Harchar v. General Motors Company et al
Ohio Southern District Court | |
Judge: | James L Graham |
Referred: | Elizabeth Preston Deavers |
Case #: | 2:16-cv-00973 |
Nature of Suit | 355 Torts - Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle Product Liability |
Cause | 28:1441 Petition for Removal- Product Liability |
Case Filed: | Oct 07, 2016 |
Last checked: Wednesday Apr 05, 2017 5:48 AM EDT |
Cross Claimant
General Motors Company
|
Represented By
|
Cross Defendant
Takata
|
|
Cross Defendant
John Doe One
|
|
Cross Defendant
General Motors Company
|
Represented By
|
Cross Defendant
TK Holdings
|
|
Defendant
General Motors Company
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
John Doe One
|
|
Defendant
TK Holdings
629 Green Valley Road Suite 300
Greensboro, NC 27408 |
|
Plaintiff
Teri Harchar
|
Represented By
|
TERMINATED PARTIES | |
Cross Defendant
Matthew Shortland
Terminated: 03/31/2017
|
|
Defendant
Matthew Shortland
Terminated: 03/31/2017
|
|
Defendant
Takata
Terminated: 11/16/2016
|
Docket last updated: 75 minutes ago |
Monday, August 14, 2017 | ||
20 | 20
misc
Stipulation of Dismissal
Mon 08/14 3:08 PM
STIPULATION of Dismissal by Plaintiff Teri Harchar. (Van Hummel, Terry) |
|
Tuesday, May 30, 2017 | ||
19 | 19
order
Order
Tue 05/30 4:02 PM
STIPULATED ORDER - General Motors LLC shall be substituted for General Motors Company. General Motor Company is dismissed with prejudice and without costs. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Preston Deavers on May 30, 2017. (jlk) |
|
Friday, May 26, 2017 | ||
18 | 18
misc
Stipulation
Fri 05/26 10:49 AM
STIPULATION Stipulated Order to Substitute General Motors LLC as a Defendant in Place of General Motors Company by Defendant General Motors Company. (Guise, Clay) |
|
Wednesday, April 19, 2017 | ||
17 | 17
order
Columbus Preliminary Pretrial Order
Wed 04/19 4:34 PM
PRELIMINARY PRETRIAL ORDER: This case is referred to the September, 2017 SETTLEMENT WEEK. Motions to Amend due by 5/26/2017. Rule 26(a)(1) Disclosures due by 5/10/2017. Plaintiff's Primary Expert due by 8/8/2017. Defendants' Primary Expert due by 9/8/2017. Rebuttal Expert due by 10/20/2017. Discovery due by 12/1/2017. Dispositive motions due by 12/31/2017. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Preston Deavers on 4/19/2017. (jlk) |
|
Tuesday, April 11, 2017 | ||
minutes
Pretrial Conference - Interim
Wed 04/19 3:59 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Preston Deavers: Preliminary Pretrial Conference held on 4/11/2017. (sln) |
||
Thursday, April 06, 2017 | ||
16 | 16
misc
Rule 26(f) Report
Thu 04/06 1:52 PM
RULE 26(f) REPORT by Plaintiff Teri Harchar. (Van Hummel, Terry) |
|
Friday, March 31, 2017 | ||
15 | 15
order
Order on Report and Recommendations
Fri 03/31 11:10 AM
ORDER adopting Report and Recommendations re13 Report and Recommendations.. Signed by Judge James L. Graham on 3/31/2017. (ds) |
|
Tuesday, March 14, 2017 | ||
14 | 14
service
Summons Issued
Tue 03/14 2:51 PM
Summons Issued as to TK Holdings. (sem) |
|
13 | 13
motion
Report and Recommendations
Tue 03/14 2:48 PM
ORDER and REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION in that the Clerk is DIRECTED to issue the summons for TK Holdings as presented by Plaintiff and it is RECOMMENDED that the Court DISMISS without prejudice Defendant Matthew Shortland. Objections to R&R due by 3/28/2017. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Preston Deavers on 3/14/17. (sem) |
|
Monday, March 13, 2017 | ||
12 | 12
service
Request for Issuance of Summons
Mon 03/13 3:02 PM
REQUEST for Issuance of Summons. (Hummel, Terry) |
|
11 | 11
misc
Response to Order to Show Cause
Mon 03/13 3:00 PM
RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by Plaintiff Teri Harchar. (Hummel, Terry) |
|
Monday, February 27, 2017 | ||
10 | 10
notice
Notice of Hearing
Mon 02/27 11:49 AM
NOTICE of Hearing: Preliminary Pretrial Conference set for 4/11/2017 10:30 AM in Chambers before Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Preston Deavers. (sln) |
|
9 | 9
order
Order to Show Cause
Mon 02/27 11:30 AM
ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE: Plaintiff is ORDERED to SHOW CAUSE WITHIN FOURTEEN (14) DAYS OF THE DATE OF THIS ORDER why the Court should not dismiss this action for failure to effect service and why the Court should allow an extension of time to effect service. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Preston Deavers on 2/27/2017. (ew) |
|
Wednesday, December 07, 2016 | ||
8 | 8
answer
Answer to Amended Complaint Crossclaim
Wed 12/07 6:18 PM
General Motors Company's ANSWER to7 Amended Complaint Affirmative Defenses, Reliance on Jury Demand , CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants filed by General Motors Company. (Guise, Clay) |
|
Wednesday, November 16, 2016 | ||
7 | 7
cmp
Amended Complaint
Wed 11/16 12:37 PM
AMENDED COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against John Doe One, General Motors Company, Matthew Shortland, TK Holdings, filed by Teri Harchar. (Hummel, Terry) Modified on 11/16/2016 to correct text and add demand (kk) |
|
Tuesday, October 11, 2016 | ||
6 | 6
notice
Clerks Notice to Pro Hac Vice Attorney
Tue 10/11 10:58 AM
Notice by Clerk of Southern District of Ohio of Pro Hac Vice Rules as to Attorney Ryan H Lauer (kk) |
|
5 | 5
notice
Notice (Other)
Tue 10/11 10:56 AM
NOTICE of Docketing Removal by Clerk of Southern District of Ohio (kk) |
|
Monday, October 10, 2016 | ||
3 | 3
answer
Answer to Complaint Crossclaim
Mon 10/10 4:59 PM
General Motors Company's ANSWER to Complaint Affirmative Defenses, Reliance on Jury Demand and , CROSSCLAIM against Matthew Shortland, Takata filed by General Motors Company. (Guise, Clay) |
|
2 | 2
notice
Notice (Other)
Mon 10/10 4:55 PM
NOTICE by Defendant General Motors Company Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement of General Motors Company (Guise, Clay) |
|
misc
Corporate Disclosure Statement
Tue 10/11 10:45 AM
Corporate Disclosure Statement by Defendant General Motors Company SEE DOCKET # 2 FOR DOCUMENT . This entry is being created to utilize the correct filing event, "Corporate Disclosure Statement," which can be found in the "Other Documents" section of CM/ECF. (kk) |
||
Friday, October 07, 2016 | ||
4 | 4
cmp
Complaint
Tue 10/11 10:43 AM
COMPLAINT with JURY DEMAND filed in Franklin County Common Pleas Court by Teri Harchar against John Doe One, General Motors Company, Matthew Shortland, and Takata (kk) |
|
1 | 1
notice
Notice of Removal
Fri 10/07 4:04 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL General Motors Company's Notice of Removal to Federal Court Under 28 U.S.C. 1141(A) (Diversity) from Franklin County Common Pleas, case number 16-CV-008369 ( Filing fee $ 400 paid - receipt number: 0648-5686035), filed by General Motors Company. (Guise, Clay) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A - State Court Pleadings, | ||
Att: 2 Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 3 Supplemental Civil Cover Sheet |