc.24 ). Plaintiff may file her Reply Brief on or before July 12, 2017. Signed by Magistrate Judge David K Duncan on 7/03/2017. (REK) |
|
Friday, June 30, 2017 | ||
24 | 24
motion
Extension of Time
Fri 06/30 10:58 AM
Second MOTION for Extension of Time to file a Reply Brief by Pauline R Turchetta.(Slepian, Eric) |
|
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order | ||
Friday, June 16, 2017 | ||
23 | 23
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time
Fri 06/16 9:39 AM
ORDER granting22 Motion for Extension of Time Deadline. Plaintiff may file her Reply Brief on or before 6/30/2017. Signed by Magistrate Judge David K Duncan on 6/16/17.(DXD) |
|
Thursday, June 15, 2017 | ||
22 | 22
motion
Extension of Time
Thu 06/15 1:55 PM
MOTION for Extension of Time to file a Reply Brief by Pauline R Turchetta.(Slepian, Eric) |
|
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order | ||
Wednesday, May 31, 2017 | ||
21 | 21
misc
Brief - Response
Wed 05/31 5:26 PM
RESPONSE BRIEF by Commissioner of Social Security Administration . (Moum, Sarah) |
|
Monday, May 01, 2017 | ||
20 | 20
misc
Brief - Opening
Mon 05/01 8:24 PM
OPENING BRIEF by Pauline R Turchetta . (Slepian, Eric) |
|
19 | 19
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Document
Mon 05/01 1:27 PM
ORDER: IT IS ORDERED granting Plaintiffs Second Motion to Enlarge Time to File an Opening Brief (Doc.18 ). Plaintiff's opening brief is due no later than May 1, 2017. Signed by Magistrate Judge David K Duncan on 5/01/2017. (REK) |
|
Friday, April 28, 2017 | ||
18 | 18
motion
Extension of Time to File Document
Fri 04/28 4:45 PM
Second MOTION for Extension of Time to File Opening Brief by Pauline R Turchetta.(Slepian, Eric) |
|
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order | ||
Monday, March 27, 2017 | ||
17 | 17
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time
Mon 03/27 10:19 AM
ORDER granting16 Motion to Enlarge Time. Plaintiff may file her Opening Brief on or before April 28, 2017. Signed by Magistrate Judge David K Duncan on 3/27/17.(MAW) |
|
Friday, March 24, 2017 | ||
16 | 16
motion
Extension of Time
Fri 03/24 4:23 PM
MOTION for Extension of Time to file an Opening Brief by Pauline R Turchetta.(Slepian, Eric) |
|
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order | ||
Tuesday, January 24, 2017 | ||
15 | 15
notice
Notice of Filing - Soc. Sec. Admin. Transcript
Tue 01/24 11:05 AM
NOTICE of Filing Certified Copy of Administrative Transcript re:14 Answer to Complaint filed by Carolyn Colvin.(Moum, Sarah) |
|
Att: 1 Certification Page, | ||
Att: 2 Court Transcript Index, | ||
Att: 3 Documents Related to Administrative Process Including Transcript of Oral Hearing, if applicable, | ||
Att: 4 Payment Documents and Decisions, | ||
Att: 5 Jurisdictional Documents and Notices, | ||
Att: 6 Non Disability Related Development, | ||
Att: 7 Disability Related Development, | ||
Att: 8 Medical Records Part 1, | ||
Att: 9 Medical Records Part 2, | ||
Att: 10 Medical Records Part 3, | ||
Att: 11 Medical Records Part 4 | ||
14 | 14
answer
Answer to Complaint
Tue 01/24 10:59 AM
ANSWER to1 Complaint by Carolyn Colvin.(Moum, Sarah) |
|
Friday, January 20, 2017 | ||
13 | 13
misc
25 Pct Mag - Text Order: Consent to Proceed before Mag Judge
Fri 01/20 4:48 PM
Minute Order: In accordance with 28 USC 636(c), all parties have voluntarily consented to have Magistrate Judge David K. Duncan conduct all further proceedings in this case, including trial and entry of final judgment, and conduct all post-judgment proceedings, with direct review by the Ninth Circuit Court of Appeals, if an appeal is filed. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MAP) |
|
12 | 12
misc
25 Pct Mag - Agreement to Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction
Fri 01/20 4:47 PM
Agreement to Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. Party agrees to Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MAP) |
|
Monday, January 09, 2017 | ||
11 | 11
misc
25 Pct Mag - Magistrate Election Form Deadline
Tue 01/10 8:09 AM
Magistrate Election Form Deadline set as to Carolyn Colvin.(MAP) |
|
Att: 1 Consent Form | ||
10 | 10
notice
Notice of Attorney Appearance/Substitution - USA
Mon 01/09 12:06 PM
NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Sarah Moum appearing for Carolyn Colvin. . (Moum, Sarah) |
|
Friday, December 09, 2016 | ||
9 | 9
service
Service Executed
Fri 12/09 3:02 PM
SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Pauline R Turchetta: Notice of Service re: Complaint upon Carolyn Colvin on 11/25/2016. (Slepian, Eric) |
|
Friday, October 07, 2016 | ||
8 | 8
service
Summons Issued as to USA
Fri 10/07 8:23 AM
Summons Issued as to Carolyn Colvin, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General.(BAS) |
|
Att: 1 Summons, | ||
Att: 2 Summons | ||
Thursday, October 06, 2016 | ||
7 | 7
order
Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis
Thu 10/06 12:16 PM
ORDER granting3 Application to Proceed in District Court Without Prepaying Fees or Costs. Plaintiff shall be responsible for service by waiver or of the summons and complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge David K Duncan on 10/6/16.(EJA) |
|
Wednesday, September 28, 2016 | ||
6 | 6
misc
25 Pct Mag - Agreement to Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction
Thu 09/29 3:07 PM
Agreement to Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. Party agrees to Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MAP) |
|
Monday, September 26, 2016 | ||
5 | 5
order
Order
Mon 09/26 8:42 AM
SOCIAL SECURITY SCHEDULING ORDER: See document for details. Signed by Magistrate Judge David K Duncan on 9/23/16. (EJA) |
|
Friday, September 23, 2016 | ||
4 | 4
misc
New Case Opened
Fri 09/23 3:06 PM
This case has been assigned to the Honorable David K Duncan. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: CV 16-03244 PHX-DKD. Magistrate Election form attached.(KGM) |
|
Att: 1 MAG 25 Instructions | ||
3 | 3
motion
Proceed In Forma Pauperis
Fri 09/23 3:04 PM
APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis by Pauline R Turchetta (submitted by Eric Slepian). (KGM) |
|
2 | 2
service
Summons Submitted
Fri 09/23 2:57 PM
SUMMONS Submitted by Pauline R Turchetta (submitted by Eric Slepian).(KGM) |
|
Att: 1 Summons, | ||
Att: 2 Summons | ||
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Fri 09/23 2:54 PM
COMPLAINT filed by Pauline R Turchetta (submitted by Eric Slepian).(KGM) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet |