Scarlet #154202 v. Ryan et al
Arizona District Court | |
Judge: | Steven P Logan |
Referred: | Michelle H Burns |
Case #: | 2:16-cv-03273 |
Nature of Suit | 555 Prisoner Petitions - Habeas Corpus - Prison Condition |
Cause | 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights |
Case Filed: | Sep 27, 2016 |
Terminated: | Jul 11, 2017 |
Create an account to get the full party report for this case.
Docket last updated: 5 hours ago |
Tuesday, July 18, 2017 | ||
42 | 42
misc
Mail Returned
Tue 07/18 2:53 PM
Mail Returned as Undeliverable. Mail sent to Katrina Luv Scarlet. Reason for return: Return to Sender - No Longer Here. Document numbers40 and41 . (ATD) |
|
Tuesday, July 11, 2017 | ||
41 | 41
order
Clerks Judgment
Tue 07/11 4:31 PM
CLERK'S JUDGMENT - Pursuant to the Court's Order filed July 11, 2017, judgment of dismissal is entered. Plaintiff to take nothing, and the complaint and action are dismissed without prejudice pursuant to Rule 41(b). (ATD) |
|
40 | 40
order
Order
Tue 07/11 4:28 PM
ORDER - Pursuant to Rule 41(b) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure this action is dismissed without prejudice. See document for details. Signed by Judge Steven P Logan on 7/11/2017. (ATD) |
|
Friday, July 07, 2017 | ||
39 | 39
motion
Extension of Time
Fri 07/07 12:09 PM
***FILED IN WRONG CASE - Attorney Notified to file a document in CV 16-01372 PHX-SPL(MHB)***First MOTION for Extension of Time To Respond to Motion for Summary Judgment by Katrina Luv Scarlet. (Gattone, Paul) Modified on 7/7/2017 (REK) |
|
Thursday, July 06, 2017 | ||
38 | 38
motion
Extension of Time
Thu 07/06 3:23 PM
First MOTION for Extension of Time To Respond to Motion for Summary Judgment by Katrina Luv Scarlet. (Gattone, Paul) |
|
Thursday, April 06, 2017 | ||
37 | 37
notice
Notice of Service of Discovery
Thu 04/06 2:02 PM
NOTICE of Service of Discovery filed by Charles L Ryan, Unknown Parties. (Singh, Neil) |
|
Monday, March 06, 2017 | ||
36 | 36
misc
Mail Returned
Tue 03/07 4:09 PM
Mail Returned as Undeliverable. Mail sent to Katrina Luv Scarlet. Reason for return: Inactive. Document number35 . (EJA) |
|
Tuesday, February 28, 2017 | ||
35 | 35
order
Order to Show Cause
Tue 02/28 10:06 AM
ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE: Ten days from the date of this Order, Plaintiff shall either: (1) file a notice of change of address, or (2) show cause why this matter should not be dismissed for failure to prosecute. Show Cause Response due by 3/8/2017. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michelle H Burns on 2/28/17. (KGM) |
|
Monday, February 27, 2017 | ||
34 | 34
misc
Mail Returned
Mon 02/27 10:37 AM
Mail Returned as Undeliverable. Mail sent to Katrina Luv Scarlet. Reason for return: No longer here. Document number32 . (KGM) |
|
Thursday, February 23, 2017 | ||
33 | 33
answer
Answer to Complaint
Thu 02/23 6:55 AM
ANSWER to1 Complaint with Jury Demand by Unknown Kauffman.(Gottfried, Michael) |
|
Friday, February 17, 2017 | ||
32 | 32
order
Order on Motion for Preliminary Injunction
Fri 02/17 1:30 PM
ORDER that the reference to the Magistrate Judge is withdrawn as to Plaintiff's Motions for Preliminary Injunctions (Docs.7 ,8 ,9 ,10 ), and the motions are denied as moot. Signed by Judge Steven P Logan on 2/17/17.(EJA) |
|
Thursday, February 16, 2017 | ||
31 | 31
misc
Mail Returned
Thu 02/16 4:18 PM
Mail Returned as Undeliverable. Mail sent to Katrina Luv Scarlet. Reason for return: No longer here. Document number28 . (DXD) |
|
Wednesday, February 15, 2017 | ||
30 | 30
notice
Notice of Appearance/Association of Counsel
Wed 02/15 1:50 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Michael Evan Gottfried on behalf of Jennifer Abbotts, Charles L Ryan. (Gottfried, Michael) |
|
Friday, February 10, 2017 | ||
29 | 29
answer
Answer to Complaint
Fri 02/10 5:12 PM
ANSWER to1 Complaint with Jury Demand by Charles L Ryan, Unknown Party(named as: Corizon Medical Director, John or Jane Doe, individually and official capacity), Unknown Party(named as: Corizon Mental Health Director, John or Jane Doe, individually and official capacity).(Conlon, Joseph) |
|
Thursday, February 09, 2017 | ||
28 | 28
order
Scheduling Order
Thu 02/09 3:42 PM
SCHEDULING ORDER: Discovery due by 7/10/2017. Dispositive motions due by 10/6/2017 (see document for further details). Signed by Magistrate Judge Michelle H Burns on 2/9/17. (KGM) |
|
Wednesday, February 08, 2017 | ||
27 | 27
service
Service Executed
Wed 02/08 3:38 PM
SERVICE EXECUTED : USMS Process Receipt and Return re: Summons upon Debbie Lopez on behalf of Captain Kaufman on 2/3/17. (KGM) |
|
26 | 26
answer
Answer to Complaint
Wed 02/08 1:43 PM
ANSWER to1 Complaint with Jury Demand by Jennifer Abbotts.(Gottfried, Michael) |
|
Wednesday, February 01, 2017 | ||
25 | 25
service
Service Executed
Thu 02/02 9:52 AM
SERVICE EXECUTED : USMS Process Receipt and Return re: Summons upon Jennifer Abbotts on 1/20/17. (KGM) |
|
Monday, January 30, 2017 | ||
24 | 24
notice
Notice (Other)
Mon 01/30 4:56 PM
NOTICE re: Notice of Attempted Service Upon Plaintiff by Charles L Ryan, Unknown Party(named as: Corizon Medical Director, John or Jane Doe, individually and official capacity), Unknown Party(named as: Corizon Mental Health Director, John or Jane Doe, individually and official capacity) re:20 Response to Motion . (Conlon, Joseph) |
|
Tuesday, January 24, 2017 | ||
23 | 23
notice
Notice of Appearance/Association of Counsel
Tue 01/24 1:19 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Joseph Scott Conlon on behalf of Charles L Ryan, Unknown Party(named as: Corizon Medical Director, John or Jane Doe, individually and official capacity), Unknown Party(named as: Corizon Mental Health Director, John or Jane Doe, individually and official capacity). (Conlon, Joseph) |
|
Monday, January 23, 2017 | ||
22 | 22
notice
Notice (Other)
Mon 01/23 10:24 AM
NOTICE re: Joinder in Response to Motion for Preliminary Injunction (Doc. 10) by Jennifer Abbotts re:17 Response to Motion,10 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction . (Gottfried, Michael) |
|
Wednesday, January 18, 2017 | ||
21 | 21
service
Service Executed
Wed 01/18 1:03 PM
SERVICE EXECUTED: Rule 4 Waiver of Service of Summons. Waiver sent on 12/13/16 to Charles Ryan. (EJA) |
|
Thursday, January 12, 2017 | ||
20 | 20
respm
Response to Motion
Thu 01/12 4:36 PM
RESPONSE to Motion re:7 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction,8 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Charles L Ryan, Unknown Party(named as: Deputy Warden John Doe, ASPC-Lewis, Buckeye, AZ, individually and official capacity), Unknown Party(named as: Corizon Medical Director, John or Jane Doe, individually and official capacity).(Colburn, Donald) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit | ||
19 | 19
service
Service Executed
Thu 01/12 10:48 AM
SERVICE EXECUTED: Proof of Service re: complaint, motion, order and summons upon Corizon Mental Health Director on 1/10/17. (EJA) |
|
Wednesday, January 11, 2017 | ||
18 | 18
service
Service Executed
Thu 01/12 10:46 AM
SERVICE EXECUTED: re: complaint, motion, order and summons upon Corizon Medical Director on 1/10/17. (EJA) |
|
Tuesday, January 10, 2017 | ||
17 | 17
respm
Response to Motion
Tue 01/10 1:43 PM
RESPONSE to Motion re:10 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Charles L Ryan.(Gottfried, Michael) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit | ||
Tuesday, January 03, 2017 | ||
16 | 16
service
Service Unexecuted
Tue 01/03 9:48 AM
Service Returned Unexecuted : Summons as to Rast Max Deputy Warden John Doe. (KGM) |
|
Monday, November 28, 2016 | ||
15 | 15
order
Order Directing Prisoner Payment
Mon 11/28 1:21 PM
ORDER Directing Monthly Payments be made from Prison Account of Katrina Scarlet. Signed by Judge Steven P Logan on 11/28/16. (KGM) |
|
14 | 14
order
Order (Service Packet) ~Util - Terminate Motions ~Util - Add and Terminate Parties ~Util - Add and Terminate Judges
Mon 11/28 12:43 PM
ORDER (Service Packet): Plaintiff's Application to Proceed In Forma Pauperis (Doc.2 ) is granted. As required by the accompanying Order to the appropriate government agency, Plaintiff must pay the $350.00 filing fee and is not assessed an initial partial filing fee. Plaintiff's Motion for Court to Request Appointment of Counsel (Doc.3 ) is denied without prejudice. Plaintiff's "Motion for Compliance With in Forma Pauperis Requirementsby A.D.C." (Doc.4 ) is denied as moot. Plaintiff's Motion for Expeditious Ruling (Doc.5 ) is granted to the extent this Order addresses Plaintiff's claims. Plaintiff's "Motion to Use Legal Name, and to Only be Addressed with Female Pronouns" (Doc.6 ) is granted. Count Six is dismissed without prejudice. Defendants Assistant Director for the Health Services Monitoring Bureau, Thomas, Assistant FHA Jane Doe 1, Stephen Graham, Doctor John Doe 2, Taylor,. Medical Staff Member John Doe 1; Stien, Suggs, Barney, Jane Doe 2, Holland, Codogen, Warden John Doe, Aguirre, Swayne, Compton, Canine Unit Officers John Doe 3-7, and All Rast-Max Male Employees are dismissed without prejudice. The following Defendants must answer the following Counts: Count One Defendants Ryan and Corizon Medical Director John/Jane Doe; Count Two Defendants Ryan and Corizon Mental Health Director John/Jane Doe; Count Three Defendants Ryan, Deputy Warden John Doe, and Kauffman; Count Four Defendant Abbotts; and Count Five Defendant Ryan and Corizon Medical Director John/Jane Doe. The Clerk of Court must send Plaintiff a service packet including the Complaint (Doc.1 ), the Motions for Preliminary Injunction (Docs.7 -10 ), this Order, and both summons and request for waiver forms for Defendants Ryan, Corizon Medical Director John/Jane Doe, Corizon Mental Health Director John/Jane Doe, Deputy Warden John Doe, Kauffman, and Abbotts. Plaintiff must complete and return the service packet to the Clerk of Court within 21 days of the date of filing of this Order. The United States Marshal will not provide service of process if Plaintiff fails to comply with this Order. This matter is referred to Magistrate Judge Michelle H. Burns pursuant to Rules 72.1 and 72.2 of the Local Rules of Civil Procedure for all pretrial proceedings as authorized under 28 U.S.C. § 636(b)(1)(see document for further details). Signed by Judge Steven P Logan on 11/28/16. (KGM) |
|
Wednesday, October 26, 2016 | ||
13 | 13
notice
Notice of Change of Address (Party)
Thu 10/27 12:18 PM
NOTICE OF PARTY'S CHANGE OF ADDRESS by Katrina Luv Scarlet: #154202, ASPC-Phoenix-Aspen Unit, PO Box 52109, Phoenix, AZ 85072 (1 page). (KGM) |
|
Wednesday, September 28, 2016 | ||
12 | 12
misc
Notice: Prisoner Case Subject to Electronic Filing
Wed 09/28 10:15 AM
NOTICE: This case is subject to electronic filing. Please review the attached documents.(KGM) |
|
Att: 1 Eyman/Lewis Notice | ||
Tuesday, September 27, 2016 | ||
11 | 11
notice
Notice of Assignment
Wed 09/28 10:14 AM
NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT: (KGM) |
|
10 | 10
motion
Preliminary Injunction
Wed 09/28 10:13 AM
MOTION for Preliminary Injunction (Defendants Ryan and his agents at the Rast Max Unit only) by Katrina Luv Scarlet (11 pages). (KGM) |
|
9 | 9
motion
Preliminary Injunction
Wed 09/28 10:11 AM
MOTION for Preliminary Injunction (Defendants Ryan and Abbotts only) by Katrina Luv Scarlet (4 pages). (KGM) |
|
8 | 8
motion
Preliminary Injunction
Wed 09/28 10:09 AM
MOTION for Preliminary Injunction (Defendants Ryan and Corizon Only) by Katrina Luv Scarlet (15 pages). (KGM) |
|
7 | 7
motion
Preliminary Injunction
Wed 09/28 10:06 AM
MOTION for Preliminary Injunction (Defendants Ryan and Corizon Mental Health Only) by Katrina Luv Scarlet (50 pages). (KGM) |
|
6 | 6
motion
Miscellaneous Relief
Wed 09/28 10:03 AM
MOTION to Use Legal Name and to Only be Addressed With Female Pronouns by Katrina Luv Scarlet (1 page). (KGM) |
|
5 | 5
motion
Ruling
Wed 09/28 10:01 AM
MOTION for Expeditious Ruling by Katrina Luv Scarlet (1 page). (KGM) |
|
4 | 4
motion
Compel
Wed 09/28 9:59 AM
MOTION to Compel Defendants to Provide Inmate Account Statements by Katrina Luv Scarlet (3 pages). (KGM) |
|
3 | 3
motion
Appoint Counsel
Wed 09/28 9:56 AM
MOTION to Appoint Counsel by Katrina Luv Scarlet (1 page). (KGM) |
|
2 | 2
motion
Proceed In Forma Pauperis
Wed 09/28 9:55 AM
APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis by Katrina Luv Scarlet (2 pages). (KGM) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Wed 09/28 9:54 AM
PRISONER CIVIL RIGHTS COMPLAINT filed by Katrina Luv Scarlet (21 pages).(KGM) |