Ricci v. Monsanto Company
California Northern District Court | |
Judge: | Vince Chhabria |
Case #: | 3:16-cv-06019 |
Nature of Suit | 365 Torts - Personal Injury - Product Liability |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Personal Injury |
Case Filed: | Oct 18, 2016 |
Last checked: Sunday Apr 16, 2017 1:41 AM PDT |
Defendant
Monsanto Company
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
LINDA JEANNE RICCI
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 5 hours ago |
Friday, March 10, 2017 | ||
13 | 13
misc
Transcript
Fri 03/10 3:35 PM
Transcript of Proceedings held on 02/27/2017, before Judge Vince Chhabria. Court Reporter Rhonda Aquilina, rhondaaquilina@aol.com. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerk's Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 6/8/2017. (Aquilina, Rhonda) (Filed on 3/10/2017) |
|
Tuesday, March 07, 2017 | ||
12 | 12
misc
Transcript
Tue 03/07 2:22 PM
Transcript of Proceedings held on 02/24/2017, before Judge Vince Chhabria. Court Reporter/Transcriber Leo T. Mankiewicz, CSR, RMR, CRR, telephone number (415) 722-7045; email: leomank@gmail.com. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerk's Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. Redaction Request due 3/28/2017. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 4/7/2017. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 6/5/2017. (Mankiewicz, Leo) (Filed on 3/7/2017) |
|
Tuesday, October 18, 2016 | ||
11 | 11
transfer
Case Transferred In - District Transfer
Wed 10/19 9:07 AM
Case transferred in from District of New Jersey; Case Number 1:16-cv-04583. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. Modified on 10/19/2016 (farS, COURT STAFF). |
|
Monday, October 17, 2016 | ||
10 | 10 Order of MDL Panel transferring case to the Northern District of California. (ek) | |
Pro Hac Vice counsel, JOE G. HOLLINGSWORTH, has been added to receive Notices of Electronic Filing. Pursuant to L.Civ.R. 101.1, only local counsel are entitled to sign and file papers, enter appearances and receive payments on judgments, decrees or orders. (tf, ) | ||
Friday, October 14, 2016 | ||
9 | 9 Notice of Request by Pro Hac Vice Joe G. Hollingsworth to receive Notices of Electronic Filings. ( Pro Hac Vice fee $ 150 receipt number 0312-7417079.) (JONES, KELLY) | |
Wednesday, September 28, 2016 | ||
8 | 8 ORDER granting5 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Joe G. Hollingsworth, Esquire; shall make a payment of $150.00 to the Clerk of the United States District Court. Signed by Magistrate Judge Ann Marie Donio on 9/28/2016. (tf, ) | |
7 | 7 DECLARATION re QC - Electronic signature does not match e-filer, - Declaration of J. G. Hollingsworth in support of pro hac vice admission by MONSANTO COMPANY. (JONES, KELLY) | |
CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - The Declaration of Joe G. Hollingsworth #5-1 submitted by Kelly Jones on 9/27/2016 contains an improper signature. Only the filing user is permitted to sign electronically filed documents with an s/. PLEASE RESUBMIT THE DECLARATION ONLY WITH A SCANNED SIGNATURE. This submission will remain on the docket unless otherwise ordered by the court. (tf, ) | ||
Set/Reset Deadlines as to5 Consent MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice - for J. G. Hollingsworth . Motion set for 11/7/2016 before Magistrate Judge Ann Marie Donio. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (tf, ) | ||
Set/Reset Deadlines as to6 MOTION to Dismiss . Motion set for 11/7/2016 before Chief Judge Jerome B. Simandle. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (tf, ) | ||
Tuesday, September 27, 2016 | ||
6 | 6 MOTION to Dismiss by MONSANTO COMPANY. Responses due by 10/24/2016(JONES, KELLY) | |
Att: 1 Brief - in support of Motion to Dismiss, | ||
Att: 2 Text of Proposed Order - for Motion to Dismiss | ||
5 | 5 Consent MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice - for J. G. Hollingsworth by MONSANTO COMPANY.(JONES, KELLY) | |
Att: 1 Declaration - of J. G. Hollingsworth, | ||
Att: 2 Declaration - of K. E. Jones., | ||
Att: 3 Text of Proposed Order - for pro hac vice admission of J. G. Hollingsworth, | ||
Att: 4 Certificate of Service | ||
4 | 4 Corporate Disclosure Statement by MONSANTO COMPANY. (JONES, KELLY) | |
Monday, September 12, 2016 | ||
Clerk`s Text Order - The document3 Application for Clerk's Order to Ext Answer/Proposed Order submitted by MONSANTO COMPANY has been GRANTED. The answer due date has been set for 9/27/2016. (tf, ) | ||
Friday, September 09, 2016 | ||
3 | 3 Application and Proposed Order for Clerk's Order to extend time to answer as to Monsanto Company. Attorney KELLY E. JONES for MONSANTO COMPANY added. (JONES, KELLY) | |
Friday, July 29, 2016 | ||
2 | 2 SUMMONS ISSUED as to MONSANTO COMPANY Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. Issued By *JAIME KASSELMAN* (jbk, ) | |
1 | 1 COMPLAINT against MONSANTO COMPANY ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-7258312) with JURY DEMAND, filed by LINDA JEANNE RICCI.(MCCORMICK, BRIAN) | |
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet | ||
Chief Judge Jerome B. Simandle and Magistrate Judge Ann Marie Donio added. (dd, ) |