Mathis v. Colvin
Florida Southern District Court | |
Judge: | Alicia M Otazo-Reyes |
Referred: | Alicia M Otazo-Reyes |
Case #: | 1:16-cv-24104 |
Nature of Suit | 863 Social Security - DIWC/DIWW (405(g)) |
Cause | 42:0405 Review of HHS Decision (DIWC) |
Case Filed: | Sep 26, 2016 |
Terminated: | Sep 15, 2017 |
Create an account to get the full party report for this case.
Docket last updated: 6 hours ago |
Friday, January 12, 2018 | ||
36 | 36
5
pgs
order
Order on Motion for Attorney Fees
Fri 01/12 3:56 PM
ORDER granting35 Consent MOTION for Attorney Fees. Signed by Magistrate Judge Alicia M. Otazo-Reyes on 1/12/2018. (kmh) |
|
Tuesday, December 12, 2017 | ||
35 | 35
motion
Attorney Fees
Tue 12/12 2:51 PM
Consent MOTION for Attorney Fees under the Equal Access to Justice Act by Torrell Mathis. Responses due by 12/27/2017 (Zagoria, Evan) |
|
Friday, September 15, 2017 | ||
34 | 34
21
pgs
order
Order on Motion for Summary Judgment
Fri 09/15 2:23 PM
ORDER granting26 Plaintiff's MOTION for Summary Judgment; denying29 Defendant's MOTION for Summary Judgment. Closing Case. Signed by Magistrate Judge Alicia M. Otazo-Reyes on 9/15/2017. (kmh) |
|
Monday, May 01, 2017 | ||
33 | 33
respm
Reply to Response to Motion
Mon 05/01 12:45 PM
REPLY to Response to Motion re26 Plaintiff's MOTION for Summary Judgment with Supporting Memorandum of Law ,29 Defendant's MOTION for Summary Judgment with Supporting Memorandum of Law ("Plaintiff's Reply Brief") filed by Torrell Mathis. (Zagoria, Evan) |
|
Monday, April 24, 2017 | ||
32 | 32
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time
Mon 04/24 9:15 AM
PAPERLESS ORDER granting31 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time. Plaintiff's Reply due by 5/1/2017. Signed by Magistrate Judge Alicia M. Otazo-Reyes on 4/24/2017. (ear) |
|
Friday, April 21, 2017 | ||
31 | 31
motion
Extension of Time
Fri 04/21 5:20 PM
Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time Plaintiff's Reply Brief by Torrell Mathis. Responses due by 5/5/2017 (Zagoria, Evan) |
|
Monday, April 03, 2017 | ||
30 | 30
respm
Response in Opposition to Motion
Mon 04/03 3:05 PM
RESPONSE in Opposition re26 Plaintiff's MOTION for Summary Judgment with Supporting Memorandum of Law filed by Carolyn W. Colvin. Replies due by 4/10/2017. (Fidler, Stephanie) |
|
29 | 29
motion
Summary Judgment
Mon 04/03 3:04 PM
Defendant's MOTION for Summary Judgment with Supporting Memorandum of Law by Carolyn W. Colvin. Responses due by 4/17/2017 (Fidler, Stephanie) |
|
Wednesday, March 08, 2017 | ||
28 | 28
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time
Wed 03/08 4:57 PM
PAPERLESS ORDER granting27 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time. Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment and Response to Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment due by 4/3/2017. Signed by Magistrate Judge Alicia M. Otazo-Reyes on 3/8/2017. (ear) |
|
27 | 27
motion
Extension of Time
Wed 03/08 2:55 PM
Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment by Carolyn W. Colvin. Responses due by 3/22/2017(Fidler, Stephanie) |
|
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order | ||
Friday, March 03, 2017 | ||
26 | 26
motion
Summary Judgment
Sat 03/04 12:41 AM
Plaintiff's MOTION for Summary Judgment with Supporting Memorandum of Law by Torrell Mathis. Responses due by 3/17/2017 (Lieberman, Lyle) |
|
Friday, February 03, 2017 | ||
25 | 25
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time
Fri 02/03 9:03 AM
PAPERLESS ORDER granting24 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time. Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment due by 3/5/2017. Signed by Magistrate Judge Alicia M. Otazo-Reyes on 2/3/2017. (ear) |
|
Thursday, February 02, 2017 | ||
24 | 24
motion
Extension of Time
Thu 02/02 1:38 PM
Consent MOTION for Extension of Time Plaintiff's Brief by Torrell Mathis. Responses due by 2/16/2017 (Zagoria, Evan) |
|
Wednesday, December 14, 2016 | ||
23 | 23
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time
Wed 12/14 6:22 PM
PAPERLESS ORDER granting22 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time. Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment due by 2/3/2017. Signed by Magistrate Judge Alicia M. Otazo-Reyes on 12/14/2016. (ear) |
|
22 | 22
motion
Extension of Time
Wed 12/14 3:35 PM
Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to file Plaintiff's Brief by Torrell Mathis. Responses due by 12/28/2016 (Zagoria, Evan) |
|
Monday, December 05, 2016 | ||
21 | 21
order
Order Referring Case to Judge
Mon 12/05 12:33 PM
ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Alicia M. Otazo-Reyes for Trial. Judge Robert N. Scola, Jr no longer assigned as presider judge in case. Signed by Judge Robert N. Scola, Jr on 12/5/2016. (pes) |
|
Friday, December 02, 2016 | ||
20 | 20
misc
Consent to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge
Fri 12/02 7:07 PM
Notice and Consent to Jurisdiction US Magistrate Judge signed by all parties . Filed by Carolyn W. Colvin (Fidler, Stephanie) |
|
19 | 19
answer
Answer to Complaint
Fri 12/02 7:05 PM
Defendant's ANSWER to Complaint by Carolyn W. Colvin. (Fidler, Stephanie) |
|
Wednesday, November 16, 2016 | ||
18 | 18
misc
Transcript - Social Security
Wed 11/16 5:15 PM
Social Security Transcripts filed. Transcripts date: 11/2/16. Pages: 1-659(Fidler, Stephanie) |
|
Att: 1 Transcripts Pages 400-659 | ||
17 | 17
notice
Notice of Attorney Appearance
Wed 11/16 5:14 PM
NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Stephanie I. R. Fidler on behalf of Carolyn W. Colvin. Attorney Stephanie I. R. Fidler added to party Carolyn W. Colvin(pty:dft). (Fidler, Stephanie) |
|
Thursday, November 03, 2016 | ||
16 | 16
service
Summons (Affidavit) Returned Executed as to USA
Thu 11/03 11:22 AM
SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed by Torrell Mathis. U.S. Attorney General served on 11/1/2016, answer due 1/3/2017. (pes) |
|
Wednesday, November 02, 2016 | ||
15 | 15
service
Summons (Affidavit) Returned Executed as to USA
Wed 11/02 12:39 PM
SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed by Torrell Mathis. Carolyn W. Colvin served on 10/28/2016, answer due 12/27/2016. (pes) |
|
Wednesday, October 26, 2016 | ||
14 | 14
order
Scheduling Order Order Referring Case to Judge
Thu 10/27 10:49 AM
SCHEDULING ORDER: ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Alicia M. Otazo Reyes for a ruling on all pre-trial, nondispositive matters and for a Report and Recommendation on any dispositive matters. Signed by Judge Robert N. Scola, Jr. on 10/26/2016. (pes) |
|
Friday, October 21, 2016 | ||
13 | 13
service
Summons (Affidavit) Returned Executed as to USA
Fri 10/21 4:06 PM
SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed as to US Attorney, served on 10/20/2016, answer due 12/19/2016. (pes) |
|
Tuesday, October 11, 2016 | ||
12 | 12
service
Certificate of Service
Tue 10/11 12:36 PM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Torrell Mathis re1 Complaint, (Zagoria, Evan) |
|
Wednesday, September 28, 2016 | ||
11 | 11
notice
Clerk's Notice (Other)
Wed 09/28 10:41 AM
CLERK'S NOTICE of Compliance re7 ORDER granting5 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. USM Service ordered . Summonses issued and copies have been provided to USM for Service. (tpl) |
|
10 | 10
service
Summons Issued as to USA
Wed 09/28 10:37 AM
Summons Issued as to U.S. Attorney General (tpl) |
|
9 | 9
service
Summons Issued as to USA
Wed 09/28 10:36 AM
Summons Issued as to U.S. Attorney (tpl) |
|
8 | 8
service
Summons Issued
Wed 09/28 10:36 AM
Summons Issued as to Carolyn W. Colvin. (tpl) |
|
Tuesday, September 27, 2016 | ||
7 | 7
order
Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis
Tue 09/27 4:47 PM
ORDER granting5 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. USM Service ordered . Summonses provided for issuance by Clerk for USM Service . Re:5 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Torrell Mathis. Signed by Magistrate Judge Alicia M. Otazo-Reyes on 9/27/2016. (sl) |
|
Monday, September 26, 2016 | ||
6 | 6
order
Clerks Notice to Filer - ELECTRONIC CASE, SUMMONS(ES)
Mon 09/26 3:22 PM
Clerks Notice to Filer re: Summons(es) cannot be issued. The motion to proceed in forma pauperis is pending. (pes) |
|
5 | 5
motion
Proceed In Forma Pauperis
Mon 09/26 3:22 PM
MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Torrell Mathis. (pes) |
|
4 | 4
notice
Clerk's Notice of Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge - FORM
Mon 09/26 3:20 PM
Clerks Notice pursuant to 28 USC 636(c). Parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Alicia M. Otazo-Reyes is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the attached form. (pes) |
|
3 | 3
order
Clerks Notice of Magistrate Judge Assignment
Mon 09/26 3:20 PM
Clerks Notice of Magistrate Judge Assignment to Magistrate Judge Alicia M. Otazo-Reyes. Pursuant to the Clerks directive of this cause, this matter is referred for a ruling on all pre-trial, non-dispositive matters and for a Report and Recommendation on any dispositive matters. (pes) |
|
2 | 2
order
Judge Assignment
Mon 09/26 3:18 PM
Judge Assignment to Judge Robert N. Scola, Jr (pes) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Mon 09/26 12:20 PM
COMPLAINT Torrell Mathis against Carolyn W. Colvin. Filing fees $ 400.00. IFP Filed, filed by Torrell Mathis.(Zagoria, Evan) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 2 Summon(s), | ||
Att: 3 Summon(s), | ||
Att: 4 Summon(s), | ||
Att: 5 in foma pauperis |