Unicolors, Inc. v. Belk, Inc. et al
California Central District Court | |
Judge: | Virginia A Phillips |
Referred: | Paul L Abrams |
Case #: | 2:16-cv-07825 |
Nature of Suit | 820 Property Rights - Copyrights |
Cause | 17:101 Copyright Infringement |
Case Filed: | Oct 20, 2016 |
Re-opened: | Feb 03, 2017 |
Terminated: | Jul 07, 2017 |
Last checked: Tuesday Apr 18, 2017 2:09 AM PDT |
Defendant
All Access Apparel, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Belk, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Does
|
|
Plaintiff
Unicolors, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/17/2024 11:59 PM PDT |
Thursday, August 10, 2017 | ||
32 | 32
order
Stipulation and Order
Thu 08/10 10:28 AM
ORDER ON STIPULATION TO DISMISS ACTION WITH PREJUDICE by Judge Virginia A. Phillips. FOR GOOD CAUSE APPEARING, THE FOLLOWING IS HEREBYORDERED: 1. This action is hereby dismissed with prejudice pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 41(a)(1)(A)(ii); 2. This dismissal is subject to and predicated upon the settlement agreement that gave rise to this dismissal; and3. The parties will each bear their respective costs and attorneys fees asincurred against one another in connection with this action. SO ORDERED. (ab) |
|
Friday, August 04, 2017 | ||
31 | 31
stip
Dismiss Case
Fri 08/04 4:12 PM
STIPULATION to Dismiss Case pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 41(a)(1)(A)(ii) filed by Plaintiff Unicolors, Inc..(Doniger, Stephen) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
Monday, July 10, 2017 | ||
30 | 30
misc
Report of Determination of Copyright Action (CLOSE) (AO 121)
Mon 07/10 4:09 PM
REPORT ON THE DETERMINATION OF AN ACTION Regarding a Copyright. (Closing) (bm) |
|
Friday, July 07, 2017 | ||
29 | 29
order
Order ~Util - Terminate Civil Case
Mon 07/10 4:06 PM
ORDER OF DISMISSAL by Judge Virginia A. Phillips: The Court having been advised by counsel for the parties that the above-entitled action has settled, IT IS ORDERED that this action be, and hereby is, dismissed in its entirety without prejudice. THE COURT to retain jurisdiction for a period of thirty (30) days to enforce the terms of the settlement. The scheduling conference set for July 10, 2017 is hereby vacated. (Made JS-6. Case Terminated.) (bm) |
|
28 | 28
textonly
Text Only Scheduling Notice
Fri 07/07 12:22 PM
SCHEDULING NOTICE. In light of the notice of settlement the scheduling conference set for 7/10/17 is off calendar by Chief Judge Virginia A. Phillips THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (bh) |
|
Thursday, July 06, 2017 | ||
27 | 27
notice
Settlement
Thu 07/06 5:07 PM
NOTICE of Settlement of Action filed by Plaintiff Unicolors, Inc.. (Doniger, Stephen) |
|
Friday, May 12, 2017 | ||
26 | 26
order
Order ~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings
Mon 05/15 11:05 AM
ORDER GRANTING SECOND STIPULATION TO CONTINUE SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge Virginia A. Phillips, re Stipulation to Continue25 : The Court, having reviewed the Second Stipulation to Continue Scheduling Conference submitted concurrently herewith, and good cause appearing therefore, it is hereby ORDERED THAT: The Stipulation is granted and the Scheduling Conference is hereby reset to July 10, 2017 at 1:30 p.m. (bm) |
|
Tuesday, May 09, 2017 | ||
25 | 25
stip
Continue
Tue 05/09 4:05 PM
Second STIPULATION to Continue Scheduling Conference from June 5, 2017 to July 10, 2017 filed by Defendants All Access Apparel, Inc., Belk, Inc..(Brutzkus, Mark) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
Wednesday, May 03, 2017 | ||
24 | 24
order
Order ~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings
Thu 05/04 8:38 AM
ORDER GRANTING JOINT STIPULATION TO CONTINUE SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge Virginia A. Phillips, re Stipulation to Continue,23 : The Court, having reviewed the Joint Stipulation to Continue Scheduling Conference submitted concurrently herewith, and good cause appearing therefore, it is hereby ORDERED THAT: The Stipulation is granted and the Scheduling Conference is hereby reset to June 5, 2017 at 1:30 p.m. (bm) |
|
Tuesday, May 02, 2017 | ||
23 | 23
stip
Continue
Tue 05/02 8:36 AM
Joint STIPULATION to Continue Scheduling Conference from May 8, 2017 to after May 24, 2017 filed by Defendants All Access Apparel, Inc., Belk, Inc..(Attorney Mark D Brutzkus added to party All Access Apparel, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Mark D Brutzkus added to party Belk, Inc.(pty:dft))(Brutzkus, Mark) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
Friday, April 28, 2017 | ||
22 | 22
misc
Joint Report Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan
Fri 04/28 4:45 PM
JOINT REPORT Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan ; estimated length of trial 3-5 court days, filed by Plaintiff Unicolors, Inc... (Doniger, Stephen) |
|
Friday, March 03, 2017 | ||
21 | 21
order
Initial Order Setting R26 Scheduling Conference - form only
Fri 03/03 1:35 PM
ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE for 5/8/2017 at 01:30 PM before Chief Judge Virginia A. Phillips. (bh) |
|
Wednesday, March 01, 2017 | ||
20 | 20
notice
Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties
Wed 03/01 10:02 AM
NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendants All Access Apparel, Inc., Belk, Inc., identifying Unicolors, Inc., Belk, Inc. and All Access Apparel, Inc.. (Kobulnick, Jeffrey) |
|
19 | 19
misc
Corporate Disclosure Statement
Wed 03/01 10:00 AM
CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Defendants All Access Apparel, Inc., Belk, Inc. identifying Belk, Inc. is owned by Bear Parent, Inc. as Corporate Parent. (Kobulnick, Jeffrey) |
|
18 | 18
answer
Answer to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)
Wed 03/01 9:58 AM
ANSWER to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 with JURY DEMAND filed by Defendants All Access Apparel, Inc., Belk, Inc..(Attorney Jeffrey A Kobulnick added to party All Access Apparel, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Jeffrey A Kobulnick added to party Belk, Inc.(pty:dft))(Kobulnick, Jeffrey) |
|
Wednesday, February 22, 2017 | ||
17 | 17
textonly
Generic Text Only Entry
Wed 02/22 2:54 PM
Effective March 1, 2017, Judge Abrams will be located at the Edward R. Roybal Federal Building, COURTROOM 780 on the 7th floor, located at 255 East Temple Street, Los Angeles, California 90012. All Court appearances shall be made in Courtroom 780 of the Roybal Federal Building, and all mandatory chambers copies shall be hand delivered to the judge's mail box located outside the Clerk's Office on the 1st floor of the Roybal Federal Building. The location for filing civil documents in paper format exempted from electronic filing and for viewing case files and other records services remains at the United States Courthouse, 312 North Spring Street, Room G-8, Los Angeles, California 90012. The location for filing criminal documents in paper format exempted from electronic filing remains at the Roybal Federal Building, 255 East Temple Street, Room 178, Los Angeles, California 90012. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (rrp) |
|
16 | 16
service
Service of Summons and Complaint Returned Executed (21 days)
Wed 02/22 2:00 PM
PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Unicolors, Inc., upon Defendant All Access Apparel, Inc. served on 2/21/2017, answer due 3/14/2017. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Kazi Alam, Agent for Service c/o Terri La Mantain, Assistant VP/Human Resources, Person Authorized to Accept in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by substituted service at business address and by also mailing a copy.Original Summons NOT returned. (Doniger, Stephen) |
|
15 | 15
service
Service of Summons and Complaint Returned Executed (21 days)
Wed 02/22 1:58 PM
PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Unicolors, Inc., upon Defendant Belk, Inc. served on 2/10/2017, answer due 3/3/2017. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Nicole Ramsdell, Vice President Authorized to Accept in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons NOT returned. (Doniger, Stephen) |
|
Friday, February 03, 2017 | ||
14 | 14
order
Reopen Case
Fri 02/03 3:03 PM
ORDER ON REQUEST TO REOPEN CASE by Judge Virginia A. Phillips granting13 REQUEST to Reopen Case: NOTE: CHANGES MADE BY THE COURT. FOR GOOD CAUSE APPEARING, THE FOLLOWING IS HEREBY ORDERED: The Order Dismissing Case (Doc. No. 12) is hereby vacated. Plaintiff shall file a Proof of Service of Summons and Complaint forthwith. Upon filing of the proof of service, the Court will issue an order setting a scheduling conference. (MD-JS5 Case Reopened) (bm) |
|
Tuesday, January 31, 2017 | ||
13 | 13
motion
Reopen Case
Tue 01/31 3:02 PM
REQUEST to Reopen Case filed by Plaintiff Unicolors, Inc.. (Doniger, Stephen) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
Monday, November 07, 2016 | ||
12 | 12
order
Dismissing Case
Mon 11/07 3:42 PM
ORDER DISMISSING CASE by Judge Virginia A. Phillips, re Notice of Settlement10 . Case Terminated. Made JS-6. (shb) |
|
11 | 11
textonly
Generic Text Only Entry
Mon 11/07 10:59 AM
NOTICE TO PARTIES by District Judge Virginia A. Phillips. Effective November 14, 2016, Judge Phillips will be located at the 1st Street Courthouse, COURTROOM 8A on the 8th floor, located at 350 W. 1st Street, Los Angeles, California 90012. All Court appearances shall be made in Courtroom 8A of the 1st Street Courthouse, and all mandatory chambers copies shall be hand delivered to the judge's mail box outside the Clerk's Office on the 4th floor of the 1st Street Courthouse. The location for filing civil documents in paper format exempted from electronic filing and for viewing case files and other records services remains at the United States Courthouse, 312 North Spring Street, Room G-8, Los Angeles, California 90012. The location for filing criminal documents in paper format exempted from electronic filing remains at Edward R. Roybal Federal Building and U.S. Courthouse, 255 East Temple Street, Room 178, Los Angeles, California 90012. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (rrp) |
|
Friday, October 28, 2016 | ||
10 | 10
notice
Settlement
Fri 10/28 2:39 PM
NOTICE of Settlement of Action filed by Plaintiff Unicolors, Inc.. (Doniger, Stephen) |
|
Friday, October 21, 2016 | ||
9 | 9
order
Initial Order upon Filing of Complaint - form only
Fri 10/21 2:34 PM
STANDING ORDER upon filing of the complaint by Chief Judge Virginia A. Phillips. (bh) |
|
Thursday, October 20, 2016 | ||
8 | 8
service
Summons Issued (Attorney Civil Case Opening)
Thu 10/20 5:18 PM
21 DAY Summons issued re Complaint1 as to defendants All Access Apparel, Inc., Belk, Inc. (esa) |
|
7 | 7
adr
Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program (ADR-8) - optional html form
Thu 10/20 5:15 PM
NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (esa) |
|
6 | 6
notice
Notice of Assignment to United States Judges (CV-18) - optional html form
Thu 10/20 5:15 PM
NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Virginia A. Phillips and Magistrate Judge Paul L. Abrams. (esa) |
|
5 | 5
notice
Summons Request
Thu 10/20 2:39 PM
Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 filed by Plaintiff Unicolors, Inc.. (Doniger, Stephen) |
|
4 | 4
misc
Report on Filing of Copyright Action (Initial Notification) (AO-121)
Thu 10/20 2:38 PM
REPORT ON THE FILING OF AN ACTION regarding a copyright (Initial Notification) filed by Unicolors, Inc.. (Doniger, Stephen) |
|
3 | 3
misc
Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71)
Thu 10/20 2:37 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Unicolors, Inc.. (Doniger, Stephen) |
|
2 | 2
notice
Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties
Thu 10/20 2:37 PM
NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Unicolors, Inc., (Doniger, Stephen) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)
Thu 10/20 2:36 PM
COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-18753335 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaintiff Unicolors, Inc.. (Attorney Stephen M Doniger added to party Unicolors, Inc.(pty:pla))(Doniger, Stephen) |