|
GPO
Dec 14 2012
(e)(2)(B)(i); (2) Plaintiff's complaint against Defendant Naytron Williams and Eric Williams be DISMISSED prior to service of process under 28 U.S.C. § 1915(e)(2)(B)(i); (3) Defendants Naytron Williams and Eric Williams be DISMISSED as parties to the complaint; and (4) Plaintiff's claim of a retaliatory transfer asserted against Defendants Oree and Whitley be referred back to the undersigned for further proceedings; further ORDERED that the parties are DIRECTED to file any objectiRECOMMENDATION OF THE MAGISTRATE JUDGE that (1) Plaintiff's "glass in the breakfast tray" retaliation claim against the named defendants be DISMISSED prior to service of process in accordance with the provisions of 28 U.S.C. §1915ons to the Recommendation on or before December 28, 2012, as further set out. Signed by Honorable Judge Wallace Capel, Jr on 12/14/12. (scn, )
|
|
GPO
Jan 23 2013
ORDER directing that, after a review of the 8 Recommendation, and after an independent review of the entire record, the court finds that the 8 Recommendation should be adopted. Accordingly, it is ORDERED that: (1) The 8 Recommendation of the Magistrate Judge is ADOPTED; (2) Plaintiff's "glass in the breakfast tray" retaliation claim against the named defendants is DISMISSED prior to service of process in accordance with the provisions of 28 U.S.C. §1915(e)(2)(B)(i); (3) Plaintiff's complaint against Defendant Naytron Williams and Eric Williams is DISMISSED prior to service of process under 28 U.S.C. § 1915(e)(2)(B)(i); (4) Defendants Naytron Williams and Eric Williams are DISMISSED as parties to the complaint; and (5) Plaintiff's claim of a retaliatory transfer asserted against Defendants Oree and Whitley is referred back to the Magistrate Judge for further proceedings. Signed by Honorable Judge Truman M. Hobbs on 1/23/13. (Attachments: # (1) Civil Appeals Checklist)(scn, )
|
|
GPO
Jul 20 2015
RECOMMENDATION OF THE MAGISTRATE JUDGE that this case be DISMISSED without prejudice for Plaintiff's failures to prosecute this action properly and to comply with the orders of this court. Objections to R&R due by 8/3/2015. Signed by Honorable Judge Wallace Capel, Jr on 7/20/2015. (kh, )
|
|
GPO
Aug 11 2015
ORDER that the 25 Recommendation is ADOPTED, and it is hereby ORDERED that this case is DISMISSED without prejudice for failure of the Plf to prosecute this action and to comply with the orders of the court. Signed by Honorable Judge W. Harold Albritton, III on 8/11/2015. (wcl, )
|
|
GPO
Aug 11 2015
FINAL JUDGMENT is entered in favor of the Dfts, and against the Plf, Aljawon Dawyane Miles, and this case is DISMISSED without prejudice. Signed by Honorable Judge W. Harold Albritton, III on 8/11/2015. (Attachments: # (1) Civil Appeals Checklist)(wcl, )
|