RICHARDSON v. KIMBROUGH et al
New Jersey District Court | |
Judge: | Robert B Kugler |
Referred: | Ann Marie Donio |
Case #: | 1:16-cv-05931 |
Nature of Suit | 550 Prisoner Petitions - Habeas Corpus - Civil Rights |
Cause | 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights |
Case Filed: | Sep 26, 2016 |
Terminated: | Dec 13, 2017 |
Defendant
CAROLINE PARSONS-KANE
|
|
Defendant
GRACE KIMBROUGH
|
|
Defendant
STEPHEN CITTADINI
|
|
Defendant
THOMAS LAROSA
|
|
Notice Only
nefpsRBK
|
|
Notice Only
plc
|
|
Plaintiff
KIMBERLY ANN RICHARDSON
|
Docket last updated: 3 hours ago |
Friday, March 09, 2018 | ||
44 | 44
1
pgs
order
Order
Fri 03/09 4:07 PM
ORDER that Plaintiff's request to re-open this case is DENIED. Signed by Judge Robert B. Kugler on 3/9/2018. (tf, n.m.) |
|
Monday, March 05, 2018 | ||
43 | 43
misc
Letter
Mon 03/05 1:52 PM
Letter from KIMBERLY ANN RICHARDSON; Re: Request to reopen case. (tf, ) |
|
Monday, January 29, 2018 | ||
42 | 42
misc
Mail Returned
Mon 01/29 11:37 AM
Mail Returned as Undeliverable. Mail (Order #41 ) sent to KIMBERLY ANN RICHARDSON (tf, ) |
|
Thursday, January 18, 2018 | ||
41 | 41
1
pgs
order
Order
Thu 01/18 3:22 PM
ORDER that Plaintiff's request to re-open this case is DENIED. Signed by Judge Robert B. Kugler on 1/18/2018. (tf, n.m.) |
|
40 | 40
misc
Letter
Thu 01/18 1:12 PM
Letter from Linda Galella and Brief.(GALELLA, LINDA) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A-D, | ||
Att: 2 Certificate of Service | ||
Monday, January 08, 2018 | ||
39 | 39
misc
Letter
Mon 01/08 11:40 AM
Letter from KIMBERLY ANN RICHARDSON; Request to reopen case. (tf, ) |
|
Friday, December 29, 2017 | ||
38 | 38
misc
Letter
Fri 12/29 11:47 AM
Letter from KIMBERLY ANN RICHARDSON. IN Re: New Address(rss, ) |
|
Att: 1 envelope | ||
Thursday, December 28, 2017 | ||
37 | 37
misc
Mail Returned
Thu 12/28 11:19 AM
Mail Returned as Undeliverable. Mail (Opinion and Order #33, #34) sent to KIMBERLY ANN RICHARDSON (tf, ) |
|
Wednesday, December 13, 2017 | ||
36 | 36
1
pgs
order
Order on Motion to Dismiss Order on Motion to Seal Document
Wed 12/13 3:45 PM
ORDER that defendants' motion to seal Exhibit B30 is denied. The Clerk shall unseal the exhibits31 ; defendants' motions to dismiss the complaint29 is granted. The Complaint is dismissed without prejudice; Plaintiff may move to amend the complaint within 30 days of this Order; Clerk shall close this matter. Signed by Judge Robert B. Kugler on 12/12/2017. (tf, n.m.) |
|
35 | 35
9
pgs
order
Opinion
Wed 12/13 3:42 PM
OPINION. Signed by Judge Robert B. Kugler on 12/12/2017. (tf, n.m.) |
|
utility
Terminate Civil Case
Wed 12/13 3:48 PM
***Civil Case Terminated. (tf, ) |
||
Friday, December 08, 2017 | ||
34 | 34
1
pgs
order
Order on Motion to Dismiss
Mon 12/11 8:07 AM
ORDER granting17 Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Judge Robert B. Kugler on 12/5/17. n.m. (dd, ) |
|
33 | 33
6
pgs
order
Opinion
Mon 12/11 8:00 AM
OPINION. Signed by Judge Robert B. Kugler on 12/5/17. n.m.(dd) |
|
Monday, December 04, 2017 | ||
32 | 32
misc
Substitution of Attorney
Mon 12/04 12:06 PM
Substitution of Attorney - Attorney JULIANA CATHERINE DEANGELIS terminated. Attorney MELIHA ARNAUTOVIC for GRACE KIMBROUGH,MELIHA ARNAUTOVIC for CAROLINE PARSONS-KANE added.. (ARNAUTOVIC, MELIHA) |
|
Tuesday, August 01, 2017 | ||
utility
Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings
Tue 08/01 10:13 AM
Set/Reset Deadlines as to30 MOTION to Seal Document Exhibit B . Motion set for 9/5/2017 before Judge Robert B. Kugler. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (tf, ) |
||
Monday, July 31, 2017 | ||
31 | 31
misc
Exhibit (to Document)
Mon 07/31 5:32 PM
Exhibit to29 Motion to Dismiss,30 Motion to Seal Document by GRACE KIMBROUGH, CAROLINE PARSONS-KANE.(DEANGELIS, JULIANA) NOTICE TO COUNSEL: Counsel is advised that pursuant to Local Civil Rule 5.3(c)(2) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit B | ||
30 | 30
motion
Seal Document
Mon 07/31 5:27 PM
MOTION to Seal Document Exhibit B by GRACE KIMBROUGH, CAROLINE PARSONS-KANE.(DEANGELIS, JULIANA) |
|
Att: 1 Declaration, | ||
Att: 2 Text of Proposed Order, | ||
Att: 3 Certificate of Service | ||
utility
Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings
Mon 07/31 10:44 AM
Set/Reset Deadlines as to29 MOTION to Dismiss In Lieu Of An Answer . Motion set for 9/5/2017 before Judge Robert B. Kugler. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (tf, ) |
||
Sunday, July 30, 2017 | ||
29 | 29
motion
Dismiss
Sun 07/30 11:09 PM
MOTION to Dismiss In Lieu Of An Answer by GRACE KIMBROUGH, CAROLINE PARSONS-KANE. Responses due by 8/22/2017(DEANGELIS, JULIANA) |
|
Att: 1 Brief, | ||
Att: 2 Text of Proposed Order, | ||
Att: 3 Certificate of Service | ||
Friday, July 14, 2017 | ||
28 | 28
misc
Letter
Fri 07/14 12:14 PM
Letter from KIMBERLY ANN RICHARDSON dated 7/12/2017. (dmr) |
|
Monday, July 10, 2017 | ||
27 | 27
order
Order on Oral Motion
Mon 07/10 2:43 PM
ORDER ON INFORMAL APPICATION, Defendant Kimbrough's application seeking an extension of time to answer, move, or otherwise respond to the complaint shall be, and is hereby, GRANTED IN PART and DENIED IN PART; responsive pleading due by 7/30/17. Signed by Magistrate Judge Ann Marie Donio on 7/10/17. (js) |
|
Thursday, July 06, 2017 | ||
26 | 26
misc
Letter
Thu 07/06 4:27 PM
Letter from DAG DeAngelis Requesting Extension of Time to File Responsive Pleading. (DEANGELIS, JULIANA) |
|
Monday, June 05, 2017 | ||
25 | 25
order
Order
Mon 06/05 1:35 PM
ORDER granting request for an additional thirty-five (35) days, or until July 10,2017, to respond to Plaintiff's Complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge Ann Marie Donio on 6/5/2017. (tf, ) |
|
Friday, June 02, 2017 | ||
24 | 24
misc
Letter
Fri 06/02 1:15 PM
Letter from DAG DeAngelis Requesting Extension of Time to File Responsive Pleading. (DEANGELIS, JULIANA) |
|
Tuesday, May 30, 2017 | ||
23 | 23
misc
Letter
Tue 05/30 1:59 PM
Letter from KIMBERLY ANN RICHARDSON; Confirmation for new address (Docket Sheet sent). (tf, ) |
|
Tuesday, May 16, 2017 | ||
22 | 22
notice
Notice of Change of Address
Tue 05/16 3:13 PM
NOTICE of Change of Address by KIMBERLY ANN RICHARDSON (tf, ) |
|
Thursday, May 04, 2017 | ||
21 | 21
order
Order on Oral Motion
Thu 05/04 11:52 AM
ORDER ON INFORMAL APPLICATION that Defendant Kimbrough's application seeking an extension of time to answer, move, or otherwise respond to the complaint is GRANTED; Defendant Kimbrough shall file her responsive pleading by no later than June 5, 2017. Signed by Magistrate Judge Ann Marie Donio on 5/4/2017. (tf, ) |
|
Monday, May 01, 2017 | ||
20 | 20
misc
Letter
Wed 05/03 1:49 PM
Letter from Kimberly Richardson. (lm) |
|
Friday, April 28, 2017 | ||
19 | 19
misc
Letter
Fri 04/28 4:13 PM
Letter from DAG Juliana DeAngelis Requesting Extension of Time. (DEANGELIS, JULIANA) |
|
Wednesday, April 19, 2017 | ||
18 | 18
misc
Mail Returned
Wed 04/19 2:01 PM
Mail Returned as Undeliverable (NEF #14). Mail sent to Kimberly Ann Richardson. (TH, ) |
|
Monday, April 17, 2017 | ||
17 | 17
motion
Dismiss
Mon 04/17 1:21 PM
MOTION to Dismiss FRCvP 12(b)(6) by STEPHEN CITTADINI, THOMAS LAROSA. Responses due by 5/1/2017(GALELLA, LINDA) |
|
Att: 1 Brief, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit A, | ||
Att: 3 Text of Proposed Order | ||
utility
Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings
Mon 04/17 3:33 PM
Set/Reset Deadlines as to17 MOTION to Dismiss FRCvP 12(b)(6) . Motion set for 5/15/2017 before Judge Robert B. Kugler. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (tf, ) |
||
Thursday, April 13, 2017 | ||
16 | 16
misc
Application for Clerk Order to Ext Answer/Proposed Order
Thu 04/13 3:41 PM
Application and Proposed Order for Clerk's Order to extend time to answer Attorney JULIANA CATHERINE DEANGELIS for GRACE KIMBROUGH added.(DEANGELIS, JULIANA) |
|
Att: 1 Certificate of Service | ||
utility
Update Answer Due Deadline
Thu 04/13 4:41 PM
Clerk`s Text Order - The document16 Application for Clerk's Order to Ext Answer/Proposed Order submitted by GRACE KIMBROUGH has been GRANTED. The answer due date has been set for 5/1/2017. (tf, ) |
||
Tuesday, April 11, 2017 | ||
15 | 15
notice
Notice of Appearance
Tue 04/11 3:52 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by LINDA A. GALELLA on behalf of STEPHEN CITTADINI, THOMAS LAROSA (GALELLA, LINDA) |
|
Thursday, March 30, 2017 | ||
14 | 14
service
Summons Returned Unexecuted
Thu 03/30 3:10 PM
Summons Returned Unexecuted by U.S. Marshals as to THOMAS LAROSA, CAROLINE PARSONS-KANE. (TH, ) |
|
13 | 13
service
Summons Returned Executed
Thu 03/30 2:55 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by U.S. Marshals. STEPHEN CITTADINI served on 3/24/2017, answer due 4/17/2017; GRACE KIMBROUGH served on 3/24/2017, answer due 4/17/2017. (TH, ) |
|
Wednesday, March 08, 2017 | ||
12 | 12
service
Summons Issued
Wed 03/08 11:01 AM
SUMMONS ISSUED to U.S. Marshals as to STEPHEN CITTADINI, GRACE KIMBROUGH, THOMAS LAROSA, CAROLINE PARSONS-KANE with answer to complaint due within 21 days. (TH, ) |
|
11 | 11
misc
Certificate of Clerk
Wed 03/08 10:31 AM
CERTIFICATE of USMS 285 form(s) returned on 3/7/2017. (TH, ) |
|
Tuesday, February 14, 2017 | ||
10 | 10
misc
Letter
Tue 02/14 2:23 PM
Letter from KIMBERLY ANN RICHARDSON re9 Order Denying Pro Bono Counsel. (tf, ) |
|
Tuesday, January 24, 2017 | ||
9 | 9
order
Order Denying Pro Bono Counsel ~Util - Terminate Motions
Tue 01/24 2:54 PM
Order denying without prejudice8 application for Pro Bono Counsel filed by KIMBERLY ANN RICHARDSON. Signed by Magistrate Judge Ann Marie Donio on 1/24/2017. (tf, n.m.) |
|
Tuesday, January 17, 2017 | ||
8 | 8
motion
Appoint Pro Bono
Tue 01/17 1:23 PM
MOTION to Appoint Pro Bono Counsel by KIMBERLY ANN RICHARDSON. (js) |
|
utility
Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings
Tue 01/17 1:23 PM
Setting Deadlines as to8 MOTION to Appoint Pro Bono Counsel. Motion set for 2/21/2017 before Magistrate Judge Ann Marie Donio. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (js) |
||
Thursday, December 29, 2016 | ||
7 | 7
misc
Letter: re USM 285
Thu 12/29 1:13 PM
CLERK'S LETTER: Transmittal of USM 285 Forms. (tf, ) |
|
6 | 6
order
Memorandum Order
Thu 12/29 1:13 PM
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER that the Clerk shall mail to plaintiff a transmittal letter explaining the procedure for completing a United States Marshal 285 Form; once the Marshal receives the USM-285 Forms from plaintiff and the Marshal so alerts the Clerk, the Clerk shall issue summons. Signed by Judge Robert B. Kugler on 12/28/2016. (tf,n.m.) |
|
Tuesday, December 27, 2016 | ||
5 | 5
misc
Letter
Tue 12/27 1:39 PM
Letter from KIMBERLY ANN RICHARDSON; Re: court dates (Docket Sheet sent). (tf, ) |
|
Monday, November 28, 2016 | ||
4 | 4
notice
Notice of Change of Address
Mon 11/28 3:56 PM
NOTICE of Change of Address by KIMBERLY ANN RICHARDSON (TH, ) |
|
Friday, October 07, 2016 | ||
3 | 3
misc
Letter
Fri 10/07 11:14 AM
Letter from KIMBERLY ANN RICHARDSON; Re: Request for Court Date. (tf, ) |
|
Tuesday, October 04, 2016 | ||
2 | 2
2
pgs
order
Memorandum Order
Tue 10/04 3:57 PM
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER granting Plaintiff's application to proceed in forma pauperis; Complaint shall be filed. Signed by Judge Robert B. Kugler on 9/30/2016. (tf, n.m.) |
|
cmp
Complaint
Tue 12/27 11:46 AM
COMPLAINT against STEPHEN CITTADINI, GRACE KIMBROUGH, THOMAS LAROSA, CAROLINE PARSONS-KANE, filed by KIMBERLY ANN RICHARDSON. (Please see #1 for docs.)(tf, ) |
||
Monday, September 26, 2016 | ||
1 | 1
service
Complaint Received
Tue 09/27 12:42 PM
Complaint Received.(jbk, ) |
|
Att: 1 Envelope, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit, | ||
Att: 3 Application IFP |