D'Oria v. Commissioner of Social Security
Florida Middle District Court | |
Judge: | Thomas B Smith |
Referred: | Thomas B Smith |
Case #: | 6:16-cv-01779 |
Nature of Suit | 864 Social Security - SSID Title XVI |
Cause | 42:405 Review of HHS Decision (SSID) |
Case Filed: | Oct 12, 2016 |
Terminated: | Jul 06, 2017 |
Create an account to get the full party report for this case.
Docket last updated: 04/17/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Thursday, July 06, 2017 | ||
19 | 19
misc
Judgment
Thu 07/06 8:30 AM
JUDGMENT-IT IS ORDERED AND ADJUDGED that the decision of the Commissioner is reversed and this case is remanded to the Social Security Administration for further proceedings *pursuant to sentence four of 42 U.S.C. § 405(g). (Signed by Deputy Clerk) (JP) |
|
Wednesday, July 05, 2017 | ||
18 | 18
11
pgs
order
Opinion and order
Wed 07/05 4:09 PM
OPINION AND ORDER reversing the administrative decision and remanding under sentence four of 42 U.S.C. 405(g) for further administrative proceedings. The Clerk is directed to enter judgment and close the file. Signed by Magistrate Judge Thomas B. Smith on 7/5/2017. (EC) |
|
Friday, May 19, 2017 | ||
17 | 17
respoth
Memorandum social security - defendant
Fri 05/19 7:52 AM
MEMORANDUM in support of the Commissioner's decision Joint filed by Commissioner of Social Security. (Rudy, John) |
|
Tuesday, January 24, 2017 | ||
16 | 16
notice
Notice of pendency of related cases
Tue 01/24 1:25 PM
NOTICE of pendency of related cases re14 Related case order and track 1 notice per Local Rule 1.04(d) by Julia D'Oria. Related case(s): yes (Punjani, Salim) |
|
Wednesday, January 18, 2017 | ||
15 | 15
notice
Notice of pendency of related cases
Wed 01/18 3:11 PM
NOTICE of pendency of related cases re14 Related case order and track 1 notice per Local Rule 1.04(d) by Commissioner of Social Security. Related case(s): y (Rudy, John) |
|
Tuesday, January 17, 2017 | ||
14 | 14
order
Related case order and track 1 notice
Tue 01/17 3:32 PM
RELATED CASE ORDER. Notice of pendency of other actions due by 1/31/2017. Signed by Magistrate Judge Thomas B. Smith on 1/17/2017. (KWH) |
|
Thursday, December 22, 2016 | ||
13 | 13
order
Scheduling Order - Social Security
Thu 12/22 4:38 PM
SCHEDULING ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Thomas B. Smith on 12/22/2016. (KWH) |
|
Wednesday, December 21, 2016 | ||
12 | 12
utility
Case Assigned/Reassigned
Wed 12/21 11:07 AM
Case Reassigned to Magistrate Judge Thomas B. Smith. New case number: 6:16-cv-1779-ORL-TBS. Judge Roy B. Dalton, Jr. no longer assigned to the case. (EJS) |
|
Tuesday, December 20, 2016 | ||
11 | 11
order
Order on consent to jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge
Tue 12/20 1:52 PM
ORDER approving consent to jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge. Signed by Judge Roy B. Dalton, Jr. on 12/20/2016. (VMF) |
|
Monday, December 19, 2016 | ||
10 | 10
misc
Social security transcript
Mon 12/19 11:25 AM
SOCIAL security transcript of administrative proceedings re8 Answer to Complaint by Commissioner of Social Security.(Rudy, John) |
|
Att: 1 Appendix, | ||
Att: 2 Appendix, | ||
Att: 3 Appendix, | ||
Att: 4 Appendix, | ||
Att: 5 Appendix, | ||
Att: 6 Appendix, | ||
Att: 7 Appendix, | ||
Att: 8 Appendix, | ||
Att: 9 Appendix, | ||
Att: 10 Appendix, | ||
Att: 11 Appendix, | ||
Att: 12 Appendix, | ||
Att: 13 Appendix, | ||
Att: 14 Appendix, | ||
Att: 15 Appendix | ||
9 | 9
misc
Consent to jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge
Mon 12/19 11:20 AM
CONSENT to trial by U.S. Magistrate Judge by Commissioner of Social Security. (Rudy, John) |
|
8 | 8
answer
Answer to Complaint
Mon 12/19 11:19 AM
ANSWER to 1 Complaint by Commissioner of Social Security.(Rudy, John) |
|
Tuesday, November 22, 2016 | ||
7 | 7
service
Proof of service
Tue 11/22 2:41 PM
PROOF of service by Julia D'Oria(Punjani, Salim) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit Return Receipt - Regional Chief Counsel | ||
6 | 6
service
Proof of service
Tue 11/22 2:39 PM
PROOF of service by Julia D'Oria(Punjani, Salim) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit Return Receipt - Attorney General | ||
5 | 5
service
Summons returned executed as to USA
Tue 11/22 2:37 PM
SUMMONS returned executed by Julia D'Oria. Commissioner of Social Security served on 10/27/2016, answer due 12/27/2016.(Punjani, Salim) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit Return Receipt - U.S. Attorney | ||
Tuesday, October 18, 2016 | ||
4 | 4
notice
Notice of designation of track
Tue 10/18 9:50 AM
NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - Track 1 (VMF) (ctp) |
|
Thursday, October 13, 2016 | ||
3 | 3
order
SS Standing Order
Thu 10/13 2:51 PM
ORDER requiring electronic filing of the administrative record in Social Security cases (See 6:10-mc-95-ORL-22, Doc. 1) Signed by Judge Anne C. Conway on 7/23/2010. (EJS) |
|
2 | 2
service
Summons issued as to USA
Thu 10/13 2:50 PM
SUMMONS issued as to Commissioner of Social Security, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. (EJS) |
|
Wednesday, October 12, 2016 | ||
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Thu 10/13 2:42 PM
COMPLAINT against Commissioner of Social Security (Filing Fee $400 Receipt Number ORL57453) filed by Julia D'Oria.(EJS) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A, | ||
Att: 2 Civil Cover Sheet |