Fabric Selection, Inc. v. Zumiez, Inc. et al
California Central District Court | |
Judge: | S James Otero |
Referred: | Frederick F Mumm |
Case #: | 2:16-cv-07798 |
Nature of Suit | 820 Property Rights - Copyrights |
Cause | 17:101 Copyright Infringement |
Case Filed: | Oct 19, 2016 |
Terminated: | Nov 03, 2016 |
Last checked: Monday Apr 17, 2017 2:35 AM PDT |
Defendant
Zumiez, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Does
|
|
Plaintiff
Fabric Selection, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/24/2024 11:59 PM PDT |
Friday, November 04, 2016 | ||
12 | 12
misc
Report of Determination of Copyright Action (CLOSE) (AO 121)
Fri 11/04 1:19 PM
REPORT ON THE DETERMINATION OF AN ACTION Regarding a Copyright. (Closing)Mailed closing report to Copyright Office. (lc) |
|
Thursday, November 03, 2016 | ||
11 | 11
notice
Voluntary Dismissal of a Case (Pursuant to FRCP 41a (1))
Thu 11/03 9:40 AM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal filed by Plaintiff Fabric Selection, Inc.. Dismissal is without prejudice. (Jeong, Chan) |
|
Tuesday, November 01, 2016 | ||
10 | 10
textonly
Generic Text Only Entry
Tue 11/01 12:32 PM
NOTICE TO PARTIES by District Judge S. James Otero. Effective November 7, 2016, Judge Otero will be located at the 1st Street Courthouse, COURTROOM 10C on the 10th floor, located at 350 W. 1st Street, Los Angeles, California 90012. All Court appearances shall be made in Courtroom 10C of the 1st Street Courthouse, and all mandatory chambers copies shall be hand delivered to the judge's mail box outside the Clerk's Office on the 4th floor of the 1st Street Courthouse. The location for filing civil documents in paper format exempted from electronic filing and for viewing case files and other records services remains at the United States Courthouse, 312 North Spring Street, Room G-8, Los Angeles, California 90012. The location for filing criminal documents in paper format exempted from electronic filing remains at Edward R. Roybal Federal Building and U.S. Courthouse, 255 East Temple Street, Room 178, Los Angeles, California 90012. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (rrp) |
|
Friday, October 21, 2016 | ||
9 | 9
order
Initial Order upon Filing of Complaint - form only
Fri 10/21 11:05 AM
INITIAL STANDING ORDER upon filing of the complaint by Judge S. James Otero. (vcr) |
|
Thursday, October 20, 2016 | ||
8 | 8
service
Summons Issued (Attorney Civil Case Opening)
Thu 10/20 11:20 AM
21 DAY Summons issued re Complaint1 as to defendant Zumiez, Inc. (esa) |
|
7 | 7
adr
Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program (ADR-8) - optional html form
Thu 10/20 11:11 AM
NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (esa) |
|
6 | 6
notice
Notice of Assignment to United States Judges (CV-18) - optional html form
Thu 10/20 11:11 AM
NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge S. James Otero and Magistrate Judge Frederick F. Mumm. (esa) |
|
Wednesday, October 19, 2016 | ||
5 | 5
misc
Report on Filing of Copyright Action (Initial Notification) (AO-121)
Wed 10/19 6:26 PM
REPORT ON THE FILING OF AN ACTION regarding a copyright (Initial Notification) filed by Fabric Selection, Inc.. (Jeong, Chan) |
|
4 | 4
notice
Summons Request
Wed 10/19 6:25 PM
Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 filed by plaintiff Fabric Selection, Inc.. (Jeong, Chan) |
|
3 | 3
notice
Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties
Wed 10/19 6:24 PM
Certificate and NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Fabric Selection, Inc., (Jeong, Chan) |
|
2 | 2
misc
Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71)
Wed 10/19 6:23 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Fabric Selection, Inc.. (Jeong, Chan) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)
Wed 10/19 6:21 PM
COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-18748059 - Fee: $400, filed by plaintiff Fabric Selection, Inc.. (Attorney Chan Yong Jeong added to party Fabric Selection, Inc.(pty:pla))(Jeong, Chan) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit Exhibit A-C |