Clark v. Amtrust North America et al
California Northern District Court | |
Judge: | Maria-Elena James |
Case #: | 3:16-cv-05561 |
Nature of Suit | 790 Labor - Other Labor Litigation |
Cause | 42:2000e Job Discrimination (Employment) |
Case Filed: | Sep 29, 2016 |
Terminated: | Feb 13, 2018 |
Last checked: Tuesday Mar 28, 2017 2:15 AM PDT |
Defendant
AmTrust E&S Insurance Services, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Amtrust North America
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Jeannine Clark
|
Represented By
|
TERMINATED PARTIES | |
Defendant
Tony Weddle
Terminated: 10/19/2016
|
Represented By
|
Mediator
Jonathan Lee
Terminated: 03/20/2017
US Attorney's Office 450 Golden Gate Ave.
San Francisco, CA 94102 |
Docket last updated: 6 hours ago |
Monday, December 16, 2019 | ||
57 | 57
appeal
USCA Mandate
Mon 12/16 11:15 AM
MANDATE of USCA as to53 Notice of Appeal filed by Jeannine Clark. (tnS, COURT STAFF) |