Global Marine Exploration, Inc. v. The Unidentified, Wrecked and (for Finders-Right Purposes) Abandoned Sailing Vessel
Florida Middle District Court | |
Judge: | Karla R Spaulding |
Referred: | Karla R Spaulding |
Case #: | 6:16-cv-01742 |
Nature of Suit | 120 Contract - Marine |
Cause | 28:1333 Admiralty |
Case Filed: | Oct 05, 2016 |
Terminated: | Jun 29, 2018 |
Last checked: Monday Apr 03, 2017 5:00 AM EDT |
Defendant
The Unidentified, Wrecked and (for Finders-Right Purposes) Abandoned Sailing Vessel
|
|
Intervenor
Republic of France
|
Represented By
|
Intervenor
State of Florida Department of State
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Global Marine Exploration, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/22/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Friday, June 29, 2018 | ||
106 | 106
35
pgs
order
Order on motion to dismiss
Fri 06/29 12:42 PM
ORDER granting 75 motion to dismiss. The Clerk is directed to TERMINATE all pending motions and CLOSE the case. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karla R. Spaulding on 6/29/2018. (RDO) |