FameFlynet, Inc. v. UPROXX Media, Inc. et al
New York Southern District Court | |
Judge: | Denise L Cote |
Case #: | 1:16-cv-07833 |
Nature of Suit | 820 Property Rights - Copyrights |
Cause | 17:501 Copyright Infringement |
Case Filed: | Oct 06, 2016 |
Terminated: | Dec 15, 2016 |
Last checked: Tuesday Apr 04, 2017 5:12 AM EDT |
Defendant
UPROXX Media, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Woven Digital, Inc.
|
|
Plaintiff
FameFlynet, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/24/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Thursday, December 22, 2016 | ||
17 | 17
order
Notice of Voluntary Dismissal - Signed
Thu 12/22 9:55 AM
NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE Pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1)(A)(i) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, the plaintiff(s) and or their counsel(s), hereby give notice that the above-captioned action is voluntarily dismissed with prejudice against all the defendants. (Signed by Judge Denise L. Cote on 12/21/2016) (gr) |
|
Wednesday, December 21, 2016 | ||
misc
Note to Attorney - Document Referred to Judge for Approval
Wed 12/21 12:50 PM
***NOTE TO ATTORNEY - DOCUMENT REFERRED TO JUDGE FOR APPROVAL. Note to Attorney Craig Sanders Document 16 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal was referred to Judge Denise L. Cote for approval. (km) |
||
Tuesday, December 20, 2016 | ||
16 | 16
notice
Notice of Voluntary Dismissal
Tue 12/20 3:43 PM
NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL Pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1)(A)(i) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, the plaintiff(s) and or their counsel(s), hereby give notice that the above-captioned action is voluntarily dismissed, with prejudice against the defendant(s) All Defendants. Document filed by All Plaintiffs. (Sanders, Craig) |
|
Thursday, December 15, 2016 | ||
15 | 15
order
Order of Discontinuance
Thu 12/15 12:14 PM
ORDER OF DISCONTINUANCE: It having been reported to this Court that this case has been settled, it is hereby ORDERED that the above-captioned action is discontinued without costs to any party and without prejudice to restoring the action to this Courts calendar if the application to restore the action is made within thirty days. (Signed by Judge Denise L. Cote on 12/15/2016) (gr) |
|
Friday, December 09, 2016 | ||
14 | 14
service
Summons Returned Executed
Fri 12/09 4:41 PM
SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED. UPROXX Media, Inc. served on 11/8/2016, answer due 11/29/2016. Document filed by FameFlynet, Inc.. (Sanders, Craig) |
|
Friday, December 02, 2016 | ||
13 | 13
notice
Notice of Appearance
Fri 12/02 4:30 PM
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Erica Carvajal on behalf of FameFlynet, Inc.. (Carvajal, Erica) |
|
Tuesday, November 15, 2016 | ||
12 | 12
order
Stipulation and Order
Tue 11/15 10:56 AM
JOINT STIPULATION EXTENDING TIME TO ANSWER until December 14, 2016. There shall be no further extension. (Signed by Judge Denise Cote on 11/15/2016) (hm) |
|
Wednesday, November 09, 2016 | ||
11 | 11
service
Summons Returned Executed
Wed 11/09 2:28 PM
SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED. Woven Digital, Inc. served on 10/24/2016, answer due 11/14/2016. Document filed by FameFlynet, Inc.. (Sanders, Craig) |
|
Thursday, October 20, 2016 | ||
10 | 10
order
Order for Initial Pretrial Conference
Thu 10/20 3:40 PM
NOTICE OF INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE (Notice): Initial Conference set for 12/16/2016 at 11:00 AM in Courtroom 15B, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Denise L. Cote. -Please follow the procedures set forth in the Notice. (Signed by Judge Denise L. Cote on 10/20/2016) (gr) |
|
Friday, October 07, 2016 | ||
9 | 9
service
Summons Issued
Fri 10/07 11:13 AM
ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Woven Digital, Inc.. (dgo) |
|
8 | 8
service
Summons Issued
Fri 10/07 11:11 AM
ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to UPROXX Media, Inc.. (dgo) |
|
7 | 7
misc
AO 121 Form Copyright - Case Opening - Submitted
Fri 10/07 11:04 AM
AO 121 FORM COPYRIGHT - CASE OPENING - SUBMITTED. In compliance with the provisions of 17 U.S.C. 508, the Register of Copyrights is hereby advised that a court action has been filed on the following copyright(s) in the U.S. District Court Southern District of New York. Form e-mailed to Register of Copyrights. (dgo) |
|
notice
Case Opening Initial Assignment Notice
Fri 10/07 11:02 AM
CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Denise L. Cote. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at[LINK:http://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/District] . Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at[LINK:http://nysd.uscourts.gov/ecf_filing.php] . (dgo) |
||
utility
Case Designation
Fri 10/07 11:03 AM
Magistrate Judge Gabriel W. Gorenstein is so designated. (dgo) |
||
utility
Case Designated ECF
Fri 10/07 11:03 AM
Case Designated ECF. (dgo) |
||
Thursday, October 06, 2016 | ||
6 | 6
misc
Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement
Thu 10/06 4:18 PM
RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by FameFlynet, Inc..(Sanders, Craig) |
|
5 | 5
misc
Civil Cover Sheet
Thu 10/06 4:17 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Sanders, Craig) |
|
4 | 4
misc
AO 121 Form Copyright - Notice of Submission by Attorney
Thu 10/06 4:17 PM
AO 121 FORM COPYRIGHT - NOTICE OF SUBMISSION BY ATTORNEY. AO 121 Form Copyright for case opening submitted to court for review.(Sanders, Craig) |
|
3 | 3
service
Request for Issuance of Summons
Thu 10/06 4:17 PM
REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Woven Digital, Inc., re:1 Complaint. Document filed by FameFlynet, Inc.. (Sanders, Craig) |
|
2 | 2
service
Request for Issuance of Summons
Thu 10/06 4:15 PM
REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to UPROXX Media, Inc., re:1 Complaint. Document filed by FameFlynet, Inc.. (Sanders, Craig) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Thu 10/06 4:14 PM
COMPLAINT against UPROXX Media, Inc., Woven Digital, Inc.. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number 0208-12843978)Document filed by FameFlynet, Inc..(Sanders, Craig) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit 1 |