Edwards v. Merchant Cash and Capital, LLC., et al
Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 1:16-bk-23486
Lead BK case is: 1:16-bk-23486
New Jersey Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 7 | |
Judge: | Andrew B Altenburg Jr |
Case #: | 1:16-ap-01752 |
Nature of Suit | 67 Bankruptcy - Dischargeability - §523(a)(4), fraud as fiduciary, embezzlement, larceny 72 Bankruptcy - Injunctive relief - other 62 Bankruptcy - Dischargeability - §523(a)(2), false pretenses, false representation, actual fraud |
Case Filed: | Sep 28, 2016 |
Terminated: | May 18, 2017 |
Last checked: never |
Defendant
Everest Business Funding
2001 NW 107th Avenue 3rd Floor
Miami, FL 33172 |
Represented By
|
Defendant
Jack Adjmi
2371 McDonald Avenue
Brooklynn, NY 11223 |
Represented By
|
Defendant
WELLS FARGO BANK, NA
420 Montgomery Street
San Francisco, CA 94104 |
Represented By
|
Defendant
JP Morgan Chase & Co. d/b/a Chase
270 Park Avenue 38th Floor
New York, NY 10017 |
Represented By
|
Defendant
Biz Advance Now Inc.
2371 McDonald Avenue
Brooklyn, NY 11223 |
Represented By
|
Defendant
Valentino Lenny Tomassetti
4829 Atlantic Avenue
Ventnor, NJ 08406 |
Represented By
|
Defendant
Lee Vonner
4829 Atlantic Avenue
Ventnor, NJ 08406 |
Represented By
|
Defendant
Geoffrey Horn
1715 State Route 35 Suite 302
Middletown, NJ 07748 |
Represented By
|
Defendant
Capital Advance Solutions, LLC
4829 Atlantic Avenue
Ventnor, NJ 08406 |
Represented By
|
Defendant
Charles Hallinan
1125 Pacific Avenue
Atlantic City, NJ 08401 |
Represented By
|
Defendant
Mark Jenkins
2001 NW 107th Avenue
Miami, FL 33172 |
Represented By
|
Defendant
Scott Crockett
2001 NW 107th Avenue 3rd Floor
Miami, FL 33172 |
Represented By
|
Defendant
EBF Partners, LLC
2001 NW 107th Avenue 3rd Floor
Miami, FL 33172 |
Represented By
|
Defendant
Joe Doe
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Jane Doe
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Bernard D. Lynch, Jr.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Christopher R. Murray
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Giuliano, McDonnell & Perrone, LLP
170 Old Country Road Suite 608
Mineola, NY 11501 |
Represented By
|
Defendant
Stephen J. Sheinbaum
460 Park Avenue South
New York, NY 10016 |
Represented By
|
Defendant
Bizfi
460 Park Avenue South
New York, NY 10016 |
Represented By
|
Defendant
Merchant Cash and Capital, LLC.,
460 Park Avenue South 10th Floor
New York, NY 10016 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Lawrence Grant Edwards
351 N. New Hampshire Ave
Atlantic City, NJ 08401 |
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 2 hours ago |
Thursday, May 18, 2017 | ||
utility
Close Adversary Case
Thu 05/18 8:32 AM
Adversary Case (1:16-ap-1752) Closed. (bed) |
||
Thursday, April 27, 2017 | ||
31 | 31
court
BNC Certificate of Notice - Order
Fri 04/28 12:33 AM
BNC Certificate of Notice - Order No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 04/27/2017. (Admin.) |
|
Tuesday, April 25, 2017 | ||
30 | 30
2
pgs
order
Dismiss Adversary Proceeding
Tue 04/25 8:42 AM
Order Granting Motion to Dismiss Adversary Proceeding . Service of notice of the entry of this order pursuant to Rule 9022 was made on the appropriate parties. See BNC Certificate of Notice. Signed on 4/25/2017. (bc) |
|
Tuesday, March 28, 2017 | ||
29 | 29
1
pgs
audio
Tue 03/28 4:20 PM
PDF with attached Audio File. Court Date & Time [ 3/28/2017 10:40:52 AM ]. File Size [ 676 KB ]. Run Time [ 00:02:49 ]. (admin) |
|
court
Hearing Held
Fri 03/31 10:13 AM
Minute of 3/28/17 Hearing Held, OUTCOME: Motion granted, see pdf file docketed separately (bc) |
||
Friday, March 24, 2017 | ||
28 | 28
court
BNC Certificate of Notice - Order
Sat 03/25 12:39 AM
BNC Certificate of Notice - Order No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 03/24/2017. (Admin.) |
|
Wednesday, March 22, 2017 | ||
27 | 27
order
Order (Generic)
Wed 03/22 1:21 PM
Order Dismissing Case as to Certain Defendants |
|
Tuesday, March 21, 2017 | ||
26 | 26
audio
Tue 03/21 3:20 PM
PDF with attached Audio File. Court Date & Time [ 3/21/2017 2:04:57 AM ]. File Size [ 1456 KB ]. Run Time [ 00:06:04 ]. (admin) |
|
court
Hearing Held
Tue 03/21 3:40 PM
Minute of 3/21/17 Hearing Held, OUTCOME:As no appeared to move this Adv. Proceeding in Court by 2:30 PM, the Adv. Proceeding was dismissed as to all parties except for the parties on the Motion to Dismiss which is returnable on 3/28/17 at 2 pm; see PDF with attached Audio File for Oral Decision. (bc ) |
||
Monday, March 06, 2017 | ||
court
Hearing Scheduled (Document)
Mon 03/06 3:22 PM
Hearing Scheduled. Hearing scheduled for 3/28/2017 at 02:00 PM at ABA - Courtroom 4B, Camden. (bed) |
||
Friday, March 03, 2017 | ||
25 | 25
motion
Dismiss Adversary Proceeding
Fri 03/03 4:45 PM
Motion to Dismiss Adversary Proceeding Filed by Bizfi, Giuliano, McDonnell & Perrone, LLP, Bernard D. Lynch Jr., Merchant Cash and Capital, LLC.,, Christopher R. Murray, Stephen J. Sheinbaum.Hearing scheduled for 3/21/2017 at 02:00 PM at ABA - Courtroom 4B, Camden. (Harper, Virginia) |
|
Att: 1 Memorandum of Law | ||
Att: 2 Proposed Order | ||
Att: 3 Certificate of Service | ||
Thursday, February 23, 2017 | ||
24 | 24
court
BNC Certificate of Notice - Order
Fri 02/24 12:44 AM
BNC Certificate of Notice - Order No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 02/23/2017. (Admin.) |
|
23 | 23
court
BNC Certificate of Notice - Order
Fri 02/24 12:44 AM
BNC Certificate of Notice - Order No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 02/23/2017. (Admin.) |
|
Tuesday, February 21, 2017 | ||
22 | 22
court
Notice of Hearing - (Generic)
Tue 02/21 2:49 PM
AMENDED Notice of Hearing for: . The following parties were served: Plaintiff, Defendant, Defendant's Attorney.Hearing scheduled for 3/21/2017 at 02:00 PM at ABA - Courtroom 4B, Camden. (bc) |
|
court
Hearing Held and Continued
Tue 02/21 2:18 PM
Minute of Hearing Held and Continued. OUTCOME: Hearing scheduled for 03/21/2017 at 02:00 PM at ABA - Courtroom 4B, Camden. (ml ) |
||
Wednesday, February 15, 2017 | ||
court
Notice of Returned Mail
Wed 02/22 5:13 PM
Returned Mail Notice. The court has received notification that the US Postal Service has determined that the following parties have an address that is undeliverable: Lawrence Grant Edwards, 351 N. New Hampshire Ave, Atlantic City, NJ 08401-2972 (ld) |
||
Tuesday, February 14, 2017 | ||
court
Notice of Returned Mail
Tue 02/14 10:25 AM
Returned Mail Notice. The court has received notification that the US Postal Service has determined that the following parties have an address that is undeliverable: Lawrence Grant Edwards, 351 N. New Hampshire Ave, Atlantic City, NJ 08401-2972 (ld) |
||
Friday, February 03, 2017 | ||
21 | 21
court
BNC Certificate of Notice - Order
Sat 02/04 12:37 AM
BNC Certificate of Notice - Order No. of Notices: 18. Notice Date 02/03/2017. (Admin.) |
|
Wednesday, February 01, 2017 | ||
20 | 20
court
BNC Certificate of Notice - Order
Thu 02/02 12:57 AM
BNC Certificate of Notice - Order No. of Notices: 3. Notice Date 02/01/2017. (Admin.) |
|
19 | 19
court
Notice of Hearing - (Generic)
Wed 02/01 2:34 PM
Notice of Hearing for: STATUS . STATUS Hearing scheduled for 2/21/2017 at 02:00 PM at ABA - Courtroom 4B, Camden. (cmf) |
|
Monday, January 30, 2017 | ||
18 | 18
order
Order (Generic)
Mon 01/30 12:27 PM
Order Correcting Order Dismissing Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. . Service of notice of the entry of this order pursuant to Rule 9022 was made on the appropriate parties. See BNC Certificate of Notice. Signed on 1/30/2017. (ml) |
|
17 | 17
order
Order (Generic)
Mon 01/30 12:07 PM
DISREGARD - SEE DOCKET ENTRY #18. Order Correcting Order Dismissing Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. .. Service of notice of the entry of this order pursuant to Rule 9022 was made on the appropriate parties. See BNC Certificate of Notice. Signed on 1/30/2017 (ml) Modified on 1/30/2017 DISREGARD THIS ORDER NOT SIGNED SEE DOCKET ENTRY #18 FOR SIGNED ORDER. (ml) |
|
Wednesday, January 25, 2017 | ||
court
Notice of Returned Mail
Wed 01/25 5:59 PM
Returned Mail Notice. The court has received notification that the US Postal Service has determined that the following parties have an address that is undeliverable: Lawrence Grant Edwards, 351 N. New Hampshire Ave, Atlantic City, NJ 08401-2972 (ld) |
||
Monday, January 09, 2017 | ||
utility
Close Adversary Case
Mon 01/09 2:00 PM
Adversary Case (1:16-ap-1752) Closed. (bed) |
||
utility
Reopen AP Case
Mon 01/09 3:32 PM
Adversary Case Reopened Administratively; Case was closed prematurely. (mrm) |
||
Friday, January 06, 2017 | ||
16 | 16
court
BNC Certificate of Notice - Order
Sat 01/07 12:40 AM
BNC Certificate of Notice - Order No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 01/06/2017. (Admin.) |
|
Wednesday, January 04, 2017 | ||
15 | 15
audio
Wed 01/04 12:20 PM
PDF with attached Audio File. Court Date & Time [ 1/3/2017 2:09:34 AM ]. File Size [ 1608 KB ]. Run Time [ 00:06:42 ]. (admin) |
|
14 | 14
order
Dismiss Adversary Proceeding
Wed 01/04 9:29 AM
Order Granting Motion to Dismiss Adversary Proceeding . Service of notice of the entry of this order pursuant to Rule 9022 was made on the appropriate parties. See BNC Certificate of Notice. Signed on 1/4/2017. (bc) |
|
Tuesday, January 03, 2017 | ||
court
Hearing Held
Tue 01/03 5:25 PM
Minute of 01/03/2017 OUTCOME: Granted. (ml ) |
||
Tuesday, December 13, 2016 | ||
13 | 13
motion
Dismiss Adversary Proceeding
Tue 12/13 10:49 AM
Motion to Dismiss Adversary Proceeding Filed by Biz Advance Now Inc..Hearing scheduled for 1/3/2017 at 02:00 PM at ABA - Courtroom 4B, Camden. (Hamilton, Valerie) |
|
Att: 1 Motion | ||
Att: 2 Proposed Order | ||
Att: 3 Certificate of Service | ||
utility
Reopen AP Case
Tue 12/13 10:12 AM
Adversary Case Reopened Administratively; Case closed Prematurely. (mrm) |
||
Friday, December 02, 2016 | ||
12 | 12
court
BNC Certificate of Notice - Order
Sat 12/03 12:35 AM
BNC Certificate of Notice - Order No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 12/02/2016. (Admin.) |
|
Thursday, December 01, 2016 | ||
utility
Close Adversary Case
Thu 12/01 3:51 PM
Adversary Case (1:16-ap-1752) Closed. (bed) |
||
Wednesday, November 30, 2016 | ||
11 | 11
order
Dismiss Adversary Proceeding
Wed 11/30 9:25 AM
Order Granting Motion to Dismiss Adversary Proceeding . Service of notice of the entry of this order pursuant to Rule 9022 was made on the appropriate parties. See BNC Certificate of Notice. Signed on 11/30/2016. (bc) |
|
Tuesday, November 29, 2016 | ||
10 | 10
audio
Tue 11/29 3:00 PM
PDF with attached Audio File. Court Date & Time [ 11/29/2016 2:27:38 AM ]. File Size [ 1200 KB ]. Run Time [ 00:05:00 ]. (admin) |
|
court
Hearing Held
Tue 11/29 2:32 PM
Minute of 11/29/16 Hearing Held, OUTCOME: Motion granted without prejudice (bc ) |
||
Thursday, November 17, 2016 | ||
9 | 9
answer
Objection
Thu 11/17 4:15 PM
Objection to Wells Faro Bank NA's Motion to Dismiss Adversary Complaint filed by Lawrence Grant Edwards. (bed) |
|
Monday, November 07, 2016 | ||
8 | 8
answer
Answer to Complaint
Mon 11/07 4:24 PM
Answer to Complaint filed by Peter S. Kolevzon on behalf of Jack Adjmi, Biz Advance Now Inc.. (bed) |
|
Wednesday, November 02, 2016 | ||
7 | 7
misc
Certificate of Service
Wed 11/02 3:55 PM
Certificate of Service filed by Lawrence Grant Edwards. (bed) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit | ||
Friday, October 28, 2016 | ||
6 | 6
answer
Answer to Complaint
Fri 10/28 4:40 PM
Answer to Complaint filed by Virginia Alyson Harper on behalf of Bizfi, Giuliano, McDonnell & Perrone, LLP, Bernard D. Lynch Jr., Merchant Cash and Capital, LLC.,, Christopher R. Murray, Stephen J. Sheinbaum. (Harper, Virginia) |
|
Wednesday, October 26, 2016 | ||
5 | 5
motion
Dismiss Adversary Proceeding
Wed 10/26 1:55 PM
Motion to Dismiss Adversary Proceeding Filed by WELLS FARGO BANK, NA.Hearing scheduled for 11/29/2016 at 02:00 PM at ABA - Courtroom 4B, Camden. (Hager, Barbara) |
|
Att: 1 Memorandum of Law | ||
Att: 2 Proposed Order | ||
Att: 3 Notice of Motion, Response Deadline and Hearing | ||
Att: 4 Certificate of Service | ||
4 | 4
misc
Notice of Appearance and Request
Wed 10/26 1:50 PM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Service of Notice filed by Lauren Silver Zabel on behalf of WELLS FARGO BANK, NA. (Zabel, Lauren) |
|
3 | 3
misc
Notice of Appearance and Request
Wed 10/26 1:48 PM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Service of Notice filed by Barbara K. Hager on behalf of WELLS FARGO BANK, NA. (Hager, Barbara) |
|
Thursday, September 29, 2016 | ||
utility
Add Party
Thu 09/29 9:00 AM
Jack Adjmi, Defendant, added to case. (mef) |
||
Wednesday, September 28, 2016 | ||
2 | 2
court
Summons Issued
Wed 09/28 3:29 PM
Summons Issued to Lawrence Grant Edwards for Service on Biz Advance Now Inc. Answer due on 10/28/2016; Bizfi Answer due on 10/28/2016; Capital Advance Solutions, LLC Answer due on 10/28/2016; Scott Crockett Answer due on 10/28/2016; Jane Doe Answer due on 10/28/2016; Joe Doe Answer due on 10/28/2016; EBF Partners, LLC Answer due on 10/28/2016; Everest Business Funding Answer due on 10/28/2016; Giuliano, McDonnell & Perrone, LLP Answer due on 10/28/2016; Charles Hallinan Answer due on 10/28/2016; Geoffrey Horn Answer due on 10/28/2016; JP Morgan Chase & Co. d/b/a Chase Answer due on 10/28/2016; Mark Jenkins Answer due on 10/28/2016; Bernard D. Lynch Jr. Answer due on 10/28/2016; Merchant Cash and Capital, LLC., Answer due on 10/28/2016; Christopher R. Murray Answer due on 10/28/2016; Stephen J. Sheinbaum Answer due on 10/28/2016; Valentino Lenny Tomassetti Answer due on 10/28/2016; Lee Vonner Answer due on 10/28/2016; WELLS FARGO BANK, NA Answer due on 10/28/2016 Pre-Trial hearing to be held on 1/3/2017 at 02:00 PM at ABA - Courtroom 4B, Camden. (bed) |
|
Att: 1 Pre Trial Instructions | ||
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Wed 09/28 3:09 PM
Adversary case 16-01752 Complaint by Lawrence Grant Edwards against Merchant Cash and Capital, LLC., ; Bizfi ; Stephen J. Sheinbaum ; Giuliano, McDonnell & Perrone, LLP ; Christopher R. Murray ; Bernard D. Lynch Jr. ; Jane Doe ; Joe Doe ; EBF Partners, LLC ; Everest Business Funding ; Scott Crockett ; Mark Jenkins ; Charles Hallinan ; Capital Advance Solutions, LLC ; Geoffrey Horn ; Lee Vonner ; Valentino Lenny Tomassetti ; Biz Advance Now Inc. ; JP Morgan Chase & Co. d/b/a Chase ; WELLS FARGO BANK, NA. Fee Amount $ 350.. (62 (Dischargeability - 523(a)(2), false pretenses, false representation, actual fraud)) (bed) |