Puerto Rico District Court
Judge:Aida M Delgado-Colon
Case #: 3:16-cv-02748
Nature of Suit950 Other Statutes - Constitutionality of State Statutes
Cause28:1983 Civil Rights
Case Filed:Sep 29, 2016
Terminated:Mar 30, 2018
Last checked: Tuesday Mar 28, 2017 5:28 AM AST
Defendant
Puerto Rico Police Department
Represented By
Idza Diaz-Rivera
P. R. Department Of Justice
contact info
Ivan Solares-Nunez
Puerto Rico Department Of Justice
contact info
Defendant
Commonwealth of Puerto Rico
Represented By
Idza Diaz-Rivera
P. R. Department Of Justice
contact info
Ivan Solares-Nunez
Puerto Rico Department Of Justice
contact info
Defendant
Puerto Rico Department of Leisure and Sports
Represented By
Idza Diaz-Rivera
P. R. Department Of Justice
contact info
Ivan Solares-Nunez
Puerto Rico Department Of Justice
contact info
Defendant
Puerto Rico Shooting Association
Represented By
German J. Brau-Ramirez
Morell Bauza Dapena & Cartagena LLC
contact info
Ramon E. Dapena
Morell, Bauza, Cartagena & Dapena
contact info
Ivan Llado-Rodriguez
Morell Bauza Cartagena & Dapena, LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Centro de Adiestramientos Tacticos de Puerto Rico Corp.
Represented By
Humberto F. Cobo-Estrella
Cobo-Estrella H. Law, LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Damas de la Segunda Enmienda Corp.
Represented By
Humberto F. Cobo-Estrella
Cobo-Estrella H. Law, LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Phoenix Military Institute Corp.
Represented By
Humberto F. Cobo-Estrella
Cobo-Estrella H. Law, LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Jose A Cruz-Kerkado
Represented By
Humberto F. Cobo-Estrella
Cobo-Estrella H. Law, LLC
contact info

GPO Apr 05 2018
OPINION AND ORDER. Defendants' motions to dismiss at ECF Nos. 48 & 50 are GRANTED. Plaintiffs' motion for summary judgment at ECF No. 63 is DENIED AS MOOT. Likewise, PRSA's motion in opposition to summary judgment and alternative motion to hold summary judgment in abeyance at ECF No. 64 and the Government Defendants' motion to join therein at ECF No. 65 are also DENIED AS MOOT. PRSA's January 11, 2018 motion at ECF No. 70, to withdraw certain arguments from its motion to dismiss is also DENIED AS MOOT. The case is hereby dismissed without prejudice. Clerk of Court is to enter judgment accordingly. Signed by Chief Judge Aida M. Delgado-Colon on 3/30/2018.(wm)

Docket last updated: 10 hours ago
Tuesday, August 21, 2018
77 77 3 pgs order Order on Motion for Reconsideration Order on Motion Submitting Tue 4:43 PM
ORDER re74 Motion for Reconsideration ;76 Motion submitting. Plaintiff's motions for reconsideration at ECF Nos. 74, 76 are DENIED. Signed by U.S. District Judge Aida M. Delgado-Colon on 8/20/2018. (wm)
Related: [-]