Devine v. IPTV-B-L6-136 et al
Nevada District Court | |
Judge: | Andrew P Gordon |
Referred: | Nancy J Koppe |
Case #: | 2:16-cv-02288 |
Nature of Suit | 360 Torts - Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury |
Cause | 28:1441 Petition for Removal- Personal Injury |
Case Filed: | Sep 29, 2016 |
Terminated: | Nov 01, 2017 |
Last checked: Tuesday Mar 28, 2017 2:22 AM PDT |
Defendant
Buffalo Alta Center, LLC
|
|
Defendant
Buffalo Retail Center, LLC
|
|
Defendant
IPTV-B-L6-136
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Ellen Devine
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 5 hours ago |
Wednesday, November 01, 2017 | ||
31 | 31
3
pgs
order
Order on Stipulation of Dismissal
Thu 11/02 7:37 AM
ORDER Granting30 Stipulation of Dismissal with prejudice. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 11/1/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR) |
|
30 | 30
motion
Stipulation of Dismissal
Wed 11/01 4:29 PM
STIPULATION of Dismissal with Prejudice by Defendants Buffalo Alta Center, LLC, Buffalo Retail Center, LLC, IPTV-B-L6-136. (Cushing, Kym) |
|
Friday, October 20, 2017 | ||
29 | 29
misc
Status Report in Removal Case
Fri 10/20 9:44 AM
STATUS REPORT RE: REMOVAL filed by Defendant IPTV-B-L6-136. (Houston, Carl) |
|
Tuesday, August 15, 2017 | ||
28 | 28
order
Order on Motion for Summary Judgment Order on Motion in Limine ~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines (non motion ddls)
Tue 08/15 9:12 AM
ORDER. IT IS ORDERED that22 ,23 ,24 the pending motions are DENIED as moot. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the parties shall file a stipulation to dismiss or a status report on or before 10/13/17. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 8/15/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR) |
|
Thursday, August 10, 2017 | ||
27 | 27
notice
Notice - Other
Thu 08/10 10:29 AM
NOTICE of Settlement and Request for Status Check by Buffalo Alta Center, LLC, Buffalo Retail Center, LLC. (Cushing, Kym) |
|
Thursday, July 27, 2017 | ||
26 | 26
order
Order on Motion in Limine
Thu 07/27 11:18 AM
ORDER Granting25 Motion in Limine. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 7/26/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR) |
|
Wednesday, July 05, 2017 | ||
25 | 25
motion
In Limine
Wed 07/05 2:17 PM
MOTION in Limine No. 2 Preclude Plaintiff's Untimely Disclosures by Defendant IPTV-B-L6-136. Responses due by 7/19/2017. (Cushing, Kym) |
|
Thursday, June 29, 2017 | ||
24 | 24
motion
Summary Judgment
Thu 06/29 12:23 PM
MOTION for Summary Judgment Plaintiff's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment by Plaintiff Ellen Devine. Responses due by 7/20/2017.(Kane, Michael) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit 1, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit 2 | ||
Friday, June 23, 2017 | ||
23 | 23
motion
In Limine
Fri 06/23 5:14 PM
MOTION in Limine No. 1 to Strike/Limit Plaintiff's Liability/Safety Expert (Dr. Gary Presswood) by Defendants Buffalo Retail Center, LLC, IPTV-B-L6-136. Responses due by 7/7/2017. (Cushing, Kym) |
|
22 | 22
motion
Summary Judgment
Fri 06/23 4:58 PM
MOTION for Summary Judgment (Oral Argument Requested) by Defendants Buffalo Retail Center, LLC, IPTV-B-L6-136. Responses due by 7/14/2017. (Cushing, Kym) |
|
Monday, April 24, 2017 | ||
21 | 21
order
Order on Motion to Remove Attorney from Electronic Service List ~Util - Add and Terminate Attorneys
Tue 04/25 8:29 AM
ORDER Granting20 Motion to Remove Attorney from Electronic Service List. Attorney Michael C Lafia terminated. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 4/24/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR) |
|
Friday, April 21, 2017 | ||
20 | 20
motion
Remove Attorney from Electronic Service List
Fri 04/21 3:54 PM
MOTION to remove attorney(s) Michael Lafia from the Electronic Service List in this case, by Defendants Buffalo Retail Center, LLC, IPTV-B-L6-136. (Houston, Carl) |
|
Thursday, April 20, 2017 | ||
19 | 19
misc
Status Report
Thu 04/20 2:59 PM
Joint STATUS REPORT (Amended) per Magistrate Judge Order by Defendants Buffalo Retail Center, LLC, IPTV-B-L6-136. (Cushing, Kym) |
|
Thursday, April 13, 2017 | ||
18 | 18
order
Order ~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines (non motion ddls)
Fri 04/14 9:03 AM
ORDER. IT IS ORDERED that the parties shall file an amended status report that complies with the local rules by 4/20/2017. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 4/13/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR) |
|
Wednesday, April 12, 2017 | ||
17 | 17
misc
Status Report
Wed 04/12 5:31 PM
Interim STATUS REPORT by Defendants Buffalo Retail Center, LLC, IPTV-B-L6-136. (Cushing, Kym) |
|
Wednesday, January 18, 2017 | ||
16 | 16
notice
Notices re AO 85 Consent to Mag Judge & Gen Ord 2013-1 Short Trial Rules
Wed 01/18 3:41 PM
NOTICE PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE IB 2-2: In accordance with 28 USC § 636(c) and FRCP 73, the parties in this action are provided with a link to the "AO 85 Notice of Availability, Consent, and Order of Reference - Exercise of Jurisdiction by a U.S. Magistrate Judge" form on the Court's website -[LINK:www.nvd.uscourts.gov] . AO 85 Consent forms should NOT be electronically filed. Upon consent of all parties, counsel are advised to manually file the form with the Clerk's Office. (A copy of form AO 85 has been mailed to parties not receiving electronic service.) NOTICE OF GENERAL ORDER 2013-1 AND OPPORTUNITY FOR EXPEDITED TRIAL SETTING: The parties in this action are provided with a link to General Order 2013-1 and the USDC Short Trial Rules on the Court's website - [LINK:www.nvd.uscourts.gov] . If the parties agree that this action can be ready for trial within 180 days and that a trial of this matter would take 3 days or less, the parties should consider participation in the USDC Short Trial Program. If the parties wish to be considered for entry into the Court's Short Trial Program, they should execute and electronically file with USDC Short Trial Form 4(a)(1) or Form 4(a)(2). (no image attached) (KW) |
|
15 | 15
order
Scheduling Order
Wed 01/18 3:40 PM
SCHEDULING ORDER granting ECF No.14 Joint Motion to Continue Discovery Deadlines (First Request). Discovery due by 5/30/2017. Motions due by 6/29/2017. Proposed Joint Pretrial Order due by 7/28/2017. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 01/17/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KW) |
|
Friday, January 13, 2017 | ||
14 | 14
motion
Extend Time/Shorten Time regarding Discovery or Nondispositive matter
Fri 01/13 4:20 PM
Joint MOTION to Extend Time regarding discovery/nondispositive matter (First Request) by Defendant IPTV-B-L6-136. (Cushing, Kym) |
|
Tuesday, November 22, 2016 | ||
13 | 13
notice
Notices re AO 85 Consent to Mag Judge & Gen Ord 2013-1 Short Trial Rules
Tue 11/22 8:23 AM
NOTICE PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE IB 2-2: In accordance with 28 USC § 636(c) and FRCP 73, the parties in this action are provided with a link to the "AO 85 Notice of Availability, Consent, and Order of Reference - Exercise of Jurisdiction by a U.S. Magistrate Judge" form on the Court's website -[LINK:www.nvd.uscourts.gov] . AO 85 Consent forms should NOT be electronically filed. Upon consent of all parties, counsel are advised to manually file the form with the Clerk's Office. (A copy of form AO 85 has been mailed to parties not receiving electronic service.) NOTICE OF GENERAL ORDER 2013-1 AND OPPORTUNITY FOR EXPEDITED TRIAL SETTING: The parties in this action are provided with a link to General Order 2013-1 and the USDC Short Trial Rules on the Court's website - [LINK:www.nvd.uscourts.gov] . If the parties agree that this action can be ready for trial within 180 days and that a trial of this matter would take 3 days or less, the parties should consider participation in the USDC Short Trial Program. If the parties wish to be considered for entry into the Court's Short Trial Program, they should execute and electronically file with USDC Short Trial Form 4(a)(1) or Form 4(a)(2). (no image attached) (DRM) |
|
Monday, November 21, 2016 | ||
12 | 12
order
Scheduling Order
Tue 11/22 8:23 AM
SCHEDULING ORDER re ECF No.11 Proposed Order : Discovery due by 3/28/2017. Motions due by 4/27/2017. Proposed Joint Pretrial Order due by 5/30/2017. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 11/21/2016. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM) |
|
Friday, November 18, 2016 | ||
11 | 11
misc
Proposed Discovery Plan/Scheduling Order
Fri 11/18 4:15 PM
PROPOSED Discovery Plan/Scheduling Order filed by Defendant IPTV-B-L6-136 . (Cushing, Kym) |
|
10 | 10
order
Order
Fri 11/18 2:34 PM
ORDER re9 Proposed Discovery Plan/Scheduling Order. The Court hereby DENIES the parties' stipulated proposed discovery plan and scheduling order (Docket No.9 ). The parties shall file a new stipulated proposed discovery plan and scheduling order that complies with the Local Rules, no later than November 21, 2016. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 11/18/2016. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MAJ) |
|
Thursday, November 17, 2016 | ||
9 | 9
misc
Proposed Discovery Plan/Scheduling Order
Thu 11/17 12:43 PM
PROPOSED Discovery Plan/Scheduling Order filed by Defendant IPTV-B-L6-136 . (Cushing, Kym) |
|
Thursday, November 03, 2016 | ||
8 | 8
order
Order
Thu 11/03 4:58 PM
ORDER re6 Order to Show Cause. IT IS ORDERED that6 the order to show cause is deemed satisfied and this action will not be remanded for lack of diversity jurisdiction at this time. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 11/3/16. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR) |
|
Thursday, October 27, 2016 | ||
7 | 7
misc
Response to Order to Show Cause
Thu 10/27 3:22 PM
RESPONSE to6 Order to Show Cause by Defendant IPTV-B-L6-136 .(Cushing, Kym) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit B, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit C, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit D, | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit E, | ||
Att: 6 Exhibit F | ||
Friday, September 30, 2016 | ||
6 | 6
order
Order to Show Cause ~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines (non motion ddls)
Fri 09/30 12:55 PM
ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. IT IS ORDERED that on or before 10/21/16, defendant IPTV-BL6- 136, LLC shall show cause in writing why this action should not be remanded for lack of subject matter jurisdiction. If defendant does not file a response to this Order by that date, the case will be remanded. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that plaintiff Ellen Devine shall file a response on or before 10/28/16. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR) |
|
4 | 4
minord
Minute Order
Fri 09/30 8:58 AM
MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Judge Andrew P. Gordon, on 9/30/2016. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Andrew P. Gordon. Judge Gordon's Chambers Practices, which are posted on the U.S. District Court, District of Nevada public website, may also be accessed directly via this hyperlink: [LINK:www.nvd.uscourts.gov] (no image attached) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MAJ) |
|
Thursday, September 29, 2016 | ||
5 | 5
minord
Minute Order re Removal - FORM
Fri 09/30 10:32 AM
MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Judge Andrew P. Gordon, on 9/29/2016. Statement regarding removed action is due by 10/17/2016. Joint Status Report regarding removed action is due by 11/1/2016. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - EDS) |
|
3 | 3
misc
Certificate of Interested Parties
Thu 09/29 1:23 PM
CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by IPTV-B-L6-136. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case . (Cushing, Kym) |
|
2 | 2
misc
Statement in Removal Case
Thu 09/29 1:21 PM
STATEMENT RE: REMOVAL filed by Defendant IPTV-B-L6-136.(Cushing, Kym) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit B, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit C | ||
1 | 1
cmp
Petition for Removal
Thu 09/29 1:14 PM
PETITION FOR REMOVAL from Eighth Judicial District Court, Case Number A-16-740675-C, (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0978-4304759), filed by IPTV-B-L6-136 dba Buffalo Retail Center.(Cushing, Kym) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit A, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit B, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit C, | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit D, | ||
Att: 6 Exhibit E | ||
utility
Assign Judges in Civil Case
Thu 09/29 1:29 PM
Case assigned to Judge Andrew P. Gordon and Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe. (ADR) |