Kolbe v. Liberty Life Assurance Company of Boston
Minnesota District Court | |
Judge: | David S Doty |
Referred: | Tony N Leung |
Case #: | 0:16-cv-03406 |
Nature of Suit | 791 Labor - Employee Retirement Income Security Act |
Cause | 28:1132 E.R.I.S.A. |
Case Filed: | Oct 07, 2016 |
Terminated: | Jul 25, 2017 |
Last checked: Wednesday Apr 05, 2017 4:46 AM CDT |
Defendant
Liberty Life Assurance Company of Boston
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Patricia Kolbe
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/24/2024 11:59 PM CDT |
Wednesday, July 26, 2017 | ||
23 | 23
order
Judgment (Clerk's Office Only)
Wed 07/26 4:10 PM
JUDGMENT(JDF) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Notice - appeal | ||
Tuesday, July 25, 2017 | ||
22 | 22
order
Order Dismissing Case
Tue 07/25 2:23 PM
ORDER DISMISSING CASE. Signed by Senior Judge David S. Doty on 7/25/2017. (DLO) |
|
Thursday, July 20, 2017 | ||
21 | 21
misc
Proposed Order to Judge re Stipluation
Thu 07/20 2:12 PM
PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re20 Stipulation of Dismissal. (Mathisen, Eric) |
|
20 | 20
misc
Stipulation of Dismissal
Thu 07/20 2:10 PM
STIPULATION of Dismissal by Liberty Life Assurance Company of Boston. Jointly Signed by Patricia Kolbe. (Mathisen, Eric) |
|
Monday, May 15, 2017 | ||
19 | 19
notice
Notice of Withdrawal as Attorney
Mon 05/15 3:18 PM
NOTICE of Withdrawal as Attorney (Wyatt-Brown, Natalie) |
|
Tuesday, February 07, 2017 | ||
18 | 18
order
Order on Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice
Tue 02/07 11:34 AM
TEXT ONLY ENTRY: ORDER granting15 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Eric Peter Mathisen for Liberty Life Assurance Company of Boston. Approved by Magistrate Judge Tony N. Leung on 2/7/17. (JLW) |
|
Monday, February 06, 2017 | ||
17 | 17
notice
Notice of Withdrawal as Attorney
Mon 02/06 7:06 PM
NOTICE of Withdrawal as Attorney (Freske, Michael) |
|
16 | 16
notice
Notice of Appearance
Mon 02/06 5:43 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Michael John Kemmitt on behalf of Patricia Kolbe. (Kemmitt, Michael) |
|
15 | 15
motion
Pro Hac Vice (Filing Attorney is a Minnesota Resident)
Mon 02/06 4:16 PM
MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Eric P. Mathisen. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AMNDC-5326923 by Liberty Life Assurance Company of Boston. (McKinney, David) |
|
Tuesday, December 13, 2016 | ||
14 | 14
order
Scheduling Order
Tue 12/13 2:30 PM
PRETRIAL SCHEDULING ORDER (ERISA BENEFITS CASE): Amended Pleadings due by 3/1/2017. Discovery due by 7/1/2017. Motions (non-disp) due 7/1/2017. Motions (disp) due by 9/1/2017. Ready for trial due by 12/1/2017. Signed by Magistrate Judge Tony N. Leung on 12/13/2016. (lmb) |
|
13 | 13
minutes
Pretrial Conference - Initial
Tue 12/13 1:36 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Tony N. Leung: Rule 16 Pretrial Conference held on 12/13/2016. Pretrial scheduling order will be issued. (lmb) |
|
Friday, December 02, 2016 | ||
12 | 12
notice
Notice of Withdrawal as Attorney
Fri 12/02 12:10 PM
NOTICE of Withdrawal as Attorney (Operana, Brandon) |
|
11 | 11
notice
Notice of Appearance
Fri 12/02 12:05 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Michael T Freske on behalf of Patricia Kolbe. (Freske, Michael) |
|
Thursday, December 01, 2016 | ||
10 | 10
notice
Notice of Hearing
Thu 12/01 4:10 PM
TEXT ONLY ENTRY: NOTICE of Rescheduling Hearing: The Pretrial Conference is now set for 12/13/2016 at 1:00 PM in Judge's Chambers, Suite 342 (St. Paul) before Magistrate Judge Tony N. Leung. (HAM) |
|
Wednesday, November 30, 2016 | ||
9 | 9
misc
Rule 26(f) Report
Wed 11/30 3:03 PM
REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. Filed by Liberty Life Assurance Company of Boston. Jointly Signed by Plaintiff Patricia Kolbe.(McKinney, David) |
|
Friday, November 04, 2016 | ||
8 | 8
order
Order
Fri 11/04 4:44 PM
NOTICE OF AND ORDER FOR PRETRIAL SCHEDULING CONFERENCE: Pretrial Conference set for 12/12/2016 01:00 PM in Judge's Chambers, Suite 342 (STP) before Magistrate Judge Tony N. Leung. Signed by Magistrate Judge Tony N. Leung on 11/4/2016.(MMP) |
|
Att: 1 Consent Form | ||
Thursday, November 03, 2016 | ||
7 | 7
discov
Rule 7.1 - Disclosure Statement
Thu 11/03 2:39 PM
RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Liberty Mutual Holding Company, Inc. is a corporate parent of Defendant Liberty Life Assurance Company of Boston. LMHC Massachusetts Holdings Inc. is a corporate parent of Defendant Liberty Life Assurance Company of Boston. Liberty Mutual Group Inc. is a corporate parent of Defendant Liberty Life Assurance Company of Boston. (Wyatt-Brown, Natalie) |
|
6 | 6
answer
Answer to Complaint
Thu 11/03 2:36 PM
ANSWER to Complaint by Liberty Life Assurance Company of Boston. (Wyatt-Brown, Natalie) |
|
Friday, October 14, 2016 | ||
5 | 5
order
Order
Fri 10/14 12:11 PM
ORDER Regarding Dispositive Motion Procedure. Signed by Senior Judge David S. Doty on 10/14/2016. (CLB) |
|
Tuesday, October 11, 2016 | ||
4 | 4
order
Order Reassigning Case
Tue 10/11 4:15 PM
ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Senior Judge David S. Doty for all further proceedings. Judge Ann D. Montgomery no longer assigned to case. NOTE: the new case number is 16-cv-3406 (DSD/TNL) . Please use this case number for all subsequent pleadings. Signed by Judge Ann D. Montgomery on 10/11/2016. (lmb) |
|
Friday, October 07, 2016 | ||
3 | 3
service
Summons Issued
Fri 10/07 2:41 PM
Summons Issued as to Liberty Life Assurance Company of Boston. (las) |
|
2 | 2
notice
Notice of Initial Case Assignment
Fri 10/07 2:37 PM
TEXT ONLY ENTRY: CLERK'S NOTICE OF INITIAL CASE ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Ann D. Montgomery per Civil Master List and referred to Magistrate Judge Tony N. Leung. Please use case number 16-cv-03406 (ADM/TNL). (las) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Fri 10/07 1:48 PM
COMPLAINT against Liberty Life Assurance Company of Boston. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number AMNDC-5140238.) Filed by Patricia Kolbe. Filer requests summons issued. (Operana, Brandon) Modified on 10/7/2016 (las) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit(s), | ||
Att: 2 Civil Cover Sheet |