Forward Thinking Tracking, LLC v. TeleTracking Technologies, Inc.
Texas Eastern District Court | |
Judge: | Rodney Gilstrap |
Case #: | 2:16-cv-01173 |
Nature of Suit | 830 Property Rights - Patent |
Cause | 35:271 Patent Infringement |
Case Filed: | Oct 17, 2016 |
Terminated: | May 06, 2017 |
Last checked: Saturday Apr 15, 2017 4:43 AM CDT |
Counter Claimant
TeleTracking Technologies, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Counter Defendant
Forward Thinking Tracking, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
TeleTracking Technologies, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Forward Thinking Tracking, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/18/2024 11:59 PM CDT |
Monday, May 08, 2017 | ||
16 | 16
notice
Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120)
Mon 05/08 9:32 AM
Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120) at termination of case. AO 120 mailed to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (ch, ) |
|
Saturday, May 06, 2017 | ||
15 | 15
order
Order Dismissing Case
Mon 05/08 9:30 AM
ORDER DISMISSING CASE with prejudice. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 5/6/2017. (ch, ) |
|
Wednesday, December 21, 2016 | ||
14 | 14
order
Order ~Util - Set/Clear Flags ~Util - Create Case Association
Wed 12/21 3:45 PM
CONSOLIDATION ORDER - The above-captioned cases are hereby ORDERED to be CONSOLIDATED for all pretrial issues (except venue) with the LEAD CASE, Cause No. 2:16-cv-01125. All parties are instructed to file any future filings (except relating to venue) in the LEAD CASE. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 12/21/2016. (ch, ) |
|
Monday, December 19, 2016 | ||
13 | 13
notice
Notice of Attorney Appearance
Mon 12/19 1:15 PM
NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Gary R Sorden on behalf of All Defendants (Sorden, Gary) |
|
Friday, December 16, 2016 | ||
12 | 12
answer
Answer to Complaint Counterclaim
Fri 12/16 4:44 PM
ANSWER to1 Complaint, , COUNTERCLAIM against Forward Thinking Tracking, LLC by TeleTracking Technologies, Inc..(Sorden, Gary) |
|
11 | 11
respoth
Claim
Fri 12/16 4:20 PM
CLAIM counterclaims by TeleTracking Technologies, Inc.. (Sorden, Gary) |
|
Tuesday, November 08, 2016 | ||
10 | 10
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer
Tue 11/08 4:25 PM
ORDER granting9 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer 12/16/2016. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 11/8/2016. (ch, ) |
|
Monday, October 31, 2016 | ||
9 | 9
motion
Extension of Time to File Answer
Mon 10/31 6:16 PM
Agreed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by TeleTracking Technologies, Inc..(Sorden, Gary) |
|
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order | ||
Tuesday, October 25, 2016 | ||
8 | 8
service
Summons Returned Executed
Tue 10/25 11:35 AM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Forward Thinking Tracking, LLC. TeleTracking Technologies, Inc. served on 10/19/2016, answer due 11/9/2016. (ch, ) |
|
Tuesday, October 18, 2016 | ||
7 | 7
service
Summons Issued
Tue 10/18 8:56 AM
SUMMONS Issued as to TeleTracking Technologies, Inc.. (ch, ) |
|
utility
Case Assigned/Reassigned
Tue 10/18 8:51 AM
Case assigned to Judge Rodney Gilstrap. (ch, ) |
||
notice
Notice of Magistrate Availability
Tue 10/18 8:51 AM
In accordance with the provisions of 28 USC Section 636(c), you are hereby notified that a U.S. Magistrate Judge of this district court is available to conduct any or all proceedings in this case including a jury or non-jury trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. The form[LINK:Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge] is available on our website. All signed consent forms, excluding pro se parties, should be filed electronically using the event Notice Regarding Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge . (ch, ) |
||
Monday, October 17, 2016 | ||
6 | 6
notice
Notice of Attorney Appearance
Mon 10/17 8:18 PM
NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Elizabeth L DeRieux on behalf of Forward Thinking Tracking, LLC (DeRieux, Elizabeth) |
|
5 | 5
notice
Notice of Designation of Attorney in Charge
Mon 10/17 8:17 PM
NOTICE of Designation of Attorney in Charge to Eric Benjamin Hanson on behalf of Forward Thinking Tracking, LLC (Hanson, Eric) |
|
4 | 4
notice
Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120)
Mon 10/17 8:16 PM
Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120). AO 120 mailed to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Hanson, Eric) |
|
3 | 3
misc
Jury Demand
Mon 10/17 8:15 PM
DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Forward Thinking Tracking, LLC. (Hanson, Eric) |
|
2 | 2
notice
Corporate Disclosure Statement
Mon 10/17 8:14 PM
CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Forward Thinking Tracking, LLC (Hanson, Eric) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Mon 10/17 8:12 PM
COMPLAINT for Patent Infringement against TeleTracking Technologies, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0540-5987453.), filed by Forward Thinking Tracking, LLC.(Hanson, Eric) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A - '741 Patent, | ||
Att: 2 Civil Cover Sheet |