Mirsaeid Mirseyedi v. ACE American Insurance Company et al
California Central District Court | |
Judge: | Andre Birotte Jr |
Referred: | Charles F Eick |
Case #: | 2:16-cv-07163 |
Nature of Suit | 110 Contract - Insurance |
Cause | 28:1441 Notice of Removal - Breach of Contract |
Case Filed: | Sep 23, 2016 |
Terminated: | Apr 04, 2017 |
Last checked: Wednesday Mar 22, 2017 2:00 AM PDT |
Defendant
ACE American Insurance Company
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Does
|
|
Plaintiff
Mirsaeid Mirseyedi
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 12 hours ago |
Tuesday, April 18, 2017 | ||
18 | 18
order
Order
Tue 04/18 8:59 AM
ORDER GRANTING STIPULATION FOR DISMISSAL OF ENTIRE ACTION WITH PREJUDICE by Judge Andre Birotte Jr. Based upon the stipulation of the parties17 and for good cause shown, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that this action, Case No. 2:16-cv-07163-AB-E, is dismissed in its entirety with prejudice. IT IS HEREBY FURTHER ORDERED that each party shall bear its own attorneys' fees and costs in this matter. (iv) |
|
Thursday, April 13, 2017 | ||
17 | 17
stip
Dismiss Case
Thu 04/13 4:50 PM
Joint STIPULATION to Dismiss Case pursuant to Settlement filed by Plaintiff Mirsaeid Mirseyedi.(Horrow, Michael) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
Tuesday, April 04, 2017 | ||
16 | 16
order
Dismissing Case
Tue 04/04 12:42 PM
ORDER DISMISSING CIVIL ACTION by Judge Andre Birotte Jr. THE COURT having been advised by counsel that the above-entitled action has been settled15 ; IT IS THEREFORE ORDERED that this action is hereby dismissed without costs and without prejudice to the right, upon good cause shown within 30 days, to reopen the action if settlement is not consummated. This Court retains full jurisdiction over this action and this Order shall not prejudice any party to this action. Case Terminated. Made JS-6. (iv) |
|
Tuesday, March 28, 2017 | ||
15 | 15
notice
Settlement
Tue 03/28 12:42 PM
NOTICE of Settlement filed by Plaintiff Mirsaeid Mirseyedi. (Horrow, Michael) |
|
Tuesday, December 13, 2016 | ||
14 | 14
order
Order/Referral to ADR (No 3) (Private Mediator) (ADR-12)
Tue 12/13 1:30 PM
ORDER/REFERRAL to ADR Procedure No 3 by Judge Andre Birotte Jr. Case ordered to a private mediator based upon a stipulation of the parties or by the court order. ADR Proceeding to be held no later than 10/23/2017. (iv) |
|
13 | 13
order
Pretrial-Trial Scheduling Order - form only
Tue 12/13 1:25 PM
ORDER RE JURY TRIAL by Judge Andre Birotte Jr. Final Pretrial Conference set for 12/18/2017 at 11:00 AM before Judge Andre Birotte Jr. Jury Trial set for 1/16/2018 at 8:30 AM before Judge Andre Birotte Jr. SEE ORDER FOR DETAILS. (iv) |
|
12 | 12
testxtonly
Text Only Scheduling Notice
Tue 12/13 1:19 PM
(IN CHAMBERS) ORDER by Judge Andre Birotte Jr.: The Court has reviewed the Joint Rule 26(f) Report submitted by the parties, and determines that an in-person Scheduling Conference is unnecessary. Accordingly, the Court VACATES the December 19, 2016 Scheduling Conference. Order re Jury Trial to issue. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (iv) |
|
Monday, December 05, 2016 | ||
11 | 11
textonly
Generic Text Only Entry
Mon 12/05 10:17 AM
NOTICE TO PARTIES by District Judge Andre Birotte Jr. Effective December 12, 2016, Judge Birotte will be located at the 1st Street Courthouse, COURTROOM 7B on the 7th floor, located at 350 W. 1st Street, Los Angeles, California 90012. All Court appearances shall be made in Courtroom 7B of the 1st Street Courthouse, and all mandatory chambers copies shall be hand delivered to the judge's mail box outside the Clerk's Office on the 4th floor of the 1st Street Courthouse. The location for filing civil documents in paper format exempted from electronic filing and for viewing case files and other records services remains at the United States Courthouse, 312 North Spring Street, Room G-8, Los Angeles, California 90012. The location for filing criminal documents in paper format exempted from electronic filing remains at Edward R. Roybal Federal Building and U.S. Courthouse, 255 East Temple Street, Room 178, Los Angeles, California 90012. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (rrp) |
|
Thursday, December 01, 2016 | ||
10 | 10
misc
Joint Report Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan
Thu 12/01 11:32 AM
JOINT REPORT Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan With Schedule of Pretrial and Trial Dates Worksheet ; estimated length of trial 4 days, filed by Defendant ACE American Insurance Company.. (Richman, Dina) |
|
Thursday, September 29, 2016 | ||
9 | 9
service
Proof of Service (subsequent documents)
Thu 09/29 1:37 PM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Defendant ACE American Insurance Company, re Notice of Assignment to United States Judges(CV-18) - optional html form6 , Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71)2 , Declaration,3 , Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening),1 , Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program (ADR-8) - optional html form7 , Answer to Complaint5 , Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties4 served on September 23, 2016. (Richman, Dina) |
|
Monday, September 26, 2016 | ||
8 | 8
order
Initial Order Setting R26 Scheduling Conference - form only
Mon 09/26 10:24 AM
ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge Andre Birotte Jr. Scheduling Conference set for 12/19/2016 at 10:00 AM before Judge Andre Birotte Jr. (cb) |
|
Friday, September 23, 2016 | ||
7 | 7
adr
Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program (ADR-8) - optional html form
Fri 09/23 2:55 PM
NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (ghap) |
|
6 | 6
notice
Notice of Assignment to United States Judges (CV-18) - optional html form
Fri 09/23 2:55 PM
NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Andre Birotte Jr and Magistrate Judge Charles F. Eick. (ghap) |
|
5 | 5
answer
Answer to Complaint
Fri 09/23 11:36 AM
ANSWER to Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening),1 Defendant ACE American Insurance Company's Answer to Complaint; Demand for Jury Trial filed by Defendant ACE American Insurance Company.(Richman, Dina) |
|
4 | 4
notice
Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties
Fri 09/23 11:31 AM
CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant ACE American Insurance Company, identifying Chubb Limited. (Richman, Dina) |
|
3 | 3
misc
Declaration
Fri 09/23 11:26 AM
DECLARATION of David McCreary re Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening),1 Declaration of David McCreary in Support of Notice of Removal by Defendant ACE American Insurance Company filed by Defendant ACE American Insurance Company. (Richman, Dina) |
|
2 | 2
misc
Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71)
Fri 09/23 11:21 AM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendant ACE American Insurance Company. (Richman, Dina) |
|
1 | 1
notice
Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening)
Fri 09/23 11:06 AM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Los Angeles Superior Court, case number BC631546 Receipt No: 0973-18606549 - Fee: $400, filed by Defendant ACE American Insurance Company. (Attorney Dina Rebecca Richman added to party ACE American Insurance Company(pty:dft))(Richman, Dina) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit 1 - Summons and Complaint, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit 2 - Service of Process Transmittal, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit 3 - State Court Docket | ||
cmp
Complaint - (Discovery)
Fri 09/23 2:30 PM
CONFORMED FILED COPY OF COMPLAINT against Defendants ACE American Insurance Company, Does 1 through 10, inclusive.Jury Demanded., filed by plaintiff Mirsaeid Mirseyedi. (FILED IN STATE COURT ON 8/24/2016 SUBMITTED ATTACHED EXHIBIT 1) (ghap) |