Alexander et al v. Falk et al
Nevada District Court | |
Judge: | Miranda M Du |
Referred: | Daniel J Albregts |
Case #: | 2:16-cv-02268 |
Nature of Suit | 890 Other Statutes - Other Statutory Actions |
Cause | 15:1125 Trademark Infringement (Lanham Act) |
Case Filed: | Sep 27, 2016 |
Terminated: | Sep 30, 2019 |
Last checked: Sunday Mar 26, 2017 1:57 AM PDT |
Defendant
Jane Doe
|
|
Defendant
Kathryn Falk
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Romantic Times, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Randi Alexander
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Jackson Young
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 7 hours ago |
Thursday, October 08, 2020 | ||
163 | 163
appeal
USCA Mandate
Thu 10/08 11:31 AM
MANDATE of USCA, Ninth Circuit, as to162 USCA Memorandum. The judgment entered September 16, 2020, takes effect this date. AFFIRMED. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - HAM) |