WHERRITY v. BOARD OF CHOSEN FREEHOLDERS et al
New Jersey District Court | |
Judge: | Jerome B Simandle |
Referred: | Ann Marie Donio |
Case #: | 1:16-cv-07049 |
Nature of Suit | 555 Prisoner Petitions - Habeas Corpus - Prison Condition |
Cause | 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights |
Case Filed: | Oct 12, 2016 |
Terminated: | Feb 21, 2017 |
Defendant
BOARD OF CHOSEN FREEHOLDERS CAMDEN COUNTY NEW JERSEY
|
|
Defendant
CAMDEN COUNTY DEPARTMENT OF CORRECTIONS
|
|
Defendant
WARDEN CAMDEN COUNTY JAIL
|
|
Notice Only
nefpsJBS
|
|
Plaintiff
SCOTT WHERRITY
|
Docket last updated: 04/17/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Tuesday, February 21, 2017 | ||
4 | 4
order
Order
Tue 02/21 3:57 PM
ORDER Complaint is Dismissed without Prejudice for failure to state a claim. Directing Clerk to mark this case as closed. nm 2/22. Signed by Chief Judge Jerome B. Simandle on 2/21/17. (jbk, ) |
|
3 | 3
order
Opinion
Tue 02/21 3:56 PM
OPINION. Signed by Chief Judge Jerome B. Simandle on 2/2/17. (jbk, ) |
|
utility
Terminate Civil Case
Tue 02/21 3:58 PM
***Civil Case Terminated. (jbk, ) |
||
Friday, December 09, 2016 | ||
2 | 2
order
Order
Mon 12/12 2:38 PM
ORDER that Plaintiff's IFP is granted, and the Complaint shall be filed. ORDERED that SUMMONS SHALL NOT ISSUE at this time. ORDERED that the time to serve process is extended 90 days after the Court permits the Complaint to proceed. Signed by Chief Judge Jerome B. Simandle on 12/9/2016. (TH, ) |
|
cmp
Complaint
Mon 12/12 2:39 PM
COMPLAINT against BOARD OF CHOSEN FREEHOLDERS, CAMDEN COUNTY DEPARTMENT OF CORRECTIONS, CAMDEN COUNTY JAIL, CAMDEN COUNTY NEW JERSEY, filed by SCOTT WHERRITY. (see1 Complaint).(TH, ) |
||
Wednesday, October 12, 2016 | ||
1 | 1
service
Complaint Received
Wed 10/12 4:40 PM
Complaint Received.(rtm, ) |
|
Att: 1 Application IFP |