Original Case: 1:15-cv-01806

D.C. Circuit U.S. Court of Appeals
Case #: 0:16-cvus-05265
Typecivil us / united states
Nature of Suit890 Other Statutes - Other Statutory Actions
Case Filed:Sep 23, 2016
Terminated:Jul 14, 2017
Last checked: Monday Jul 17, 2017 4:36 AM EDT
Defendant - Appellee
Internal Revenue Service
Represented By
Andrew Weiner
U.S. Department of Justice
contact info
DOJ Appellate Counsel
U.S. Department of Justice
contact info
Teresa E. McLaughlin
U.S. Department of Justice
contact info
Gilbert Steven Rothenberg
U.S. Department of Justice
contact info
Defendant - Appellee
Internal Revenue Service Office of the Commissioner
Represented By
Andrew Weiner
U.S. Department of Justice
contact info
DOJ Appellate Counsel
U.S. Department of Justice
contact info
Teresa E. McLaughlin
U.S. Department of Justice
contact info
Gilbert Steven Rothenberg
U.S. Department of Justice
contact info
Defendant - Appellee
United States of America
Represented By
Andrew Weiner
U.S. Department of Justice
contact info
DOJ Appellate Counsel
U.S. Department of Justice
contact info
Teresa E. McLaughlin
U.S. Department of Justice
contact info
Gilbert Steven Rothenberg
U.S. Department of Justice
contact info
Defendant - Appellee
John Koskinen, in his official capacity as Commissioner of Internal Revenue
Represented By
Andrew Weiner
U.S. Department of Justice
contact info
DOJ Appellate Counsel
U.S. Department of Justice
contact info
Teresa E. McLaughlin
U.S. Department of Justice
contact info
Gilbert Steven Rothenberg
U.S. Department of Justice
contact info
Plaintiff - Appellant
Eva Maze
Represented By
Joseph Judkins
Baker & McKenzie LLP
contact info
Vivek Ashwin Patel
Baker & McKenzie LLP
contact info
Allison Michelle De Tal
Baker & McKenzie LLP
contact info
George Millington Clarke III
Baker & McKenzie LLP
contact info
Plaintiff - Appellant
Suzanne Batra
Represented By
Joseph Judkins
Baker & McKenzie LLP
contact info
Vivek Ashwin Patel
Baker & McKenzie LLP
contact info
Allison Michelle De Tal
Baker & McKenzie LLP
contact info
George Millington Clarke III
Baker & McKenzie LLP
contact info
Plaintiff - Appellant
Margot Lichtenstein
Represented By
Joseph Judkins
Baker & McKenzie LLP
contact info
Vivek Ashwin Patel
Baker & McKenzie LLP
contact info
Allison Michelle De Tal
Baker & McKenzie LLP
contact info
George Millington Clarke III
Baker & McKenzie LLP
contact info
Plaintiff - Appellant
Marie M. Green
Represented By
Joseph Judkins
Baker & McKenzie LLP
contact info
Vivek Ashwin Patel
Baker & McKenzie LLP
contact info
Allison Michelle De Tal
Baker & McKenzie LLP
contact info
George Millington Clarke III
Baker & McKenzie LLP
contact info
Plaintiff - Appellant
Kevin A. Muench
Represented By
Joseph Judkins
Baker & McKenzie LLP
contact info
Vivek Ashwin Patel
Baker & McKenzie LLP
contact info
Allison Michelle De Tal
Baker & McKenzie LLP
contact info
George Millington Clarke III
Baker & McKenzie LLP
contact info
Plaintiff - Appellant
May F. Muench
Represented By
Joseph Judkins
Baker & McKenzie LLP
contact info
Vivek Ashwin Patel
Baker & McKenzie LLP
contact info
Allison Michelle De Tal
Baker & McKenzie LLP
contact info
George Millington Clarke III
Baker & McKenzie LLP
contact info
Plaintiff - Appellant
Harold D. Blumenkrantz
Represented By
Joseph Judkins
Baker & McKenzie LLP
contact info
Vivek Ashwin Patel
Baker & McKenzie LLP
contact info
Allison Michelle De Tal
Baker & McKenzie LLP
contact info
George Millington Clarke III
Baker & McKenzie LLP
contact info
Plaintiff - Appellant
Nancy R. Blumenkrantz
Represented By
Joseph Judkins
Baker & McKenzie LLP
contact info
Vivek Ashwin Patel
Baker & McKenzie LLP
contact info
Allison Michelle De Tal
Baker & McKenzie LLP
contact info
George Millington Clarke III
Baker & McKenzie LLP
contact info

GPO Jul 14 2017
OPINION [1684045] filed (Pages: 10) for the Court by Judge Henderson. [16-5265]

Docket last updated: 07/17/2017 4:36 AM EDT
Friday, September 23, 2016
US CIVIL CASE docketed. 16-5265
Related: [-]
NOTICE OF APPEAL [1637257] filed seeking review of a decision by the U.S. District Court in 1:15-cv-01806-CKK. filed by Suzanne Batra, Harold D. Blumenkrantz, Nancy R. Blumenkrantz, Marie M. Green, Margot Lichtenstein, Eva Maze, Kevin A. Muench and May F. Muench Appeal assigned USCA Case Number: 16-5265 16-5265
Related: [-]
CLERK'S ORDER [1637259] filed directing party to file initial submissions: APPELLANT docketing statement due 10/24/2016. APPELLANT certificate as to parties due 10/24/2016. APPELLANT statement of issues due 10/24/2016. APPELLANT underlying decision due 10/24/2016. APPELLANT deferred appendix statement due 10/24/2016. APPELLANT notice of appearance due 10/24/2016. APPELLANT transcript status report due 10/24/2016. APPELLANT procedural motions due 10/24/2016. APPELLANT dispositive motions due 11/07/2016; directing party to file initial submissions: APPELLEE certificate as to parties due 10/24/2016. APPELLEE entry of appearance due 10/24/2016. APPELLEE procedural motions due 10/24/2016. APPELLEE dispositive motions due 11/07/2016 16-5265
Related: [-]