CONCEPCION-VASQUEZ v. UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
New Jersey District Court | |
Judge: | Kevin Mcnulty |
Case #: | 2:16-cv-05904 |
Nature of Suit | 510 Prisoner Petitions - Motions to Vacate Sentence |
Cause | 28:2255 Motion to Vacate / Correct Illegal Sentenc |
Case Filed: | Sep 23, 2016 |
Terminated: | Sep 30, 2016 |
Create an account to get the full party report for this case.
Docket last updated: 10 hours ago |
Thursday, October 13, 2016 | ||
4 | 4
misc
Mail Returned
Fri 10/14 10:04 AM
Mail Returned as Undeliverable. Mail sent to Angel Conception-Vasquez (sr, ) |
|
Friday, September 30, 2016 | ||
utility
Terminate Civil Case
Fri 09/30 8:42 AM
***Civil Case Terminated. (DD, ) |
||
Thursday, September 29, 2016 | ||
3 | 3
order
Order
Fri 09/30 8:38 AM
MEMORANDUM/ORDER that the Clerk shall file petitioners § 2255 motion in Civ. No. 16-5904 (Dkt. No. 1) as a § 2255 motion in Civ. No. 16-4967 that the Clerk shall CLOSE Civ. No. 16-5904 as petitioners § 2255 motion in that case will be analyzed in Civ. No. 16-4967 that the Clerk shall reopen Civ. No. 16-4967 that the Clerk shall again administratively terminate Civ. No. 16-4967 as petitioner has not filed his § 2255 motion on the proper form and it is not signed; etc. Signed by Judge Kevin McNulty on 9/29/16. (DD, ) |
|
Wednesday, September 28, 2016 | ||
2 | 2
notice
Notice of Appearance
Wed 09/28 2:37 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by MELISSA MARY WANGENHEIM on behalf of UNITED STATES OF AMERICA (WANGENHEIM, MELISSA) |
|
Friday, September 23, 2016 | ||
1 | 1
mot2255
Motion to Vacate/Set Aside/Correct Sentence (2255)
Tue 09/27 9:53 AM
MOTION to Vacate, Set Aside or Correct Sentence (2255) In Re to Criminal Case file 2:15-CR-21, filed by ANGEL CONCEPCION-VASQUEZ.(dam) |
|
Att: 1 Envelope |