JONES v. COMMISSIONER OF SOCIAL SECURITY
New Jersey District Court | |
Judge: | Renee Marie Bumb |
Case #: | 1:16-cv-05924 |
Nature of Suit | 865 Social Security - RSI (405(g)) |
Cause | 42:416 Denial of Social Security Benefits |
Case Filed: | Sep 26, 2016 |
Terminated: | Feb 28, 2017 |
Create an account to get the full party report for this case.
Docket last updated: 04/23/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Tuesday, February 28, 2017 | ||
utility
Terminate Civil Case
Tue 02/28 9:18 AM
***Civil Case Terminated. (rtm, ) |
||
Friday, February 24, 2017 | ||
10 | 10
notice
Notice of Voluntary Dismissal
Fri 02/24 11:18 AM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by THURMAN M. JONES (rtm, ) |
|
Wednesday, January 18, 2017 | ||
9 | 9
misc
Administrative Record - SSA
Wed 01/18 10:21 AM
Administrative Record Filed - Social Security.(REILEY, TIMOTHY) |
|
Att: 1 Part 2, | ||
Att: 2 Part 3, | ||
Att: 3 Part 4, | ||
Att: 4 Part 5, | ||
Att: 5 Part 6, | ||
Att: 6 Part 7, | ||
Att: 7 Part 8, | ||
Att: 8 Part 9 | ||
Thursday, January 05, 2017 | ||
8 | 8
misc
Application for Clerk Order to Ext Answer/Proposed Order
Thu 01/05 9:14 AM
Application and Proposed Order for Clerk's Order to extend time to answer. (REILEY, TIMOTHY) |
|
7 | 7
notice
Notice of Appearance
Thu 01/05 9:13 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by TIMOTHY PATRICK REILEY on behalf of COMMISSIONER OF SOCIAL SECURITY (REILEY, TIMOTHY) |
|
utility
Update Answer Due Deadline
Thu 01/05 9:36 AM
Clerk`s Text Order - The document8 Application for Clerk's Order to Ext Answer/Proposed Order submitted by COMMISSIONER OF SOCIAL SECURITY has been GRANTED. The answer due date has been set for 1/23/17. (js) |
||
Wednesday, November 09, 2016 | ||
6 | 6
service
Summons Returned Executed as to USA
Wed 11/09 11:58 AM
SUMMONS Returned Executed (U.S. Attorney served) by THURMAN M. JONES. (tf, ) |
|
5 | 5
service
Summons Returned Executed as to USA
Wed 11/09 11:27 AM
SUMMONS Returned Executed (Attorney General of the United States served) by THURMAN M. JONES. (tf, ) |
|
Thursday, November 03, 2016 | ||
4 | 4
service
Summons Returned Executed
Thu 11/03 11:10 AM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by THURMAN M. JONES. (tf, ) |
|
Friday, September 30, 2016 | ||
3 | 3
misc
Letter: re USM 285
Fri 09/30 2:09 PM
CLERK'S LETTER: Transmittal of USM 285 Forms. (rtm, ) |
|
2 | 2
order
Order
Fri 09/30 2:07 PM
ORDER IFP Granted. Directing Clerk to file the Complaint. Directing Clerk to issue a summons. Signed by Judge Renee Marie Bumb on 9/29/2016. (rtm, ) |
|
Monday, September 26, 2016 | ||
1 | 1
service
Complaint Received
Wed 09/28 10:38 AM
Complaint Received.(rtm, ) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 2 Application IFP |