California Central District Court
Judge:Stephen V Wilson
Referred: Frederick F Mumm
Case #: 2:16-cv-07269
Nature of Suit820 Property Rights - Copyrights
Cause17:101 Copyright Infringement
Case Filed:Sep 27, 2016
Last checked: Friday Nov 11, 2016 1:29 AM PST
Defendant
Does
Defendant
John Davis
Represented By
Louis P Petrich
Leopold Petrich And Smith LLP
contact info
Edward A Ruttenberg
Leopold Petrich And Smith PC
contact info
Defendant
Davis Entertainment Company
Represented By
Louis P Petrich
Leopold Petrich And Smith LLP
contact info
Edward A Ruttenberg
Leopold Petrich And Smith PC
contact info
Defendant
Eric Kripke
Represented By
Louis P Petrich
Leopold Petrich And Smith LLP
contact info
Edward A Ruttenberg
Leopold Petrich And Smith PC
contact info
Defendant
Kripke Enterprises
Represented By
Louis P Petrich
Leopold Petrich And Smith LLP
contact info
Edward A Ruttenberg
Leopold Petrich And Smith PC
contact info
Defendant
Middkid Productions
Defendant
NBCUniversal Media, LLC
Represented By
Louis P Petrich
Leopold Petrich And Smith LLP
contact info
Edward A Ruttenberg
Leopold Petrich And Smith PC
contact info
Defendant
Shawn Ryan
Defendant
Sony Pictures Entertainment Inc.
Represented By
Louis P Petrich
Leopold Petrich And Smith LLP
contact info
Edward A Ruttenberg
Leopold Petrich And Smith PC
contact info
Defendant
Sony Pictures Television Inc.
Represented By
Louis P Petrich
Leopold Petrich And Smith LLP
contact info
Edward A Ruttenberg
Leopold Petrich And Smith PC
contact info
Defendant
does
Plaintiff
ONZA Entertainment SL
Represented By
Devin Alexander McRae
Early Sullivan Wright Gizer And Mcrae LLP
contact info
Michael Smarinsky
Early Sullivan Wright Gizer And Mcrae LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
ONZA Partners SL
Represented By
Devin Alexander McRae
Early Sullivan Wright Gizer And Mcrae LLP
contact info
Michael Smarinsky
Early Sullivan Wright Gizer And Mcrae LLP
contact info

Docket last updated: 02/22/2017 11:59 PM PST
Thursday, February 16, 2017
33 33 testxtonly Text Only Scheduling Notice Thu 2:55 PM
SCHEDULING NOTICE: A Trial Setting Conference is set for 3/13/2017 at 01:30 PM before Judge Stephen V. Wilson. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (pc)
Related: [-]
32 32 notice Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel (G-123) Thu 11:00 AM
Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Mark Crawford Humphrey counsel for Plaintiffs ONZA Entertainment SL, ONZA Partners SL. Michael Smarinsky is no longer counsel of record for the aforementioned party in this case for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Plaintiffs Onza Partners SL and Onza Entertainment SL. (Humphrey, Mark)
Related: [-]
31 31 notice Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel (G-123) Thu 10:58 AM
Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Mark Crawford Humphrey counsel for Plaintiffs ONZA Entertainment SL, ONZA Partners SL. Adding Mark Crawford Humphrey as counsel of record for Onza Partners SL; Onza Entertainment SL for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Plaintiff Onza Partners SL and Onza Entertainment SL. (Attorney Mark Crawford Humphrey added to party ONZA Entertainment SL(pty:pla), Attorney Mark Crawford Humphrey added to party ONZA Partners SL(pty:pla))(Humphrey, Mark)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 15, 2017
30 30 order Dismiss Wed 3:03 PM
MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER DENYING MOTION TO DISMISS20 by Judge Stephen V. Wilson: [T]he Court DENIES Defendants motion to dismiss. Please refer to the Court's order for specifics. (cr)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 10, 2017
29 29 testxtonly Text Only Scheduling Notice Fri 11:05 AM
IN CHAMBERS ORDER-TEXT ONLY ENTRY by Judge Stephen V. Wilson: The Motion to Dismiss Complaint and Memorandum of Points & Authorities in Support Thereof filed by Defendants20 is suitable to a determination without oral argument. Fed. R. Civ. P. 78(b); Local Rule 7-15. The hearing scheduled for 2/13/2017 is VACATED and OFF-CALENDAR. Order to issue. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (pc)
Related: [-]
Monday, January 30, 2017
28 28 respm Response in Opposition to Motion Mon 2:02 PM
OPPOSITION to NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Complaint and Memorandum of Points & Authorities in Support Thereof 20 filed by Defendants John Davis, Davis Entertainment Company, Eric Kripke, Kripke Enterprises, NBCUniversal Media, LLC. (Petrich, Louis)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 19, 2017
27 27 respm Memorandum in Opposition to Motion Thu 10:27 AM
MEMORANDUM in Opposition to NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Complaint and Memorandum of Points & Authorities in Support Thereof 20 filed by Plaintiffs ONZA Entertainment SL, ONZA Partners SL. (McRae, Devin)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 28, 2016
26 26 order Order ~Util - Set/Reset Motion Hearing and R&R Deadlines Mon 11:11 AM
ORDER by Judge Stephen V. Wilson: The hearing on Defendants' Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Complaint is hereby continued until February 13, 2017. Plaintiffs' Opposition to the Motion to Dismiss shall be filed by no later than January 20, 2017. Defendants' Reply in support of the Motion to Dismiss shall be filed by no later than January 30, 2017. (cr)
Related: [-]
25 25 textonly Generic Text Only Entry Mon 10:07 AM
NOTICE TO PARTIES by District Judge Stephen V. Wilson. Effective December 5, 2016, Judge Wilson will be located at the 1st Street Courthouse, COURTROOM 10A on the 10th floor, located at 350 W. 1st Street, Los Angeles, California 90012. All Court appearances shall be made in Courtroom 10A of the 1st Street Courthouse, and all mandatory chambers copies shall be hand delivered to the judge's mail box outside the Clerk's Office on the 4th floor of the 1st Street Courthouse. The location for filing civil documents in paper format exempted from electronic filing and for viewing case files and other records services remains at the United States Courthouse, 312 North Spring Street, Room G-8, Los Angeles, California 90012. The location for filing criminal documents in paper format exempted from electronic filing remains at Edward R. Roybal Federal Building and U.S. Courthouse, 255 East Temple Street, Room 178, Los Angeles, California 90012. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (rrp)
Related: [-]
24 24 notice Notice of Lodging Mon 9:48 AM
NOTICE OF LODGING filed 11/28/16 re Stipulation to Continue,23(McRae, Devin)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Wednesday, November 23, 2016
23 23 stip Continue Wed 1:59 PM
STIPULATION to Continue Hearing Date on Motion to Dismiss from 1/23/17 to 2/13/17 Re: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Complaint and Memorandum of Points & Authorities in Support Thereof 20 filed by Plaintiffs ONZA Entertainment SL, ONZA Partners SL.(McRae, Devin)
Related: [-]
22 22 notice Manual Filing (G-92) Wed 1:01 PM
NOTICE of Manual Filing filed by Defendants John Davis, Davis Entertainment Company, Eric Kripke, Kripke Enterprises, NBCUniversal Media, LLC, Sony Pictures Entertainment Inc., Sony Pictures Television Inc. of Two DVDs (Exs. A & B to Request for Judicial Notice in support of Defendants' Motion to Dismiss). (Petrich, Louis)
Related: [-]
21 21 misc For Judicial Notice Wed 12:58 PM
REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE re NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Complaint and Memorandum of Points & Authorities in Support Thereof 20 filed by Defendants John Davis, Davis Entertainment Company, Eric Kripke, Kripke Enterprises, NBCUniversal Media, LLC, Sony Pictures Entertainment Inc., Sony Pictures Television Inc..(Petrich, Louis)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
20 20 motion Dismiss (cause or other) Wed 12:23 PM
NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Complaint and Memorandum of Points & Authorities in Support Thereof filed by Defendants John Davis, Davis Entertainment Company, Eric Kripke, Kripke Enterprises, NBCUniversal Media, LLC, Sony Pictures Entertainment Inc., Sony Pictures Television Inc.. Motion set for hearing on 1/23/2017 at 01:30 PM before Judge Stephen V. Wilson. (Petrich, Louis)
Related: [-]
Monday, October 24, 2016
19 19 service Service of Summons and Complaint Returned Executed (21 days) Mon 2:25 PM
PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff ONZA Entertainment SL, ONZA Partners SL, upon Defendant Davis Entertainment Company served on 10/7/2016, answer due 11/25/2016. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Davis Entertainment Company in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by substituted service on a domestic corporation, unincorporated association, or public entity and by also mailing a copy.Original Summons NOT returned. (McRae, Devin)
Related: [-]
18 18 notice Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties Mon 12:09 PM
NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendants John Davis, Davis Entertainment Company, Eric Kripke, Kripke Enterprises, NBCUniversal Media, LLC, Sony Pictures Entertainment Inc., Sony Pictures Television Inc., identifying Sony Pictures Television Inc., Sony Pictures Entertainment Inc., Sony Corp., Eric Kripke, Kripke Enterprises, NBCUniversal Media, LLC, Comcast Corporation, John Davis, Davis Entertainment Company. (Petrich, Louis)
Related: [-]
17 17 stip Extending Time to Answer (30 days or less) Mon 12:02 PM
STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to Kripke Enterprises answer now due 11/25/2016; Davis Entertainment Company answer now due 11/25/2016; Sony Pictures Entertainment Inc. answer now due 11/25/2016; NBCUniversal Media, LLC answer now due 11/25/2016; Sony Pictures Television Inc. answer now due 11/25/2016; John Davis answer now due 11/25/2016; Eric Kripke answer now due 11/25/2016, re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),1 filed by Defendants Kripke Enterprises; Davis Entertainment Company; Sony Pictures Entertainment Inc.; NBCUniversal Media, LLC; Sony Pictures Television Inc.; John Davis; Eric Kripke.(Attorney Louis P Petrich added to party John Davis(pty:dft), Attorney Louis P Petrich added to party Davis Entertainment Company(pty:dft), Attorney Louis P Petrich added to party Eric Kripke(pty:dft), Attorney Louis P Petrich added to party Kripke Enterprises(pty:dft), Attorney Louis P Petrich added to party NBCUniversal Media, LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Louis P Petrich added to party Sony Pictures Entertainment Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Louis P Petrich added to party Sony Pictures Television Inc.(pty:dft))(Petrich, Louis)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 19, 2016
16 16 service Service of Summons and Complaint Returned Executed (21 days) Wed 11:26 AM
PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff ONZA Entertainment SL, ONZA Partners SL, upon Defendant Sony Pictures Television Inc. served on 10/4/2016, answer due 10/25/2016. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Sony Pictures Television Inc. in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by substituted service on a domestic corporation, unincorporated association, or public entity and by also mailing a copy.Original Summons NOT returned. (McRae, Devin)
Related: [-]
15 15 service Service of Summons and Complaint Returned Executed (21 days) Wed 11:19 AM
PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff ONZA Entertainment SL, ONZA Partners SL, upon Defendant Sony Pictures Entertainment Inc. served on 10/4/2016, answer due 10/25/2016. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Sony Pictures Entertainment Inc. in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by substituted service on a domestic corporation, unincorporated association, or public entity and by also mailing a copy.Original Summons NOT returned. (McRae, Devin)
Related: [-]
14 14 service Service of Summons and Complaint Returned Executed (21 days) Wed 11:15 AM
PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff ONZA Entertainment SL, ONZA Partners SL, upon Defendant NBCUniversal Media, LLC served on 10/4/2016, answer due 10/25/2016. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon NBCUniversal Media LLC in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons NOT returned. (McRae, Devin)
Related: [-]
13 13 service Service of Summons and Complaint Returned Executed (21 days) Wed 11:11 AM
PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff ONZA Entertainment SL, ONZA Partners SL, upon Defendant Kripke Enterprises served on 10/4/2016, answer due 10/25/2016. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Kripke Enterprises, a California Corporation in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by substituted service on a domestic corporation, unincorporated association, or public entity and by also mailing a copy.Original Summons NOT returned. (McRae, Devin)
Related: [-]
12 12 service Service of Summons and Complaint Returned Executed (21 days) Wed 10:55 AM
PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff ONZA Entertainment SL, ONZA Partners SL, upon Defendant Eric Kripke served on 10/4/2016, answer due 10/25/2016. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Eric Kripke, individual in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by substituted service at business address and by also mailing a copy.Original Summons NOT returned. (McRae, Devin)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 30, 2016
11 11 order Initial Order upon Filing of Complaint - form only Fri 10:45 AM
NEW CASE ORDER upon filing of the complaint by Judge Stephen V. Wilson. (pc)
Related: [-]
10 10 service Summons Issued (Attorney Civil Case Opening) Fri 6:54 AM
21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),1 as to defendants John Davis, Davis Entertainment Company, Eric Kripke, Kripke Enterprises, Middkid Productions, NBCUniversal Media, LLC, Shawn Ryan, Sony Pictures Entertainment Inc., Sony Pictures Television Inc. (mrgo)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 29, 2016
9 9 misc Corporate Disclosure Statement Thu 1:16 PM
CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Plaintiffs ONZA Entertainment SL, ONZA Partners SL (McRae, Devin)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 28, 2016
8 8 notice Summons Request Wed 5:42 PM
Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),1 filed by Plaintiffs ONZA Entertainment SL, ONZA Partners SL. (McRae, Devin)
Related: [-]
7 7 notice Deficiency in Summons Wed 4:57 PM
NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Request to Issue Summons RE: Summons Request3 . The following error(s) was found: The name and address of the attorney for plaintiff(s)must be entered in the appropriate field. The summons cannot be issued until this defect has been corrected. Please correct the defect and re-file your request. (et)
Related: [-]
6 6 adr Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program (ADR-8) - optional html form Wed 4:55 PM
NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (et)
Related: [-]
5 5 notice Notice of Assignment to United States Judges (CV-18) - optional html form Wed 4:54 PM
NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Stephen V. Wilson and Magistrate Judge Frederick F. Mumm. (et)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 27, 2016
4 4 notice Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties Tue 5:59 PM
NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiffs ONZA Entertainment SL, ONZA Partners SL, (McRae, Devin)
Related: [-]
3 3 notice Summons Request Tue 5:36 PM
Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),1 filed by Plaintiffs ONZA Entertainment SL, ONZA Partners SL. (McRae, Devin)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) Tue 5:31 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiffs ONZA Entertainment SL, ONZA Partners SL. (McRae, Devin)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) Tue 3:53 PM
COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-18628240 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaintiffs ONZA Entertainment SL, ONZA Partners SL. (Attorney Devin Alexander McRae added to party ONZA Entertainment SL(pty:pla), Attorney Devin Alexander McRae added to party ONZA Partners SL(pty:pla))(McRae, Devin)
Related: [-]