DOE v. PLUM BOROUGH SCHOOL DISTRICT et al
Pennsylvania Western District Court | |
Judge: | Nora Barry Fischer |
Case #: | 2:16-cv-01483 |
Nature of Suit | 448 Civil Rights - Education |
Cause | 42:1983 Civil Rights Act |
Case Filed: | Sep 27, 2016 |
Terminated: | Jul 27, 2017 |
Last checked: Sunday Mar 26, 2017 5:24 AM EDT |
Cross Claimant
DREW ZOLDAK
|
Represented By
|
Cross Claimant
PLUM BOROUGH SCHOOL DISTRICT
|
Represented By
|
Cross Claimant
RYAN KOCIELA
|
Represented By
|
Cross Claimant
TIMOTHY GLASSPOOL
|
Represented By
|
Cross Defendant
JOSEPH RUGGIERI
MM2503 individually and in his official capacity SCI Mercer 801 Butler Pike
Mercer, PA 16137 |
Represented By
|
Cross Defendant
MARK KOST
MM2503 individually and in his official capacity, and SCI Mercer 801 Butler Pike
Mercer, PA 16137 |
Represented By
|
Cross Defendant
BOROUGH OF PLUM, PENNSYLVANIA
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
DREW ZOLDAK
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
JOSEPH RUGGIERI
MM2503 individually and in his official capacity SCI Mercr 801 Butler Pike
Mercer, PA 16137 |
Represented By
|
Defendant
PLUM BOROUGH SCHOOL DISTRICT
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
MARK KOST
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
RYAN KOCIELA
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
TIMOTHY GLASSPOOL
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
BOROUGH OF PLUM, PENNSYLVANIA
|
Represented By
|
Evaluator
KENNETH BENSON
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
JANE DOE
|
Represented By
|
1. | Plum High School teacher files lawsuit after being charged with Intimidation of Witnesses (pittsburgh.cbslocal.com) |
Submitted Thu 04/20/2017 | |
Docket last updated: 8 hours ago |
Thursday, October 26, 2017 | ||
141 | 141
1
pgs
order
Order
Thu 10/26 11:20 AM
ORDER granting140 Stipulation of Dismissal with Prejudice, including the claims raised by the Plaintiff's Complaint and the cross-claims raised by and among the various Defendants. All parties shall bear their own counsel fees and costs. Signed by Judge Nora Barry Fischer on 10/26/17. (jg) |
|
140 | 140
misc
Stipulation of Dismissal
Thu 10/26 11:12 AM
STIPULATION of Dismissal by Plaintiff Jane Doe, and by BOROUGH OF PLUM, PENNSYLVANIA, TIMOTHY GLASSPOOL, RYAN KOCIELA, MARK KOST, PLUM BOROUGH SCHOOL DISTRICT, JOSEPH RUGGIERI. (Dunlop, Scott) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order |