Estate of Jeffrey H. Ware v. Hospital of the University of, et al
Original Case: 2:14-cv-00014
Third Circuit U.S. Court of Appeals | |
Case #: | 0:16-cv-03801 |
Type | civil / private / diversity |
Nature of Suit | 360 Torts - Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury |
Case Filed: | Oct 06, 2016 |
Terminated: | Sep 18, 2017 |
Last checked: Tuesday Sep 19, 2017 4:29 AM EDT |
Defendant
CENTER FOR ACUTE RADIATION RESEARCH
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
NATIONAL SPACE BIOMEDICAL RESEARCH INSTITUTE
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
HOSPITAL OF THE UNIVERSITY OF PENNSYLVANIA
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
UNIVERSITY OF PENNSYLVANIA
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
PERELMAN SCHOOL OF MEDICINE UNIVERSITY OF PENNSYLVANIS
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
TRUSTEES OF THE UNIVERSITY OF PENNSYLVANIA
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
ANN R. KENNEDY, D.S.C.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
GARY KAO, M.D.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
MICHELLE ALONSO-BASANTA, M.D.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
NATIONAL SPACE BIOMEDICAL RESEARCH INSTITUTE
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
CENTER FOR ACUTE RADIATION RESEARCH
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
UNIVERSITY OF PENNSYLVANIA PERELMAN SCHOOL OF MEDICINE
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
UNIVERSITY OF PENNSYLVANIA TRUSTEES
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellant
ESTATE OF JEFFREY H. WARE BY BARBARA BOYER, Individually, on behalf of wrongful death beneficiaries and as Administratrix of the Estate of Jeffrey H. Ware
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellant
ESTATE OF JEFFREY H WARE, By Barbara Boyer, individually, on behalf of wrongful death beneficiaries and as Administratrix of the Estate of Jeffrey H. Ware
|
Represented By
|
1. | Federal judge rules in favor of UPENN over death of neuroscience teacher (phillyvoice.com) |
Submitted Mon 10/10/2016 | |
Docket last updated: 09/19/2017 4:29 AM EDT |
Thursday, October 06, 2016 | ||
RECORD available on District Court CM/ECF. (DW) | ||
Notice received from the district court that the docketing and filing fees were paid by the appellant on 10/05/2016. (DW) | ||
CIVIL CASE DOCKETED. Notice filed by Appellant Estate of Jeffrey H. Ware by Barbara Boyer in District Court No. 2-14-cv-00014. (DW) |