COLEMAN v. OWENS et al
New Jersey District Court | |
Judge: | Jerome B Simandle |
Referred: | Ann Marie Donio |
Case #: | 1:16-cv-06190 |
Nature of Suit | 555 Prisoner Petitions - Habeas Corpus - Prison Condition |
Cause | 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights |
Case Filed: | Sep 30, 2016 |
Terminated: | Mar 15, 2017 |
Defendant
CAMDEN CITY
|
|
Defendant
CAMDEN COUNTY BOARD OF CHOSEN FREEHOLDERS
|
|
Defendant
CAMDEN COUNTY CORRECTIONAL FACILITY
|
|
Defendant
J. TAYLOR
|
|
Defendant
JAMES OWENS
|
|
Notice Only
nefpsCam
|
|
Plaintiff
VINCENT COLEMAN
|
Docket last updated: 04/16/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Wednesday, March 15, 2017 | ||
4 | 4
order
Order
Wed 03/15 2:27 PM
ORDER that the Complaint is DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE for failure to state a claim. ORDERED that Plaintiff may file an Amended Complaint within 30 days of the date of this Opinion and Order. ORDERED that the Clerk mark this case CLOSED. Signed by Chief Judge Jerome B. Simandle on 3/15/2017. (TH, ) |
|
3 | 3
order
Opinion
Wed 03/15 2:25 PM
OPINION. Signed by Chief Judge Jerome B. Simandle on 3/15/2017. (TH, ) |
|
utility
Terminate Civil Case
Wed 03/15 2:28 PM
***Civil Case Terminated without prejudice. (TH, ) |
||
Thursday, October 20, 2016 | ||
2 | 2
order
Order
Thu 10/20 4:33 PM
ORDER granting Plaintiff's IFP application and the Clerk shall file the Complaint. ORDERED that SUMMONS SHALL NOT ISSUE at this time. ORDERED that the time to serve process is extended 90 days after the Court permits the Complaint to proceed. Signed by Chief Judge Jerome B. Simandle on 10/20/2016. (TH, ) |
|
cmp
Complaint
Thu 10/20 4:34 PM
COMPLAINT against CAMDEN CITY, CAMDEN COUNTY BOARD OF CHOSEN FREEHOLDERS, CAMDEN COUNTY CORRECTIONAL FACILITY, JAMES OWENS with JURY DEMAND, filed by VINCENT COLEMAN. (Please see1 Complaint).(TH, ) |
||
Friday, September 30, 2016 | ||
1 | 1
service
Complaint Received
Fri 09/30 2:46 PM
Complaint Received.(mb, ) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 2 Application IFP |