In Re: MYLAN N.V. SECURITIES LITIGATION
New York Southern District Court | |
Judge: | J Paul Oetken |
Case #: | 1:16-cv-07926 |
Nature of Suit | 850 Other Statutes - Securities/Commodities/Exchange |
Cause | 15:78m(a) Securities Exchange Act |
Case Filed: | Oct 11, 2016 |
Terminated: | Mar 31, 2023 |
Last checked: Sunday Apr 09, 2017 6:35 AM EDT |
Consolidated Defendant
Heather Bresch
|
Represented By
|
Consolidated Defendant
Paul B. Campbell
|
Represented By
|
Consolidated Defendant
Robert J. Coury
|
Represented By
|
Consolidated Defendant
John D. Sheehan
|
Represented By
|
Consolidated Defendant
Mylan N.V.
|
Represented By
|
Consolidated Defendant
Mylan, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Consolidated Defendant
Kenneth S. Parks
|
Represented By
|
Consolidated Plaintiff
Landon W. Perdue
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
John D. Sheehan
|
Represented By
|
Movant
Menorah Mivtachim Insurance Ltd.
|
Represented By
|
Movant
Vladimir Tchentsov
|
Represented By
|
Movant
Phoenix Insurance Company Ltd.
|
Represented By
|
Movant
Menorah Mivtachim Pensions and Gemel Ltd.
|
Represented By
|
Movant
Meitav DS Provident Funds and Pension Ltd.
|
Represented By
|
Movant
Dan Kleinerman
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Stef Van Duppen
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/17/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Thursday, April 27, 2023 | ||
appeal
Appeal Fee Paid via Pay.gov
Thu 04/27 8:54 AM
Appeal Fee Paid electronically via Pay.gov: for466 Notice of Appeal. Filing fee $ 505.00. Pay.gov receipt number ANYSDC-27658571, paid on 4/27/2023..(nd) |
||
appeal
Transmission of Notice of Appeal and Docket Sheet to USCA
Thu 04/27 8:54 AM
Transmission of Notice of Appeal and Certified Copy of Docket Sheet to US Court of Appeals re:466 Notice of Appeal..(nd) |
||
appeal
Appeal Record Sent to USCA - Electronic File
Thu 04/27 8:55 AM
Appeal Record Sent to USCA (Electronic File). Certified Indexed record on Appeal Electronic Files for466 Notice of Appeal filed by Menorah Mivtachim Insurance Ltd., Phoenix Insurance Company Ltd., Menorah Mivtachim Pensions and Gemel Ltd., Meitav DS Provident Funds and Pension Ltd. were transmitted to the U.S. Court of Appeals..(nd) |
||
Wednesday, April 26, 2023 | ||
466 | 466
appeal
Notice of Appeal
Wed 04/26 6:15 PM
NOTICE OF APPEAL from109 Endorsed Letter, Add and Terminate Parties,,137 Stipulation and Order, Set Deadlines,,,, 286 Order on Motion to Seal, 234 Order on Motion to Seal, 324 Order on Motion to Seal, 269 Order on Motion to Seal,10 Stipulation and Order,,, 22 Order on Motion for Extension of Time, 38 Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, 454 Order on Motion to Adjourn Conference,150 Stipulation and Order,,282 Memo Endorsement, Add and Terminate Attorneys,, 449 Order on Motion to Strike,102 Memorandum & Opinion,, 311 Order on Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages,, 424 Order on Motion to Seal, 196 Order on Motion for Conference,,463 Memorandum & Opinion,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,128 Order on Motion to Withdraw,, 416 Order on Motion for Extension of Time, 159 Order on Motion for Extension of Time, 71 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer,104 Scheduling Order,, 273 Order on Motion for Leave to File Document, 310 Order on Motion for Leave to File Document, Order, 284 Order on Motion to Seal,224 Stipulation and Order, Set Deadlines,,,,,,,,143 Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney,448 Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney, 151 Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, 254 Order on Motion for Conference,106 Scheduling Order,,309 Stipulation and Order, Set Deadlines,,,,,, 164 Order on Motion for Conference,122 Stipulation and Order, Set Deadlines/Hearings,,,,,,,,121 Protective Order,26 Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel, Order on Motion to Appoint Lead Plaintiff(s), Order on Motion to Consolidate Cases,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,99 Stipulation and Order, Set Deadlines/Hearings,,,, 271 Order on Motion for Leave to File Document, Order on Motion for Oral Argument, 84 Order on Motion to Adjourn Conference,256 Stipulation and Order, Set Deadlines/Hearings,,,,,,,,,,,, 351 Order on Motion to Seal, Scheduling Order, 195 Order on Motion to Seal,181 Stipulation and Order,,,283 Memo Endorsement, Add and Terminate Attorneys,,225 Stipulation and Order, Set Deadlines,,,, 441 Order on Motion to Seal, 392 Order on Motion to Seal,245 Stipulation and Order, Set Deadlines/Hearings,,,,,,220 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief,88 Order, Add and Terminate Attorneys,,,, 457 Order, 323 Order on Motion to Seal, 270 Order on Motion to Seal,82 Order, Set Deadlines/Hearings,, 31 Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, 236 Order on Motion for Leave to File Document,149 Scheduling Order, 291 Order on Motion to Seal, 346 Order on Motion to Seal, 462 Order on Motion to Seal, 450 Order on Motion for Leave to File Document, 442 Order on Motion to Seal,35 Stipulation and Order, Set Deadlines,,,,,, 214 Order on Motion to Seal, 285 Order on Motion for Conference, 418 Order on Motion to Seal,237 Stipulation and Order, Set Deadlines,,,,,,,,,,140 Memorandum & Opinion,,, 456 Order on Motion to Adjourn Conference,79 Order, Terminate Hearings,, 417 Order on Motion to Seal,353 Stipulation and Order, Set Deadlines/Hearings,,,, 238 Order on Motion for Conference, 173 Order on Motion for Leave to File Document, 215 Order on Motion for Conference,,178 Stipulation and Order, Set Deadlines/Hearings,,52 Order,87 Order, Add and Terminate Attorneys,,,,76 Order for Initial Pretrial Conference,217 Stipulation and Order,,, 213 Order on Motion to Seal,464 Clerk's Judgment,,357 Order, Add and Terminate Attorneys,,,, 263 Order on Motion for Extension of Time, Order on Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages,,,,69 Memorandum & Opinion,,86 Order, Set Deadlines/Hearings,,,, 253 Order on Motion for Conference,113 Terminate Deadlines, Stipulation and Order, Set Deadlines,,,,,,165 Protective Order,183 Stipulation and Order,,,,,,,, 393 Order on Motion to Seal,199 Stipulation and Order,,,200 Order on Motion for Leave to File Document,, 338 Order on Motion to Seal, 274 Order on Motion to Compel, 32 Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Document filed by Meitav DS Provident Funds and Pension Ltd., Menorah Mivtachim Insurance Ltd., Menorah Mivtachim Pensions and Gemel Ltd., Phoenix Insurance Company Ltd.. Form C and Form D are due within 14 days to the Court of Appeals, Second Circuit..(Lieberman, Jeremy) |
|
465 | 465
appeal
Notice of Appeal
Wed 04/26 1:04 PM
FILING ERROR - NO ORDER SELECTED FOR APPEAL - NOTICE OF APPEAL. Document filed by Meitav DS Provident Funds and Pension Ltd., Menorah Mivtachim Insurance Ltd., Menorah Mivtachim Pensions and Gemel Ltd., Phoenix Insurance Company Ltd.. Filing fee $ 505.00, receipt number ANYSDC-27658571. Form C and Form D are due within 14 days to the Court of Appeals, Second Circuit..(Lieberman, Jeremy) Modified on 4/26/2023 (tp) |
|
misc
Notice to Attorney Regarding Deficient Appeal
Wed 04/26 1:14 PM
***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT APPEAL. Notice to attorney Jeremy Lieberman to RE-FILE Document No. 465 Notice of Appeal. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the order/judgment being appealed was not selected. Re-file the appeal using the event type Notice of Appeal found under the event list Appeal Documents - attach the correct signed PDF - select the correct named filer/filers - select the correct order/judgment being appealed - Do Not Pay the Appeal Fee Again. (tp) |